Federick et al v. Bossier Jr. et al
Plaintiff: Pammy Demolle, Dustie Federick, Tammy Breaux and Steven Carter
Defendant: Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP, Foster-Wheeler, LLC, J. Melton Garrett, Georgia-Pacific, LLC, Sea Drilling Corporation, Rapid American Corporation, Phillips, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Union Carbide Corporation, The McCarty Corporation, Crane Co., Travelers Indemnity Company, Bayer CropScience, Inc., Albert Bossier Jr., Riley Power, Inc., Certainteed Coporation, Reilly-Benton Company, Inc., Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, General Electric Company, American Motorists Insurance Company, W.R. Grace & Co. Conn., American Employers Insurance Company, CBS Corporation, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., OneBeacon America Insurance Company, Lamorak Insurance Company, Hopeman Brothers, Inc., Anco Insulations, Inc., Maryland Casualty Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Albert Bossier, Jr. and McCarty Corporation
Cross Defendant: Phillips Chemical Holding Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, International Paper Company, Ingersoll Rand Company, Uniroyal Holding, Inc., Certainteed Corporation, Claims Resolution Management Corporation, W.R. Grace & Co.-Conn., Uniroyal, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Incorporated, ConocoPhillips Company, Warren Pumps, LLC and Uniroyal Holdings, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Albert L. Bossier Jr. and Albert L. Bossier, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00210
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
2 Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing 40 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 6/11/2020 is CANCELED. The court will issue a separate scheduling order in this matter. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 28, 2020 Filing 39 Joint STATUS REPORT by Dustie Federick. (Boling, Jeremiah)
May 28, 2020 Filing 38 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Travelers Indemnity Company. (Reimonenq, Simeon) Modified on 5/28/2020 to edit text (LT).
May 28, 2020 Filing 37 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Goulds Pumps, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Semlinger, Lauren)
May 27, 2020 Filing 36 Joint MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice by Plaintiffs and by Maryland Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Kemmerly, McNeil) Modified on 5/27/2020 to edit text (LT).
May 27, 2020 Filing 35 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Dustie Federick. (Boling, Jeremiah) Modified on 5/27/2020 to edit text (LT).
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying without prejudice #26 , #27 and #28 Motions to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel of Record filed by Defendants General Electric Company, Foster-Wheeler, LLC and CBS Corporations. The motions are not signed by Peter R. Tafaro and Meredith Keenan Waldron, the attorneys sought to be withdrawn, nor is it clear from the motion whether Mr. Tafaro and Ms. Waldron are still employed by the law firm Frilot, L.L.C. To the extent there is a problem obtaining Mr. Tafaro and Mr. Waldron's signatures, movant shall so indicate and state what efforts were undertaken to obtain signatures in any subsequent motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/27/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 27, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Dustie Federick. (Boling, Jeremiah) Modified on 5/27/2020 to edit the event type and docket text (KMW).
May 26, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #27 MOTION to Substitute Roth M. Hainkel, Magali A. Puente Martin, Kelly L. Long, Lacey T. McCoy in place of Peter R. Tafaro, Meredith Keenan Waldron as Attorney , #26 MOTION to Substitute Roth M. Hainkel, Magali A. Puente Martin, Kelly L. Long, Lacey T. McCoy in place of Peter R. Tafaro, Meredith Keenan Waldron as Attorney , #28 MOTION to Substitute Roth M. Hainkel, Magali A. Puente Martin, Kelly L. Long, Lacey T. McCoy in place of Peter R. Tafaro, Meredith Keenan Waldron as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
May 22, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Substitute Incorrectly Filed Documents #29 and #30 , MOTION to Strike #31 by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Motion to Substitute, #2 Attachment CBS DWOP, #3 Attachment FW DWOP)(Brown, James) Modified on 5/22/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW).
May 22, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by CBS Corporation. (Brown, James) Modified on 5/22/2020 to edit event type and docket text (SWE).
May 22, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by CBS Corporation. (Brown, James) Modified on 5/22/2020 to edit text. (EDC).
