Martin v. Forest River, Inc.
Plaintiff: Martin Prestigiacomo
Defendant: Forest River, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00125
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 4/30/2020 is CANCELED. The court will issue a separate scheduling order in this matter. The court will issue a separate scheduling order in this matter. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT by Martin Prestigiacomo. (Nordgren, Drew)
March 22, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED and Restated NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Defendants, filed by Forest River, Inc..(Johnson, Ryan) Modified on 3/23/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW).
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: On or before 03/23/2020, Defendant, Forest River, Inc., shall file a comprehensive Amended Notice of Removal, that contains all its numbered allegations as revised, supplemented, and/or amended, without reference to any other document in the record, and that adequately alleges the citizenship of Plaintiff, Martin Prestigiacomo, and Defendant, Forest River, Inc. as described herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 03/16/2020. (LT) Modified on 3/17/2020 to add text (NLT).
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Forest River, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for Forest River, Inc... (Johnson, Ryan)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Forest River, Inc..(Johnson, Ryan) Modified on 3/5/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE).
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/30/2020 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 4/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/5/2020. (BLR) Modified on 3/6/2020 to edit the text (NLT).
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, East Baton Rouge Parish, Case Number C-693512, Section 24. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2084906), filed by Forest River, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment State Court Record)(Johnson, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Forest River, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Prestigiacomo
Represented By: Drew Eastman Nordgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest River, Inc.
Represented By: Justin John Marocco
Represented By: Ryan Estes Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?