Jones et al v. Caterpillar, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Billy Keith Jones, Martin Jones, Barbara Lee and Kimberly Jones
Defendant: CNH Industrial America, LLC, Anco Insulations, Inc., The McCarty Corporation, Industrial Holdings Corporation, Morse Tec, LLC, The J. Grave Insulation Company, General Electric Company, The J. R. Clarkson Company, Mack Trucks, Inc., Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Navistar, Inc., Grinnell, LLC, International Paper Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Cummins, Inc., Pneumo Abex Corporation, Paccar, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc., DCO, LLC, The Dow Chemical Company, Union Carbide Corporation, CBS Corporation, Lamons Gasket Company, Crown, Cork & Seal Company, Inc. and Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Honeywell International Inc. and John Crane, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Claims Resolution Management Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv00351
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting #198 Motion to Dismiss Industrial Holdings Corporation f/k/a The Carborundum Company without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/09/2021. (NLT)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER granting #197 Motion to Dismiss Navistar, Inc., improperly named as Navistar, Inc. f/k/a International Truck and Engine Corporation, only, without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/08/2021. (NLT)
November 8, 2021 Filing 198 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Industrial Holdings Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Napolitano, Shelley)
November 5, 2021 Filing 197 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Navistar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Baxter, Kay)
November 5, 2021 Filing 196 ANSWER to #147 Amended Complaint by Union Carbide Corporation.(Foundas, Ernest)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER granting #194 Motion to Dismiss. MackTrucks be and are hereby dismissed without prejudice and at each party's own cost, reserving to plaintiff all rights to proceed against other parties. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/01/2021. (ELW)
November 1, 2021 Filing 194 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Against Mack Trucks, Inc. by Mack Trucks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment ppd Order)(Hays, Bradley)
October 29, 2021 Filing 193 Witness List by Industrial Holdings Corporation. (For your free look at document, enter your Individual PACER login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Napolitano, Shelley)
October 29, 2021 Filing 192 Witness List by International Paper Company. (For your free look at document, enter your Individual PACER login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Arthur, Mary)
October 29, 2021 Filing 191 Witness List by Grinnell, LLC. (For your free look at document, enter your Individual PACER login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Semlinger, Lauren)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting #189 Motion to Dismiss. The claims of Plaintiff Billy Keith Jones, Individually and on behalf of decedent Billy Wayne Jones, against Defendant, The J. Graves Insulation Company, Inc., only, are hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/28/2021. (NLT)
October 28, 2021 Filing 189 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by The J. Grave Insulation Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wandell, Jade)
October 28, 2021 Filing 188 Witness List by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.. (For your free look at document, enter your Individual PACER login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Lightfoot, Christopher)
October 28, 2021 Filing 187 Witness List by Union Carbide Corporation. (For your free look at document, enter your Individual PACER login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Foundas, Ernest)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting #185 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Cummins, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/26/2021. (DCB)
October 26, 2021 Filing 185 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Cummins, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Oser, Daniel)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting #183 Motion to Dismiss Honeywell International Inc. without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/25/2021. (NLT)
October 25, 2021 Filing 183 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Plaintiffs and by Honeywell International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(McMillan, Sarah)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting #181 Motion to Dismiss Caterpillar Inc. without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/25/2021. (NLT)
October 22, 2021 Filing 181 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Abbott, Charles)
October 12, 2021 Filing 180 Memorandum of Law Regarding Pleading and Jurisdictional Issues as Requested by the Court filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wilke, Tyler) Modified on 10/13/2021 to edit text (ELW).
