Murrell v. Loya Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Madisyn Murrell
Defendant: Fernandez Eleazar, Jr., Fernandez Eleazar, Sr. and Loya Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00138
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 5/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 3/24/2020. (KAH)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER, Affirmative Defenses and Request for Trial by Jury to Complaint with Jury Demand by Loya Insurance Company.(Capitelli, Andrew) Modified on 3/18/2020 to edit text. (EDC).
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 Letter to Attorney Danny D. Russell regarding Brett J. Bajon who is Co-Counsel for party Madisyn Murrell. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (SWE)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Loya Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Loya Insurance Company for Loya Insurance Company. (Capitelli, Andrew)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and Jury Trial Demand from 23rd Judicial District Court, Case Number 127945. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2087897), filed by Loya Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Exhibit 1)(Capitelli, Andrew) Modified on 3/12/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murrell v. Loya Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernandez Eleazar, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernandez Eleazar, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loya Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew Capitelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madisyn Murrell
Represented By: Danny Dustin Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?