May 22, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss by Foster-Wheeler, LLC. (Brown, James)
May 21, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Substitute Roth M. Hainkel, Magali A. Puente Martin, Kelly L. Long, Lacey T. McCoy in place of Peter R. Tafaro, Meredith Keenan Waldron as Attorney by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, James)
May 21, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Substitute Roth M. Hainkel, Magali A. Puente Martin, Kelly L. Long, Lacey T. McCoy in place of Peter R. Tafaro, Meredith Keenan Waldron as Attorney by Foster-Wheeler, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, James)
May 21, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Substitute Roth M. Hainkel, Magali A. Puente Martin, Kelly L. Long, Lacey T. McCoy in place of Peter R. Tafaro, Meredith Keenan Waldron as Attorney by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, James)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Ex Parte Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record. Added attorney McNeil J. Kemmerly for Maryland Casualty Company. The #23 Ex Parte Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/20/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 19, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #24 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll McNeil J. Kemmerly as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
May 19, 2020 Filing 24 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll McNeil J. Kemmerly as Additional Attorney by Maryland Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Devenport, Marc)
May 19, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #23 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll McNeil J. Kemmerly as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
May 19, 2020 Filing 23 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll McNeil J. Kemmerly as Additional Attorney by Maryland Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Devenport, Marc)
May 19, 2020 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP (Cosculluela, Alex)
May 19, 2020 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster-Wheeler, LLC identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group PLC for Foster-Wheeler, LLC.. (Brown, James)
May 19, 2020 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 7.1 of Defendant Viacombs Inc. F/K/A CBS Corporation, A Deleware Corporation, F/K/A Viacom, Inc., Successor by Merger to CBS Corporation, A Pennsylvanis Corporation F/K/A Westinghouse Electric Corporation by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc. for CBS Corporation.. (Brown, James) Modified on 5/19/2020 to edit text (LT).
May 19, 2020 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Brown, James)
May 14, 2020 Filing 18 Witness List by Riley Power, Inc.. (For your free look at document, enter your Individual PACER login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Adams, Jennifer)
May 14, 2020 Filing 17 Exhibit List by Riley Power, Inc... (Adams, Jennifer)
May 14, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Riley Power, Inc.. (Adams, Jennifer)
May 11, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hopeman Brothers, Inc.. (Burg, Jeffrey)
May 8, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Dismiss. Cross-Claimant Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's claims against Cross-Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 04/30/2020. (ELW)
April 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Compliance by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company to #1 Notice of Removal,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Melancon, David)
April 21, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Warren Pumps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Porteous, Thomas)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Richard M. Crump and Shelley K. Napolitano as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/20/2020. (LT)
April 17, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 MOTION for Richard M. Crump and Shelley K. Napolitano to Withdraw as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
April 17, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Richard M. Crump and Shelley K. Napolitano to Withdraw as Attorney by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Crump, Richard)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp.,, Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for Travelers Indemnity Company.. (Reimonenq, Simeon)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/11/2020 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 5/28/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 04/09/2020. (NLT)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The McCarty Corporation. (Oubre, Louis)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 There is no record document 5. Entered in error by case administrator (KMW)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 Letter to Attorney Gary A. Bezet regarding Sarah K. Weissman who is Co-Counsel for party Georgia-Pacific, LLC. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KMW)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 Letter to Attorney Jeanette Riggins regarding Thomas L. Cougill who is Co-Counsel for party Reilly-Benton Company, Inc.. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KMW)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lamorak Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Bedivere Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Armour Group Holdings, Ltd., Corporate Parent Trebuchet Investments, Limited, Corporate Parent Trebuchet U.S. Holdings, Inc. for Lamorak Insurance Company.. (Rosamond, Samuel)