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER denying #171 Motion to Amend the Pleadings. Billy Keith Jones, individually and on behalf of the late Billy Wayne Jones, shall file a brief by 10/12/2021, specifically addressing whether the First Amended Complaint is the operative pleading in this action and whether the addition of Kimberly Jones as a plaintiff requires remand of this action for lack of complete diversity. The remaining parties shall file briefs, on or before 10/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 09/27/2021. (NLT)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting #173 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Amber L. Stewart as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/14/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting #174 MOTION to Substitute Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw Counsel of Record (Rec. Doc. 173) filed by International Paper Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/14/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
September 14, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #174 MOTION to Substitute Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw Counsel of Record (Rec. Doc. 173) . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting #175 Motion to Dismiss. The claims of Plaintiffs, Billy Keith Jones, Martin Jones, Barbara Lee and Kimberly Jones, individually and on behalf of the late Billy Wayne Jones (Plaintiffs), against Defendant, The J.R. Clarkson Company LLC, successor to The Kunkle Valve Company, and successor to J.E. Lonergan Company (Clarkson), be dismissed without prejudice, and with each party to bear its own costs, specifically reserving to Plaintiffs all rights to prosecute claims and/or actions against all other defendants, third parties, solidary obligors, and other persons and/or entities. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 9/13/2021. (EDC)
September 13, 2021 Filing 175 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Plaintiffs, Billy Keith Jones, Martin Jones, Barbara Lee and Kimberly Jones, individually and on behalf of the late Billy Wayne Jones, and by The J. R. Clarkson Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bowlin, Angela)
September 13, 2021 Filing 174 MOTION to Substitute Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw Counsel of Record (Rec. Doc. 173) by International Paper Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw Amber L. Stewart as Counsel of Record, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order on Motion to Substitute)(Arthur, Mary)
September 10, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #173 Ex Parte MOTION for Amber L. Stewart to Withdraw as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
September 9, 2021 Filing 173 Ex Parte MOTION for Amber L. Stewart to Withdraw as Attorney by International Paper Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; on Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw Amber L. Stewart as Counsel of Record)(Arthur, Mary)
September 8, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #171 First MOTION to Amend Pleading. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
September 3, 2021 Filing 172 ANSWER to #147 Amended Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Jalenak, Jay)
August 27, 2021 Filing 171 First MOTION to Amend Pleading by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Wilke, Tyler)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting #168 Motion for Partial Dismissal. The claims of Plaintiff, Billy Keith Jones, individually and on behalf of Decedent, Billy Wayne Jones against Defendant, General Electric Company, be dismissed without prejudice, and with each party to bear its own costs, specifically reserving to Plaintiff all rights to prosecute claims and/or actions against all other defendants, third parties,solidary obligors, and other persons and/or entities. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 8/13/2021. (EDC)
August 11, 2021 Filing 169 ANSWER to #147 Amended Complaint by Navistar, Inc..(Baxter, Kay)
August 10, 2021 Filing 168 Joint MOTION to Dismiss without prejudice, by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Prop Order)(McCoy, Lacey) Modified on 8/11/2021to edit text (ELW).
August 9, 2021 Filing 167 ANSWER to #147 Amended Complaint by International Paper Company.(Stewart, Amber)
August 4, 2021 Filing 166 ANSWER to #147 Amended Complaint by Mack Trucks, Inc..(Hays, Bradley)
August 3, 2021 Filing 165 ANSWER to #147 First Amended Complaint for Damages for Wrongful Death and Survival Action by The J. R. Clarkson Company.(Bowlin, Angela) Modified on 8/9/2021 to edit the text (NLT).
August 2, 2021 Filing 164 ANSWER to #147 Amended Complaint by Caterpillar, Inc..(Abbott, Charles)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 PATHOLOGY ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/26/2021. (ELW)
July 27, 2021 Filing 162 ANSWER to #147 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Honeywell International Inc..(McMillan, Sarah)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 SCHEDULING ORDER: In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Discovery due by 11/12/2021. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 9/24/2021. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 10/29/2021. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 11/2/2021. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 12/10/2021. Discovery from Experts due by 1/14/2022. Motions shall be filed by 2/18/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/30/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2022 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 9/9/2022. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 8/22/2022. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 9/9/2022. Jury Trial set for 10/3/2022 through 10/7/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Jury Trial set for 10/11/2022 through 10/14/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Jury Trial set for 10/17/2022 through 10/21/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Jury Trial set for 10/24/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 07/26/2021. (ELW)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting #159 Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Pathology Order Regarding Billy Wayne Jones' Pathology Materials. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 07/26/2021. (ELW) Modified on 7/28/2021 to edit the text (NLT).
July 26, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #159 Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Pathology Order Regarding Billy Wayne Jones' Pathology Materials. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
July 23, 2021 Filing 159 Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Pathology Order Regarding Billy Wayne Jones' Pathology Materials by Honeywell International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(McMillan, Sarah) Modified on 7/26/2021 to edit text (ELW).
July 23, 2021 Filing 158 Joint STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs and by All Defendants. (McMillan, Sarah)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting #156 Motion to Dismiss Defendant, The McCarty Corporation. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 07/21/2021. (ELW)
July 21, 2021 Filing 156 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by The McCarty Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Kinler, Douglas) Modified on 7/26/2021 to edit the text (NLT).
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting #154 Motion for Partial Dismissal, without prejudice, by Plaintiff Billy Keith Jones Individually and on behalf of the late Billy Wayne Jones, as to CBS Corporation. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/21/2021. (LLH)
July 21, 2021 Filing 154 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCoy, Lacey) Modified on 7/21/2021 to edit text (ELW).
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER of DISMISSAL : The #152 Motion for Partial Dismissal is GRANTED all claims against Defendant, John Crane Inc., are hereby dismissed, without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 07/20/2021. (ELW)
July 20, 2021 Filing 152 MOTION for Dismissal Without Prejudice by John Crane, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Hays, Bradley) Modified on 7/20/2021 to edit text (ELW).
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting #150 First MOTION to Substitute Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Damages for Wrongful Death and Survival Action filed by Billy Keith Jones, Kimberly Jones, Martin Jones, Barbara Lee. The Clerk's Office shall substitute the attached First Amended Complaint (R. Doc. 150-2) in place of the original First Amended Complaint (R. Doc. 147) incorrectly filed as a legal size document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/19/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
July 15, 2021 Filing 150 First MOTION to Substitute Plaintiff's First #147 Amended Complaint for Damages for Wrongful Death and Survival Action by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order to Substitute Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed First Amended Complaint)(Wilke, Tyler) Modified on 7/15/2021 to create linkage (ELW).
