Gorman v. Labarre
Defendant: Janet B Labarre
Petitioner: Gary T Gorman
Respondent: Jeff Landry
Case Number: 3:2020cv00108
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply Memorandum due by 4/27/2020. (LLH)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Petitioner's Motion to Fix Time for the Filing of a Reply Memorandum, filed by Gary T. Gorman, pursuant to Rule 5(e) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases and Section 2255 Proceedings. Gorman's reply memorandum is due by no later than April 27, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 04/13/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD)
April 13, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Fix Deadline to File Reply . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
April 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Fix Deadline to File Reply by Gary T Gorman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, J.)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 Answer and Opposition to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Janet B Labarre, Jeff Landry. (Attachments: #1 State Trial Court Record 1 of 8, #2 State Trial Court Record 2 of 8, #3 State Trial Court Record 3 of 8, #4 State Trial Court Record 4 of 8, #5 State Trial Court Record 5 of 8, #6 State Trial Court Record 6 of 8, #7 State Trial Court Record 7 of 8, #8 State Trial Court Record8 of 8)(Daniels, Zachary) (Attachment 1-5, 7, and 8 replaced on 4/1/2020 to edit page orientation). Modified on 4/1/2020 to edit text (LT).
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 Courtesy Copy of State Court Record mailed to the Judge's Office. This record includes 1 volume(s) from the 21st Judicial District Court and contains no original(s). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EDC)
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 Return on FedEx Confirmation as to #2 Habeas Corpus Order (ELW)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 Entered in error by Case Administrator Modified on 3/5/2020 (ELW).
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: In order for this Court to determine the action, if any, that shall be taken on this application,the District Attorney for the Parish of Livingston Parish shall file an answer & memo of authorities, along w/copies of all briefs & memoranda. Along with the response, The District Attorney for the 21st Judicial District Court shall file an electronic certified copy of the state court record, including transcripts of all proceedings held in the state courts as well as a certified electronic copy of all documents. The Clerk of Court for the 21st Judicial District Court shall file, in a conventional manner, not electronic, a courtesy copy of the entire state court record filed by the state. The Clerk of this Court serve, by any means which provides tracking and delivery confirmation, a copy of the entire application & this order on the Attorney General for the State of Louisiana, the District Attorney for the Parish of Livingston Parish, and the Clerk of Court for 21st Judicial District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 03/03/2020. (ELW) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2020: #1 Attachment) (ELW).
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number ALAMDC-2079958.), filed by Gary T Gorman. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Smith, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gorman v. Labarre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gary T Gorman
Represented By: J. Arthur Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet B Labarre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Landry
Represented By: Zachary Thomas Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?