Gauthier v. Richardson, Inc. of Alabama
Plaintiff: Louis Gauthier
Defendant: Richardson, Inc. of Alabama d/b/a Sunbelt CWS
Case Number: 3:2020cv00328
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel: In light of the #7 LIMITED SCHEDULING ORDER (Fair Labor Standards Act) issued, the Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2020 is CANCELED. The Status Report deadline set in the Court's #3 Order is terminated. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LIMITED SCHEDULING ORDER (Fair Labor Standards Act): Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, the Court finds it necessary to implement a schedule tailored to meet the particular circumstances of this case which is based on the Fair Labor Standards Act. Therefore, consistent with the requirements for just, speedy and inexpensive administration of justice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED that the provisions of Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) and Local Civil Rule 26 concerning initial disclosures are hereby WAIVED in this case. Instead, the parties shall comply with the following schedule stated herein.Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/8/2020. (BLR)
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Richardson, Inc. of Alabama. (Keenan, Christine)
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses by Richardson, Inc. of Alabama.(Keenan, Christine) Modified on 6/23/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW).
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louis Gauthier. Richardson, Inc. of Alabama served on 6/2/2020, answer due 6/23/2020. (Campbell, Robert)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2020 at 09:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 7/23/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/2/2020. (KMW)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Richardson, Inc. of Alabama. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LT)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richardson, Inc. of Alabama d/b/a Sunbelt CWS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2120409.), filed by Louis Gauthier. (Attachments: #1 Attachment cover sheet, #2 Attachment summons)(Campbell, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gauthier v. Richardson, Inc. of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richardson, Inc. of Alabama d/b/a Sunbelt CWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Gauthier
Represented By: Robert Leonard Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?