July 15, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #150 First MOTION to Substitute Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Damages for Wrongful Death and Survival Action . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting #148 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice. All claims asserted herein by Plaintiffs against Lamons, only, be and the same are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 07/14/2021. (NLT)
July 14, 2021 Filing 148 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Lamons Gasket Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Rand, Kenan)
July 14, 2021 Filing 147 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages for Wrongful Death and Survival Action against All Defendants, filed by Billy Keith Jones.(Wilke, Tyler) Modified on 7/19/2021 to replace document as per Order #151 (LLH).
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting #144 Motion to Dismiss Morse TEC LLC f/k/a BorgWarner MorseTEC LLC, and Successor-by-Merger to Borg-Warner Corporation,without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 06/29/2021. (NLT)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #143 Motion to Continue Trial Date and Extend Current Scheduling Order Deadlines. The deadline to amend pleadings is due by 7/16/2021. Joint Status Report due by 7/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/28/2021. (EDC)
June 28, 2021 Filing 144 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Morse Tec, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Hays, Bradley)
June 7, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #143 Uncontested MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Extend Current Scheduling Order Deadlines. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
June 4, 2021 Filing 143 Uncontested MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Extend Current Scheduling Order Deadlines by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Wilke, Tyler) Modified on 6/7/2021 to edit the docket text (SWE).
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting #141 Motion to Dismiss. The McCarty Corporation, only, are hereby dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs, and specifically reserving to Plaintiffs all rights, claims, and causes of action which they may have against all other parties, defendants, and obligors whether named or unnamed in this litigation. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 06/02/2021. (ELW)
June 2, 2021 Filing 141 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by The McCarty Corporation. (Attachments: #1 proposed order)(Kinler, Douglas)
May 28, 2021 Filing 140 Witness List by Morse Tec, LLC. (For your free look at document, enter your Individual PACER login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Hays, Bradley)
May 28, 2021 Filing 139 Witness List by Industrial Holdings Corporation. (For your free look at document, enter your Individual PACER login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Napolitano, Shelley)
May 28, 2021 Filing 138 Witness List by Cummins, Inc.. (For your free look at document, enter your Individual PACER login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Oser, Daniel)
May 28, 2021 Filing 137 Witness List by International Paper Company. (For your free look at document, enter your Individual PACER login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Arthur, Mary)
May 28, 2021 Filing 136 Exhibit List by International Paper Company.. (Arthur, Mary)
May 28, 2021 Filing 135 Witness List by Mack Trucks, Inc.. (For your free look at document, enter your Individual PACER login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Bourbon, Alexandra)
May 28, 2021 Filing 134 Exhibit List by The J. R. Clarkson Company.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Bowlin, Angela)
May 28, 2021 Filing 133 Witness List by The J. R. Clarkson Company. (For your free look at document, enter your Individual PACER login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Bowlin, Angela)
May 28, 2021 Filing 132 Witness List by John Crane, Inc.. (For your free look at document, enter your Individual PACER login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Corb, Natasha)
May 28, 2021 Filing 131 Exhibit List by John Crane, Inc... (Corb, Natasha)
May 27, 2021 Filing 130 Witness List by Navistar, Inc.. (For your free look at document, enter your Individual PACER login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Baxter, Kay)
May 27, 2021 Filing 129 Witness List by Grinnell, LLC. (For your free look at document, enter your Individual PACER login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Semlinger, Lauren)
May 27, 2021 Filing 128 Exhibit List by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc... (Lightfoot, Christopher)
May 27, 2021 Filing 127 Witness List by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.. (For your free look at document, enter your Individual PACER login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Lightfoot, Christopher)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting #123 Motion to Dismiss. All claims of Plaintiff,Billy Keith Jones, individually and on behalf of the late Billy Wayne Jones, against Defendant, DCo, LLC, only, in the above-captioned matter, be, and hereby are dismissed, without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs, and, specifically reserving to Plaintiff, all rights to prosecute claims and/or actions against all defendants, solidary obligors, and other personsand/or entities named or not named herein. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 5/25/2021. (EDC)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting #124 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs claims against Anco Insulations, Inc., be and are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 5/24/2021. (KMW)
May 24, 2021 Filing 124 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims against Anco Insulations, Inc., by Anco Insulations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Joffe, Margaret)
