Bickham v. Cruz et al
Plaintiff: Ladarrius Bickham
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Autombile Insurance Company, Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company, Ricardo G. Cruz and FCA US LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00100
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Enroll Additional Attorney. Added attorney Caleb Joshua Huval for State Farm Mutual Autombile Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/17/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
April 16, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #15 MOTION to Enroll Caleb J. Huval as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
April 16, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Enroll Caleb J. Huval as Additional Attorney by State Farm Mutual Autombile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order)(Dyer, Kaitlin)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 9/14/2021 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/8/2020. (EDC)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2020. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 4/9/2020. Discovery due by 2/19/2021. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 4/13/2021. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 6/15/2021. Discovery from Experts due by 9/1/2021. Motions shall be filed by 10/19/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/8/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 2/24/2022 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 3/8/2022. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 3/22/2022. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 4/12/2022. A 7-day jury trial is scheduled for 8:30 a.m. beginning on April 25, 2022in Courtroom 2 before Judge Brian A. Jackson.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/8/2020. (KMW)
April 7, 2020 Filing 12 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2020 is CANCELED The court will issue a separate scheduling order in this matter. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
April 3, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Ricardo G. Cruz, Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company.(Truitt, Jack)
April 2, 2020 Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT by Ladarrius Bickham. (Schwartzberg, Alan)
March 31, 2020 Filing 9 SECOND AMENDED AND RESTATED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ladarrius Bickham.(ELW) Modified on 3/31/2020 to edit text (ELW).
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave of Court to File Second Amended and Restated Complaint. The clerk is directed to file R. Doc. 7-1 into the record as the operative complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/20/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
March 27, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended & Restated Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
March 27, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended & Restated Complaint by Ladarrius Bickham. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Second Amended & Restated Complaint, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Ritch, Joseph)
March 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Agreement to Amount in Controversy by Ladarrius Bickham re #4 Order,, (Schwartzberg, Alan)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 Memorandum Concerning the Amount in Controversy FCA US LLC's Memorandum Concerning the Amount in Controversy filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to FCA US LLC's Memorandum, #2 Exhibit B to FCA US LLC's Memorandum, #3 Exhibit C to FCA US LLC's Memorandum, #4 Exhibit D to FCA US LLC's Memorandum, #5 Exhibit E to FCA US LLC's Memorandum, #6 Exhibit F to FCA US LLC's Memorandum, #7 Exhibit G to FCA US LLC's Memorandum, #8 Exhibit H to FCA US LLC's Memorandum, #9 Exhibit I to FCA US LLC's Memorandum)(Crochet, Quincy) Modified on 3/17/2020 to edit text (LT).
March 6, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Brief 3/16/2020. Plaintiff's Response 3/26/2020. (LLH)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before March 16, 2020, Defendant FCA US LLC shall file a memorandum and supporting evidence concerning whether the amount in controversy requirement of 28 U.S.C. 1332 is met. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before March 26, 2020, Plaintiff Ladarrius Bickham shall file either: (1) a Notice stating that Plaintiff agrees that Defendant has established, by a preponderance of the evidence, that the amount in controversy likely exceeds $75,000.00; or (2) a Motion to Remand. The case will be allowed to proceed if jurisdiction is adequately established. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/6/2020. (BLR)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 01:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 4/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/26/2020. (BLR)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Jack E. Truitt regarding Nancy N. Butcher who is Co-Counsel for party Ricardo G. Cruz and Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KMW)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2078123), filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PETITION, #2 Exhibit B - 1ST AMENDED PETITION, #3 Exhibit C - SERVICE OF PROCESS TRANSMITTAL, #4 Exhibit D - DRIVERS LICENSE, #5 Exhibit E - CONSENT OF REMOVAL, #6 Exhibit F - CONSENT OF REMOVAL, #7 Exhibit G - EXPARTE MOTION, #8 CIVIL COVER SHEET)(Crochet, Quincy) (Attachment 8 replaced on 2/20/2020 to flatten the document) (KMW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bickham v. Cruz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Autombile Insurance Company
Represented By: Kaitlin Jessica Dyer
Represented By: Caleb Joshua Huval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Texas County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jack Etherton Truitt
Represented By: Michelle Mayne Davis
Represented By: Lou Anne Milliman
Represented By: Lauren Anne Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo G. Cruz
Represented By: Jack Etherton Truitt
Represented By: Michelle Mayne Davis
Represented By: Lou Anne Milliman
Represented By: Lauren Anne Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Quincy T. Crochet
Represented By: Keith Wade McDaniel
Represented By: Peter Sinnott Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ladarrius Bickham
Represented By: Hester Ruth Dornan
Represented By: Alan L. Schwartzberg
Represented By: Joseph Eric Ritch
Represented By: Robert E. Kleinpeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?