American Biocarbon, LLC et al v. Keating et al
Plaintiff: American Biocarbon, LLC and American Biocarbon CT, LLC
Defendant: Jan Anders Borg and Philip Keating
Case Number: 3:2020cv00259
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #20 Borg's Rule 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimMotion for a More Definite Statement, #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimMotion for a More Definite Statement of Plaintiffs' Claims filed by American Biocarbon CT, LLC, American Biocarbon, LLC. (Frederick, Zelma)
June 18, 2020 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Philip Keating. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Keating Declaration)(Miller, Eric)
June 18, 2020 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jan Anders Borg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jan Anders Borg)(Turkington, Courtney)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 2/2/2021 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/18/2020. (EDC)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER: In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 9/15/2020. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 7/10/2020. Discovery due by 1/29/2021. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 9/18/2020. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 10/23/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 10/2/2020. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 11/20/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 2/12/2021. Dispositive and Daubert Motions shall be filed by 4/2/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/23/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 8/6/2021 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 8/20/2021. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 9/3/2021. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 9/24/2021. Four-day Jury Trial set for 10/12/2021 - 10/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/18/2020. (EDC)
June 17, 2020 Filing 25 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2020 is CANCELED. The court will issue a separate scheduling order in this matter. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 11, 2020 Filing 24 Joint STATUS REPORT by American Biocarbon CT, LLC, American Biocarbon, LLC. (Frederick, Zelma)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORAL ORDER denying #17 MOTION for Leave to Take Expedited Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/8/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
June 8, 2020 Filing 30 Minute Entry/Telephone Conference Report and Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes: Telephone Conference held on 6/8/2020. The pending #17 Motion for Leave to Take Expedited Discovery was discussed and DENIED for failure to show good cause. (SWE)
June 4, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Opposition shall be filed by 6/18/2020. (LLH)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Continue Deadline for TheirOpposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 18). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Defendant's opposition shall be filed 14 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 6/4/2020. (PJH)
June 4, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: A Telephone Conference is for 6/8/2020 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes to discuss the pending #17 Motion for Leave to take Expedited Discovery. Counsel participating in the Conference shall call 877-336-1839 using access code 9565780 five minutes prior to conference. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 4, 2020 Filing 20 Borg's Rule 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or Alternatively, RUle 12(e) Motion for a More Definite Statement by Jan Anders Borg. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Turkington, Courtney). Added MOTION on 6/5/2020 to edit text (LT).
June 4, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Or, Alternatively, Rule 12(e) Motion for a More Definite Statement of Plaintiffs' Claims by Philip Keating. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Miller, Eric). Added MOTION on 6/4/2020 to edit text (LT).
June 4, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (ELW)
June 3, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Continue Deadline for Opposition to #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Eric) Modified on 6/4/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW).
May 29, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Replies due by 6/4/2020. (ELW)
May 29, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #17 MOTION for Leave to Take Expedited Discovery . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
May 28, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Take Expedited Discovery by American Biocarbon CT, LLC, American Biocarbon, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Frederick, Zelma)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Enroll as Attorney. Added attorney Eric Ray Miller,Christine S. Keenan,Karuna Dave for Philip Keating. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/26/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 26, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #15 MOTION to Enroll Eric R. Miller, Christine S. Keenan and Karuna Dave as Attorney for Phillip Keating. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
May 26, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Enroll Eric R. Miller, Christine S. Keenan and Karuna Dave as Attorney for Phillip Keating by Philip Keating. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Miller, Eric)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Considering #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, that the Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's Motion by 6/4/2020. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 05/18/2020. (ELW)
May 18, 2020 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian A. Jackson: Telephone Conference held on 5/18/2020. Motion for Preliminary Injunction discussed. Counsel agree to maintain status quo. The Court encouraged Counsel to engage in good faith effort to resolve this matter. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (PJH)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Anderson L. Cao to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/18/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 18, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 MOTION for Anderson L. Cao to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2114452). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT)
May 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Anderson L. Cao to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2114452) by American Biocarbon CT, LLC, American Biocarbon, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Hicks, Michael)
May 15, 2020 Filing 11 Notice to Counsel: Considering the Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed 5/15/2020; Telephone Conference is set for 5/18/2020 at 01:00 PM before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Call-in information will be emailed to Counsel the morning of the conference.Evidence, in electronic format, shall be provided in accordance with Local Rule 79 and Administrative Procedures.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(PJH)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Enroll as Attorney. Added attorney Thomas J. McGoey, II,Courtney Harper Turkington for Jan Anders Borg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/14/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
May 14, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 MOTION to Enroll Thomas J. McGoey II as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
May 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by American Biocarbon CT, LLC, American Biocarbon, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Frederick, Zelma)
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Enroll Thomas J. McGoey II as Attorney by Jan Anders Borg. (McGoey, Thomas)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: counsel for Defendants Philip Keating and Jan AndersBorg shall file motions to enroll as counsel in this matter within 7 days from the dateof this Order. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/6/2020. (PJH)
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Biocarbon, LLC, American Biocarbon CT, LLC. Philip Keating served on 5/5/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Frederick, Zelma)
May 5, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Biocarbon, LLC, American Biocarbon CT, LLC. Jan Anders Borg served on 5/4/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Frederick, Zelma)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: A Telephone Status Conference before the District Judge is set for 5/6/2020 at 11:30 AM in chambers before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Plaintiff shall perfect service on Defendants by Monday, 5/4/2020, by 5:00 p.m. and shall inform Defendants, in writing, of the date and time of the status conference. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/1/2020. (EDC)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2020 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 6/11/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/1/2020. (LT)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jan Anders Borg, Philip Keating. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (Attachments: #1 summons)(EDC)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Damages against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2107455.), filed by American Biocarbon, LLC, American Biocarbon CT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Keating Summons, #3 Borg Summons)(Frederick, Zelma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Biocarbon, LLC et al v. Keating et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Biocarbon, LLC
Represented By: Amanda Strickland Stout
Represented By: Zelma M. Frederick
Represented By: Michael Brent Hicks
Represented By: Kyle A. Ferachi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Biocarbon CT, LLC
Represented By: Amanda Strickland Stout
Represented By: Zelma M. Frederick
Represented By: Michael Brent Hicks
Represented By: Kyle A. Ferachi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Anders Borg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?