May 18, 2021 Filing 123 Joint MOTION to Dismiss DCo, LLC by DCO, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Barlow, Amber)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting in part #119 Joint Motion and Order to Withdraw and to Substitute Counsel and Firm of Record. Attorneys Kenan S. Rand, Jr. and Kay B. Baxter are substituted as counsel for Defendant Lamons Gasket Company replacing Scott H. Mason, Lauren B. Dietzen, and Meredith R. Durham. The motion is denied as to Jay R. Boltin and Zackary A. Paal as the Court's records indicate these attorneys are suspended for fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/12/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting #120 Motion to Amend Joint Motion and Order to Withdraw and to Substiute Counsel and Firm of Record. The Clerk's Office shall substitute R. Doc. 120-1 in place of R. Doc. 119. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/12/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
May 6, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #120 MOTION to Amend #119 Joint MOTION for Scott H. Mason, Lauren B. Dietzen, and Meredith R. Durham to Withdraw as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
May 5, 2021 Filing 120 MOTION to Amend #119 Joint MOTION for Scott H. Mason, Lauren B. Dietzen, and Meredith R. Durham to Withdraw as Attorney by Lamons Gasket Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Rand, Kenan)
May 5, 2021 Filing 119 Joint MOTION for Scott H. Mason, Lauren B. Dietzen, and Meredith R. Durham to Withdraw as Attorney by Lamons Gasket Company. (Rand, Kenan)
May 5, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #119 Joint MOTION for Scott H. Mason, Lauren B. Dietzen, and Meredith R. Durham to Withdraw as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting #102 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against CNH be and are hereby dismissed without prejudice and at each party's own cost, reserving to plaintiff all rights to proceed against other parties. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 4/26/2021. (EDC)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #116 Motion to Dismiss. All claims of plaintiff, Billy Keith Jones, individually and on behalf of the late Billy Wayne Jones against Pneumo Abex LLC only, be and the same are hereby dismissed, without prejudice, each party to bear its own costs, and specifically reserving to plaintiff's all rights to prosecute claims and/or actions against all other defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 4/26/2021. (EDC)
April 23, 2021 Filing 116 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Pneumo Abex Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Harrison, William)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #114 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Against PACCAR Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 4/21/2021. (SWE)
April 21, 2021 Filing 114 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Against Paccar Inc. by Paccar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment proposed Order)(Hays, Bradley) Modified on 4/21/2021 to edit text. (EDC).
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #112 Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel. Attorney Alexandra D. Bourbon is substituted as co-counsel for defendant Paccar, Inc. replacing Erika M. Cunningham. The #110 Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/31/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
March 31, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #112 MOTION to Substitute Alexandra D. Bourbon in place of Erika M. Cunningham as Attorney (supplement to Doc. #110). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
March 30, 2021 Filing 112 MOTION to Substitute Alexandra D. Bourbon in place of Erika M. Cunningham as Attorney (supplement to Doc. #110) by Paccar, Inc.. (Hays, Bradley)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #109 Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel. Attorney Alexandra D. Bourbon is enrolled as co-counsel for defendant Mack Trucks, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/30/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
March 26, 2021 Filing 110 MOTION to Substitute Alexandra D. Bourbon in place of Erika M. Cunningham as Attorney by Paccar, Inc.. (Hays, Bradley)
March 26, 2021 Filing 109 MOTION to Enroll Alexandra D. Bourbon as Additional Attorney by Mack Trucks, Inc.. (Hays, Bradley)
March 26, 2021 Filing 108 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DCO, LLC. (Harrison, William)
March 26, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #109 MOTION to Enroll Alexandra D. Bourbon as Additional Attorney , #110 MOTION to Substitute Alexandra D. Bourbon in place of Erika M. Cunningham as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
March 22, 2021 Filing 107 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Industrial Holdings Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc for Industrial Holdings Corporation.. (Napolitano, Shelley)
March 17, 2021 Filing 106 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Pneumo Abex Corporation. (Harrison, William) Modified on 3/18/2021 to edit the docket text (KMW).
March 12, 2021 Filing 105 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cummins, Inc.. (Oser, Daniel)
March 4, 2021 Filing 104 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The McCarty Corporation. (Kinler, Douglas)
March 4, 2021 Filing 103 ANSWER to Petition for Damages by The McCarty Corporation.(Kinler, Douglas) Modified on 3/4/2021 to edit the docket text (KMW).
February 26, 2021 Filing 102 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against CNH Industrial America LLC by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Wilke, Tyler)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #98 Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel. Attorneys Peter Ashley Bourgeois and Christopher A Meeks sre substituted as counsel for Defendant Crown, Cork & Seal Company, Inc. replacing Michael D. Lonegrass. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 2/25/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
February 19, 2021 Filing 100 Notice of Service of Plaintiffs' Objections and Answers to Defendant CNH Industrial Interrogatories & Requests for Production by Billy Keith Jones (Wilke, Tyler) Modified on 2/19/2021 to edit the docket text (KMW).
February 16, 2021 Filing 99 NOTICE of Mailing of Plaintiffs' Objections and Answers to Defendant Honeywell's 1st St of Discovery to Plaintiff by Billy Keith Jones (Gettys, Lawrence)
February 16, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #98 MOTION to Enroll Additional Counsel. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
February 15, 2021 Filing 98 MOTION to Enroll Additional Counsel by Crown, Cork & Seal Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lonegrass, Michael) Modified on 2/16/2021 to edit the docket text (KMW).