April 8, 2020 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KMW)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial DIstrict Court, Case Number C-644344. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2098407), filed by OneBeacon America Insurance Company, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Attachment State Court Record - Part 1, #6 Attachment State Court Record - Part 2, #7 Attachment State Court Record - Part 3, #8 Attachment State Court Record - Part 4, #9 Attachment State Court Record - Part 5, #10 Attachment State Court Record - Part 6)(Melancon, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federick et al v. Bossier Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Phillips Chemical Company, LP
Represented By: Kathleen F. Drew
Represented By: Alex E. Cosculluela
Represented By: Charles A. Cerise, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster-Wheeler, LLC
Represented By: Peter R. Tafaro
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelsey Anne Eagan
Represented By: Meredith Keenan Waldron
Represented By: Kelly Lorraine Long
Represented By: Lacey T McCoy
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Melton Garrett
Represented By: Gary A. Lee
Represented By: Timothy F. Daniels
Represented By: Katie F Wollfarth
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Fredric Eisenstat
Represented By: Edward W. Trapolin
Represented By: Richard M. Perles
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Alexander R. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific, LLC
Represented By: Alexandra Elise Rossi
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Gayla M. Moncla
Represented By: Allison N. Benoit
Represented By: Barrye Panepinto Miyagi
Represented By: Gary A. Bezet
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Represented By: Gregory M. Anding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sea Drilling Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rapid American Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips
Represented By: Kathleen F. Drew
Represented By: Alex E. Cosculluela
Represented By: Charles A. Cerise, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Ebony Shadae Morris
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelly Lorraine Long
Represented By: Lacey T McCoy
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: John J. Hainkel, III
Represented By: Joseph B. Morton, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelsey Anne Eagan
Represented By: Barry C. Campbell
Represented By: Shelley Kathryn Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Michael H. Abraham
Represented By: Deborah Kuchler
Represented By: Francis Xavier DeBlanc, III
Represented By: Ernest G. Foundas
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Perrey S. Lee
Represented By: Kathleen Jordan
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Represented By: Melissa Desormeaux Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The McCarty Corporation
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: Janice Marie Culotta
Represented By: Nicole M. Loup
Represented By: April A. McQuillar
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Douglas R. Kinler
Represented By: Douglas W. Redfearn
Represented By: Stephen Jared Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Barry C. Campbell
Represented By: Lawrence G. Pugh, III
Represented By: Donna Mannina Young
Represented By: Jacqueline Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Simeon B. Reimonenq, Jr.
Represented By: Katherine L. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience, Inc.
Represented By: Michael H. Abraham
Represented By: Deborah Kuchler
Represented By: Francis Xavier DeBlanc, III
Represented By: Ernest G. Foundas
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Perrey S. Lee
Represented By: Kathleen Jordan
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Represented By: Melissa Desormeaux Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Bossier Jr.
Represented By: Gary A. Lee
Represented By: Timothy F. Daniels
Represented By: Katie F Wollfarth
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Fredric Eisenstat
Represented By: Edward W. Trapolin
Represented By: Richard M. Perles
Represented By: Anita A. Cates
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Alexander R. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power, Inc.
Represented By: Arthur Wendel Stout, III
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: William C. Harrison, Jr.
Represented By: Marc John Bitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certainteed Coporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reilly-Benton Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer D. Zajac
Represented By: Jamie Morain Zanovec
Represented By: Jennifer Hart McLaughlin
Represented By: Jeanette Seraile Riggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: Alex Robertson
Represented By: Adam D. deMahy
Represented By: Timothy F. Daniels
Represented By: Daphne Marie Lancaster
Represented By: Erin H Boyd
Represented By: Patrick K. Shockey
Represented By: Brian C. Bossier
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Whitney Charmaine Stewart
Represented By: Michelle Andrina Beaty
Represented By: Edward W. Trapolin
Represented By: Christopher T. Grace, III
Represented By: Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Laura Michelle Gillen
Represented By: Samuel M. Rosamond, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelsey Anne Eagan
Represented By: Meredith Keenan Waldron
Represented By: Lacey T McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Motorists Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.R. Grace & Co. Conn.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Employers Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Peter R. Tafaro
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: John J. Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelsey Anne Eagan
Represented By: Meredith Keenan Waldron
Represented By: Kelly Lorraine Long
Represented By: Lacey T McCoy
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Richard J. Garvey, Jr
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Represented By: Edward J. Lassus, Jr.
