CMFG Life Insurance Company v Lee et al
Plaintiff: CMFG Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Vereta T. Lee and Kelly N. Frazier
Case Number: 3:2020cv00157
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Kelly N. Frazier. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LT)
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Submitted (Couhig, Robert)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Continue. The Scheduling Conference is reset for 7/16/2020 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 7/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 5/4/2020. (EDC)
April 23, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Certain Deadlines . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
April 23, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Certain Deadlines by CMFG Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Couhig, Robert)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/7/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 4/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 4/6/2020. (KAH)
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CMFG Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent TruStage Financial Group, Inc. f/k/a CUNA Mutual Financial Group, Inc. for CMFG Life Insurance Company. (Couhig, Robert)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing of Civil Cover Sheet by CMFG Life Insurance Company re #1 Complaint (Couhig, Robert) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/16/2020 to flatten document) (LT).
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CMFG Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2089613.), filed by CMFG Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Couhig, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CMFG Life Insurance Company v Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CMFG Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert E. Couhig, III
Represented By: Claire Easterling Pontier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vereta T. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly N. Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?