January 28, 2021 Filing 97 Summons Issued as to Claims Resolution Management Corporation. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (EDC)
January 28, 2021 Filing 96 Summons Submitted (McMillan, Sarah)
January 27, 2021 Filing 95 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Claims Resolution Management Corporation, filed by Honeywell International Inc..(KMW)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #93 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint Against Claims Resolution Management Corporation filed by Honeywell International Inc. No opposition was noted in the motion. The Clerk shall file R. Doc. 93-3. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/27/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
January 15, 2021 Filing 93 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint Against Claims Resolution Management Corporation by Honeywell International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Proposed Pleading;)(McMillan, Sarah)
January 15, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #93 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint Against Claims Resolution Management Corporation. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
January 5, 2021 Filing 92 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc. for CBS Corporation.. (McCoy, Lacey)
January 5, 2021 Filing 91 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by CBS Corporation.(McCoy, Lacey) Modified on 1/5/2021 to edit text (ELW).
January 4, 2021 Filing 90 ANSWER to Complaint by Cummins, Inc..(Oser, Daniel)
December 31, 2020 Filing 89 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Morse Tec, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Borg-Warner Corporation for Morse Tec, LLC. (Hays, Bradley)
December 22, 2020 Filing 88 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Petition for Damages with Jury Demand by Morse Tec, LLC.(Hays, Bradley) Modified on 12/23/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW).
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #83 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Defendant CBS Corporation is granted an extension of 21 days from the date responsive pleadings were due to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/22/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
December 17, 2020 Filing 86 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand of Plaintiffs by DCO, LLC.(Harrison, William)
December 17, 2020 Filing 85 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand of Plaintiffs by Pneumo Abex Corporation.(Harrison, William)
December 16, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #83 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
December 15, 2020 Filing 84 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Petition for Damages for Wrongful Death and Survival Action by Industrial Holdings Corporation.(Napolitano, Shelley) Modified on 12/16/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW).
December 15, 2020 Filing 83 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCoy, Lacey) Modified on 12/22/2020 to edit event type (SGO).
December 15, 2020 Filing 82 ANSWER to Complaint by Grinnell, LLC.(Semlinger, Lauren)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #48 Motion to Dismiss. The Dow Chemical Company only, is dismissed without prejudice with each party to bear its owncosts. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 12/7/2020. (ELW)
December 7, 2020 Filing 80 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Billy Keith Jones. Morse Tec, LLC served on 12/4/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Wilke, Tyler)
December 7, 2020 Filing 79 ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiffs by Anco Insulations, Inc..(Joffe, Margaret)
December 4, 2020 Filing 78 Summons Issued as to Morse Tec, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LLH)
December 3, 2020 Filing 77 Summons Submitted (Wilke, Tyler) Modified on 12/4/2020 to flatten and replace (LLH).
December 3, 2020 Filing 76 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Billy Keith Jones. Cummins, Inc. served on 12/2/2020, answer due 12/23/2020. (Wilke, Tyler)
December 2, 2020 Filing 75 Memorandum in Response to #55 Order to Show Cause filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Wilke, Tyler) Modified on 12/3/2020 to edit text. (EDC).
December 2, 2020 Filing 74 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Billy Keith Jones. The McCarty Corporation served on 11/24/2020, answer due 12/15/2020. (Wilke, Tyler)
December 2, 2020 Filing 73 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Billy Keith Jones. Anco Insulations, Inc. served on 11/24/2020, answer due 12/15/2020. (Wilke, Tyler)
November 30, 2020 Filing 72 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Billy Keith Jones. DCO, LLC served on 11/25/2020, answer due 12/16/2020. (Wilke, Tyler)
November 30, 2020 Filing 71 Summons Issued as to Cummins, Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
November 30, 2020 Filing 70 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Billy Keith Jones. Pneumo Abex Corporation served on 11/24/2020, answer due 12/15/2020. (Wilke, Tyler) (Main Document 70 replaced on 11/30/2020) (KMW).
November 30, 2020 Filing 69 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Billy Keith Jones. (Wilke, Tyler)
November 30, 2020 Filing 68 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Billy Keith Jones. Grinnell, LLC served on 11/24/2020, answer due 12/15/2020. (Wilke, Tyler) (Main Document 68 replaced on 11/30/2020) (ELW). Modified on 11/30/2020 to flatten document (ELW).
November 30, 2020 Filing 67 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Billy Keith Jones. CBS Corporation served on 11/24/2020, answer due 12/15/2020. (Wilke, Tyler) (Main Document 67 replaced on 11/30/2020) (ELW). Modified on 11/30/2020 to flatten document (ELW).
November 30, 2020 Filing 66 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Billy Keith Jones. Industrial Holdings Corporation served on 11/24/2020, answer due 12/15/2020. (Wilke, Tyler)
November 30, 2020 Filing 65 Summons Submitted (Wilke, Tyler) (Main Document 65 replaced on 11/30/2020 to flatten the document) (KMW).
