Stevens v. Boston Mutual Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Frances Stevens
Defendant: The Newtron Group, LLC Employee Welfare Benefits Plan, Disability Reinsurance Management Services, Inc., Boston Mutual Life Insurance Company and The Newtron Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00097
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2020 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Frances Stevens, The Newtron Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 proposed order)(McNamara, J.)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Boston Mutual Life Insurance Company and Disability Reinsurance Management Services, Inc. are granted an extension of time until 5/8/2020 to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/17/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
April 16, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Duncan, Patrick) Modified on 4/16/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW).
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Joint Motion for Extension of Time/Reset Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference set for 4/30/2020 is RESET for 6/25/2020 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/16/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
April 16, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Boston Mutual Life Insurance Company and Disability Reinsurance Management Services, Inc. are granted an extension of time until 5/6/2020 to answer the #10 Cross-Claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/15/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
April 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time File status report/Scheduling Conference by Boston Mutual Life Insurance Company, Disability Reinsurance Management Services, Inc., The Newtron Group, LLC, The Newtron Group, LLC Employee Welfare Benefits Plan. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Eagan, Emily) Modified on 4/16/2020 to edit event type (SGO).
April 15, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 MOTION for Extension of Time File status report/Scheduling Conference. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
April 14, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time Responsive Pleadings by Boston Mutual Life Insurance Company, Disability Reinsurance Management Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Eagan, Emily) Modified on 4/15/2020 (SGO).
April 14, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Extension of Time Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
April 1, 2020 Filing 10 CROSSCLAIM First Amended against Boston Mutual Life Insurance Company, Disability Reinsurance Management Services, Inc., filed by The Newtron Group, LLC, The Newtron Group, LLC Employee Welfare Benefits Plan.(Oxenhandler, Steven)
March 20, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Newtron Group, LLC, The Newtron Group, LLC Employee Welfare Benefits Plan identifying Corporate Parent The Newtron Group, LLC Employee Welfare Benefits Plan for The Newtron Group, LLC, The Newtron Group, LLC, The Newtron Group, LLC Employee Welfare Benefits Plan.. (Oxenhandler, Steven)
March 20, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER, Affirmative Defenses to #1 Complaint and CROSSCLAIM against Boston Mutual Life Insurance Company, Disability Reinsurance Management Services, Inc. by The Newtron Group, LLC, The Newtron Group, LLC Employee Welfare Benefits Plan.(Oxenhandler, Steven) Modified on 3/20/2020 to edit text. (EDC).
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/30/2020 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr.. Status Report due by 4/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/9/2020. (EDC)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Blaire B. Johnson is enrolled as pro hac vice co-counsel for defendants Boston Mutual Life Insurance Company and Disability Reinsurance Management Services, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/9/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
March 6, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Boston Mutual Life Insurance Company. Boston Mutual Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 3/6/2020, answer due 5/5/2020. (Eagan, Emily)
March 6, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Disability Reinsurance Management Services, Inc.. Disability Reinsurance Management Services, Inc. waiver sent on 3/6/2020, answer due 5/5/2020. (Eagan, Emily)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 First MOTION for Blaire B. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2084898) by Boston Mutual Life Insurance Company, Disability Reinsurance Management Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Affidavit Affidavit, #3 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Duncan, Patrick)
March 5, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 First MOTION for Blaire B. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2084898). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Boston Mutual Life Insurance Company, Disability Reinsurance Management Services, Inc., The Newtron Group, LLC, The Newtron Group, LLC Employee Welfare Benefits Plan. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LT)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2077272.), filed by Frances Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 SUMMONS, #3 SUMMONS, #4 SUMMONS, #5 SUMMONS)(McNamara, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. Boston Mutual Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Newtron Group, LLC Employee Welfare Benefits Plan
Represented By: Michael J. O'Shee
Represented By: Steven M. Oxenhandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disability Reinsurance Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Emily E. Eagan
Represented By: Blaire B. Johnson
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Emily E. Eagan
Represented By: Blaire B. Johnson
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Newtron Group, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. O'Shee
Represented By: Steven M. Oxenhandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Stevens
Represented By: J. Price McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?