Represented By: Anne Elizabeth Medo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneBeacon America Insurance Company
Represented By: Alex Robertson
Represented By: Adam D. deMahy
Represented By: Timothy F. Daniels
Represented By: Daphne Marie Lancaster
Represented By: Erin H Boyd
Represented By: Brian C. Bossier
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Angela Jacketti O'Brien
Represented By: Whitney Charmaine Stewart
Represented By: Edward W. Trapolin
Represented By: Christopher T. Grace, III
Represented By: Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Laura Michelle Gillen
Represented By: Samuel M. Rosamond, III
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Douglas R. Kinler
Represented By: James Richard Guidry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamorak Insurance Company
Represented By: Adam D. deMahy
Represented By: Samuel M. Rosamond, III
Represented By: Alex Robertson
Represented By: Timothy F. Daniels
Represented By: Daphne Marie Lancaster
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Edward W. Trapolin
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Burg
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Represented By: Blaine A. Moore
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anco Insulations, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas R. Elliott
Represented By: Etienne Francis Rene
Represented By: Margaret Moran Joffe
Represented By: Jamie H. Baglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Casualty Company
Represented By: Edward T. Hayes
Represented By: Adam David Whitworth
Represented By: Marc Edward Devenport
Represented By: McNeil J. Kemmerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence G. Pugh, III
Represented By: Donna Mannina Young
Represented By: Jacqueline Romero
Represented By: Shelley L. Thompson
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch Semlinger
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Bossier, Jr.
Represented By: Gary A. Lee
Represented By: Timothy F. Daniels
Represented By: Katie F Wollfarth
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Fredric Eisenstat
Represented By: Edward W. Trapolin
Represented By: Richard M. Perles
Represented By: Anita A. Cates
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Alexander R. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarty Corporation
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Douglas R. Kinler
Represented By: James Richard Guidry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Phillips Chemical Holding Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Burg
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Represented By: Blaine A. Moore
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Daniel Steven Roberts
Represented By: Mary Arthur
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Ingersoll Rand Company
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelly Lorraine Long
Represented By: Lacey T McCoy
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: John J. Hainkel, III
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelsey Anne Eagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Uniroyal Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Kirk Elam
Represented By: Mary Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Certainteed Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Claims Resolution Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: W.R. Grace & Co.-Conn.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Uniroyal, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Goulds Pumps, Incorporated
Represented By: Lawrence G. Pugh, III
Represented By: Donna Mannina Young
Represented By: Jacqueline Romero
Represented By: Shelley L. Thompson
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch Semlinger
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Daniel Edwin Oser
Represented By: Joseph Henry Hart, IV
Represented By: Thomas A. Porteous
Represented By: Leigh Ann Schell
Represented By: Lori A. Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Uniroyal Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Kirk Elam
Represented By: Mary Arthur
Represented By: Amy Louise Maccherone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Albert L. Bossier Jr.
Represented By: Gary A. Lee
Represented By: Timothy F. Daniels
Represented By: Katie F Wollfarth
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Fredric Eisenstat
Represented By: Edward W. Trapolin
Represented By: Richard M. Perles
Represented By: Anita A. Cates
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Alexander R. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Albert L. Bossier, Jr.
Represented By: Gary A. Lee
Represented By: Timothy F. Daniels
Represented By: Katie F Wollfarth
Represented By: Michael Scott Minyard
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Fredric Eisenstat
Represented By: Edward W. Trapolin
Represented By: Richard M. Perles
Represented By: Anita A. Cates
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Alexander R. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pammy Demolle
Represented By: David Ryan Cannella
Represented By: Denyse F. Clancy
Represented By: Jeremiah Spencer Boling
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Benjamin David Rumph
Represented By: Kristopher Lynn Thompson
Represented By: Christopher C. Colley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustie Federick
Represented By: David Ryan Cannella
Represented By: Denyse F. Clancy
Represented By: Jeremiah Spencer Boling
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Benjamin David Rumph
Represented By: Kristopher Lynn Thompson
Represented By: Christopher C. Colley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Breaux
Represented By: David Ryan Cannella
Represented By: Denyse F. Clancy
Represented By: Jeremiah Spencer Boling
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Benjamin David Rumph
Represented By: Kristopher Lynn Thompson
Represented By: Christopher C. Colley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Carter
Represented By: David Ryan Cannella
Represented By: Denyse F. Clancy
Represented By: Jeremiah Spencer Boling
Represented By: J. Burton LeBlanc, IV
Represented By: Benjamin David Rumph
Represented By: Kristopher Lynn Thompson
Represented By: Christopher C. Colley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?