November 18, 2020 Filing 64 Summons Issued as to Anco Insulations, Inc., CBS Corporation, DCO, LLC, Grinnell, LLC, Industrial Holdings Corporation, Pneumo Abex Corporation, The McCarty Corporation. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
November 17, 2020 Filing 63 Summons Submitted (Wilke, Tyler) (Main Document 63 replaced on 11/18/2020 to flatten the document) (KMW).
November 17, 2020 Filing 62 Summons Submitted (Wilke, Tyler) (Main Document 62 replaced on 11/18/2020 to flatten the document) (KMW).
November 17, 2020 Filing 61 Summons Submitted (Wilke, Tyler) (Main Document 61 replaced on 11/18/2020 to flatten the document) (KMW).
November 17, 2020 Filing 60 Summons Submitted (Wilke, Tyler) (Main Document 60 replaced on 11/18/2020 to flatten the document) (KMW).
November 17, 2020 Filing 59 Summons Submitted (Wilke, Tyler) (Main Document 59 replaced on 11/18/2020 to flatten the document) (KMW).
November 17, 2020 Filing 58 Summons Submitted (Wilke, Tyler) (Main Document 58 replaced on 11/18/2020 to flatten the document) (KMW).
November 17, 2020 Filing 57 Summons Submitted (Wilke, Tyler) (Main Document 57 replaced on 11/18/2020 to flatten the document) (KMW).
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 SCHEDULING ORDER: The scheduling conference presently set for 11/19/2020 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 1/15/2021. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 11/19/2020. Discovery due by 7/2/2021. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 4/16/2021. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 5/28/2021. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 6/4/2021. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 7/16/2021. Discovery from Experts due by 9/24/2021. Motions shall be filed by 10/29/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/29/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2022 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 4/11/2022. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 3/21/2022. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 4/11/2022. Jury Trial set for 5/2/2022 to 5/20/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/12/2020. (SWE)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: On or before December 2, 2020, plaintiff shall show cause, in writing, why the claim against defendants The McCarty Corporation, Anco Insulations, Inc., DCo., LLC, Pneumo Abex, LLC, Morse TEC LLC, Industrial Holdings Corporation, Grinnell LLC, Viacom CBS, Inc., and Cummins Inc. should not be dismissed under Rule 4(l) and (m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for lack of service and/or proof of service. If proof of service is filed into the record by December 2, 2020, then no response is due from plaintiff to this order to show cause. Show Cause Response due by 12/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/12/2020. (DCB)
November 5, 2020 Filing 54 Joint STATUS REPORT by Honeywell International Inc.. (Bodin, Mark)
October 30, 2020 Filing 53 Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Crane, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Smiths Group PLC for John Crane, Inc... (Corb, Natasha)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record. Attorney Amber L. Stewart is enrolled as co-counsel for defendant International Paper Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/30/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
October 29, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION to Enroll Amber L. Stewart as Additional Attorney by International Paper Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; on Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record for Defendant International Paper Company)(Arthur, Mary)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #49 Motion to Withdraw and to Substitute Counsel and Firm of Record. Attorneys Glenn Lyle Maximilian Swetman, Christopher Owen Massenburg, Jeanette Seraile Riggins, Natasha Amber Corb, Brandie Mendoza Thibodeaux, Bradley Adam Hays, Meghan Brianne Senter, Danielle Mikel Sczesny, and Amanda Luella Deto are substituted as counsel for defendant John Crane, Inc. replacing Kenan S. Rand, Jr., Scott H. Mason, and Lauren B. Dietzen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/29/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
October 29, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #51 MOTION to Enroll Amber L. Stewart as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
October 28, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION to Substitute Glenn L. M. Swetman, Christopher O. Massenburg, Jeanette S. Riggins, Natasha A. Corb, Brandie M. Thibodeaux, B. Adam Hays, Megan B. Senter, Amanda L. Deto, Danielle M. Sczesny in place of Kenan S. Rand, Jr., Scott H. Mason, Lauren B. Dietzen as Attorney by John Crane, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Rand, Kenan)
October 28, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #49 MOTION to Substitute Glenn L. M. Swetman, Christopher O. Massenburg, Jeanette S. Riggins, Natasha A. Corb, Brandie M. Thibodeaux, B. Adam Hays, Megan B. Senter, Amanda L. Deto, Danielle M. Sczesny in place of Kenan S. Rand, Jr., Scott H. Mason, Lauren. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
October 26, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Billy Keith Jones (Wilke, Tyler) Modified on 10/27/2020 to edit the event (SWE).
October 23, 2020 Filing 47 Letter to Attorney Kenan S. Rand, Jr. regarding Meredith H. Durham who is Co-Counsel for party John Crane, Inc. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (SWE)
October 22, 2020 Filing 46 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Original Petition for Damages and Third-Party Demand against Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust by Lamons Gasket Company.(Rand, Kenan) Modified on 10/23/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW).
