Harris v. Home Care PCA, LLC
Plaintiff: Althea Harris
Defendant: Home Care PCA, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00156
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Home Care PCA, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Submitted (Miller, Gregory)
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Home Care PCA, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. TheClerk shall file said complaint without prepayment of costs or security thereof andthe Clerk is directed to issue process to the defendant(s). The plaintiff(s) isresponsible for service of summons and complaint on the defendant(s).. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 5/7/2020. (KMW)
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Submitted (Miller, Gregory)
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Submitted (Miller, Gregory)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Althea Harris. (EDC)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Home Care PCA, LLC, filed by Althea Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Pauper)(Miller, Gregory)
March 16, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Home Care PCA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Althea Harris
Represented By: Gregory J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Care PCA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?