Taylor et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Julie Hungate Taylor and Trevor Taylor
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00095
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2020. Discovery due by 9/1/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 7/3/2020. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 9/4/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 8/14/2020. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 10/15/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 12/15/2020. Motions shall be filed by 2/15/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/7/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2021 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 7/5/2021. A Request for a Settlement Conference shall be made by 3/15/2021. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 7/19/2021. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 8/9/2021. A 4-day jury trial is scheduled for 8:30 a.m. beginning on August 23,2021 in Courtroom 2 before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/1/2020. (KMW)
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2020 is CANCELED. The court will issue a separate scheduling order in this matter. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 Joint STATUS REPORT By All Parties by Julie Hungate Taylor, Trevor Taylor. (Rundell, Edward)
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Petition for Damages with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company.(Boudreaux, Brad) Modified on 3/10/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE).
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 4/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/26/2020. (BLR)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 693201. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2076446), filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court suit record, #3 Attachment Certificate)(Boudreaux, Brad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Hungate Taylor
Represented By: Edward E. Rundell
Represented By: Joshua J. Dara, Jr.
Represented By: Trevor S. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Taylor
Represented By: Edward E. Rundell
Represented By: Joshua J. Dara, Jr.
Represented By: Trevor S. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Brad M Boudreaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?