Rodas v. Henry Power Electric, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cesar Rodas
Defendant: Henry Castillo and Henry Power Electric, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00353
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (SWE)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A). Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 8/6/2020. (SWE)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cesar Rodas (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Davis, Daniel) Modified on 8/6/2020 to correct event type. (EDC).
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2020 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 8/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/15/2020. (SGO)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Henry Castillo, Henry Power Electric, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LT)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Henry Castillo, Henry Power Electric, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2125590.), filed by Cesar Rodas. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons, #3 Attachment Summons)(Davis, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodas v. Henry Power Electric, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Rodas
Represented By: Daniel Brian Davis
Represented By: Randall Eugene Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Power Electric, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?