October 21, 2020 Filing 45 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition for Damages and Third-Party Demand against Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust by John Crane, Inc.(Rand, Kenan) Modified on 10/21/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE).
October 20, 2020 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crown, Cork & Seal Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Crown Holdings, Inc. for Crown, Cork & Seal Company, Inc.. (Lonegrass, Michael)
October 20, 2020 Filing 43 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Original Petition for Damages with Jury Demand by Crown, Cork & Seal Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Request for Notice)(Lonegrass, Michael) Modified on 10/20/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE).
October 19, 2020 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lamons Gasket Company identifying Corporate Parent TriMas Company LLC for Lamons Gasket Company. (Rand, Kenan)
September 22, 2020 Filing 41 RULING Adopting #37 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Motion to Remand #26 is hereby DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 9/22/2020. (ELW)
September 17, 2020 Filing 40 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by The J. Grave Insulation Company.(Wandell, Jade) Modified on 9/18/2020 to edit text. (EDC).
August 28, 2020 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Navistar, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Navistar International Corporation, Other Affiliate Traton, SE for Navistar, Inc... (Baxter, Kay)
August 28, 2020 Filing 38 ANSWER to Petition for Damages and Affirmative Defenses by Navistar, Inc.(Baxter, Kay) Modified on 8/28/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW).
August 18, 2020 Filing 37 MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #26 MOTION to Remand filed by Billy Keith Jones. It is the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge that the Plaintiffs Motion to Remand (R. Doc. 26) be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 9/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/18/2020. (KMW)
August 13, 2020 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The J. R. Clarkson Company identifying Corporate Parent Emerson Electric Co. for The J. R. Clarkson Company.. (Bowlin, Angela)
August 4, 2020 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM ADDRESSING THE FIFTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS DECISION IN TEXAS BRINE CO., LLC V. AMERICAN ARBITRATION ASSOCIATION; #31 Order filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Gettys, Lawrence) Modified on 8/7/2020 to edit text(ELW).
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER : The #29 Motion to Continue is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Status Report due by 11/5/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 09:00 AM in chambers before Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/3/2020. (ELW)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Tyler B. Wilke is enrolled as pro hac vice co-counsel for Plaintiff Billy Keith Jones. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/31/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
July 30, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Tyler B. Wilke to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2149142) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit Tyler B. Wilke Affidavit, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Gettys, Lawrence)
July 30, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #32 MOTION for Tyler B. Wilke to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2149142). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: After reviewing the Notice of Removal (R. Doc. 1), the pending Motion to Remand (R. Doc. 26) and the Opposition (R. Doc. 30), IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff shall file a Reply Memorandum, on or before August 5, 2020, that specifically addresses the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals decision in Texas Brine Co., LLC v. Am. Arbitration Assn, 955 F. 3d 482 (5th Cir. 2020). The Reply shall not exceed five pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/29/2020. (SGO)
July 29, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #29 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Deadlines to Hold Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference and File Status Report . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
July 28, 2020 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #26 MOTION to Remand filed by Honeywell International Inc.. (McMillan, Sarah)
July 28, 2020 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Deadlines to Hold Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference and File Status Report by Honeywell International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(McMillan, Sarah)
July 22, 2020 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc..(Lightfoot, Christopher)
July 22, 2020 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
July 10, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #26 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
July 9, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of the Motion for Remand)(Gettys, Lawrence)
July 6, 2020 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caterpillar, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Caterpillar Inc. for Caterpillar, Inc... (Abbott, Charles)
July 6, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint by Caterpillar, Inc..(Abbott, Charles)
July 2, 2020 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CNH Industrial America, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Case New Holland Industrial Inc., Other Affiliate CNH Industrial N.V. for CNH Industrial America, LLC.. (O'Cain, Patrick)
July 2, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by CNH Industrial America, LLC.(O'Cain, Patrick)
July 2, 2020 Filing 21 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs, filed by Honeywell International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit GE Consent to Removal, #3 Exhibit International Paper Consent to Removal)(McMillan, Sarah)
July 1, 2020 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paccar, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Paccar Inc for Paccar, Inc.. (Cunningham, Erika)
July 1, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by Paccar, Inc..(Cunningham, Erika)
June 30, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint for Wrongful Death and Survival Action by The J. R. Clarkson Company.(Bowlin, Angela)
June 29, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER and Defenses to Petition for Damages by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Jalenak, Jay) Modified on 6/30/2020 to edit text. (EDC).
June 29, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Jalenak, Jay)
June 26, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mack Trucks, Inc. (Senter, Meghan)
June 26, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Petition for Damages by Mack Trucks, Inc.(Senter, Meghan) Modified on 6/29/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW).
June 26, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint Petition for Damages and Affirmative Defenses by Union Carbide Corporation.(Foundas, Ernest)
June 26, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent The Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation.. (Foundas, Ernest)
June 25, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by International Paper Company. (Penn, Elizabeth)
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Petition for Damages by International Paper Company.(Penn, Elizabeth) Modified on 6/26/2020 to edit text. (EDC).
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Petition for Damages with Jury Demand by General Electric Company.(McCoy, Lacey) Modified on 6/26/2020 to edit text. (EDC).
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (McCoy, Lacey)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1653, on or before 7/2/2020 the removing defendants shall file an amended notice of removal providing the citizenship of DCO, LLC, Grinnell, LLC, and Morse TEC, LLC, by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Amended Pleadings due by 7/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/18/2020. (KMW)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2020 at 09:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 8/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/15/2020. (SGO)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs, filed by Honeywell International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit Consent to Removal by General Electric, #3 Exhibit Consent to Removal by International Paper)(McMillan, Sarah)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 Letter to Attorney Lawrence G. Gettys regarding Tyler B. Wilke who is Co-Counsel for party Billy Keith Jones,Individually and on behalf of Billy Wayne Jones. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (EDC)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International Inc. (McMillan, Sarah)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Petition for Damages and Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Honeywell International Inc..(McMillan, Sarah) Modified on 6/10/2020 to edit text. (EDC).
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, Case Number 696775. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2125212), filed by Honeywell International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(McMillan, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Caterpillar, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNH Industrial America, LLC
Represented By: Patrick J. O'Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anco Insulations, Inc.
Represented By: Etienne Francis Rene
Represented By: Douglas R. Elliott
Represented By: Margaret Moran Joffe
Represented By: Jamie H. Baglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The McCarty Corporation
Represented By: Douglas R. Kinler
Represented By: Douglas W. Redfearn
Represented By: James Richard Guidry
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Shelley Kathryn Napolitano
Represented By: Rebecca Abbott Zotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morse Tec, LLC
Represented By: Bradley Adam Hays
Represented By: Meghan Brianne Senter
Represented By: Christopher Owen Massenburg
Represented By: Jeanette Seraile Riggins
Represented By: Vikram S. Bhatia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The J. Grave Insulation Company
Represented By: Jade Marguerite Wandell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelsey Anne Eagan
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelly Lorraine Long
Represented By: Lacey T McCoy
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: John J. Hainkel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The J. R. Clarkson Company
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelly Lorraine Long
Represented By: Lacey T McCoy
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: John J. Hainkel, III
Represented By: Kelsey Anne Eagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mack Trucks, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley Adam Hays
Represented By: Meghan Brianne Senter
Represented By: Christopher Owen Massenburg
Represented By: Jeanette Seraile Riggins
Represented By: Alexandra D. Bourbon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Edward J. Lassus, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Represented By: Richard J. Garvey, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar, Inc.
Represented By: Kay Barnes Baxter
Represented By: Jay Richard Boltin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell, LLC
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch Semlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Mary Arthur
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Represented By: Amber L. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick D. Roquemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas A. Porteous
Represented By: Joseph Henry Hart, IV
Represented By: Daniel Edwin Oser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: William C. Harrison, Jr.
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: Amber Brianne Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paccar, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley Adam Hays
Represented By: Meghan Brianne Senter
Represented By: Christopher Owen Massenburg
Represented By: Erika Mullenbach Cunningham
Represented By: Jeanette Seraile Riggins
Represented By: Alexandra D. Bourbon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Louise Maccherone
Represented By: Charles H. Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCO, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: William C. Harrison, Jr.
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: Amber Brianne Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Kathleen Jordan
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Represented By: Ernest G. Foundas
Represented By: David M. Stein
Represented By: Francis Xavier DeBlanc, III
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelsey Anne Eagan
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: Kelly Lorraine Long
Represented By: Lacey T McCoy
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: John J. Hainkel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamons Gasket Company
Represented By: Lauren B. Dietzen
Represented By: Kenan S. Rand, Jr
Represented By: Scott H. Mason
Represented By: Kay Barnes Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown, Cork & Seal Company, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Lonegrass
Represented By: Peter Ashley Bourgeois
Represented By: Christopher A Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth McMillan
Represented By: Deirdre C. McGlinchey
Represented By: Mark N. Bodin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley Adam Hays
Represented By: Meghan Brianne Senter
Represented By: Jeanette Seraile Riggins
Represented By: Lauren B. Dietzen
Represented By: Christopher Owen Massenburg
Represented By: Kenan S. Rand, Jr
Represented By: Brandie Mendoza Thibodeaux
Represented By: Scott H. Mason
Represented By: Amanda Luella Deto
Represented By: Danielle Mikel Sczesny
Represented By: Glenn Lyle Maximilian Swetman
Represented By: Natasha Amber Corb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Keith Jones
Represented By: Lawrence G. Gettys
Represented By: Tyler B Wilke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Jones
Represented By: Lawrence G. Gettys
Represented By: Tyler B Wilke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Lee
Represented By: Lawrence G. Gettys
Represented By: Tyler B Wilke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Jones
Represented By: Lawrence G. Gettys
Represented By: Tyler B Wilke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Claims Resolution Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?