Campana v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Courtney Campana
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00402
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by Courtney Campana. (Hooks, Kenneth) Modified on 8/20/2020 to edit the text (NLT).
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record as Attorney Ryan M. Hall is not admitted in this district. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/31/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
July 20, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Enroll Ryan M. Hall as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Enroll Ryan M. Hall as Additional Attorney by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Miles, Stephen)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/3/2020 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 8/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/8/2020. (SGO)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER, Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Miles, Stephen) Modified on 7/6/2020 to edit text (ELW).
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by USAA Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent USAA for USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Ross, Emily)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Compliance by USAA Casualty Insurance Company to #1 Notice of Removal, (Ross, Emily)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number C-696255. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2132571), filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Service of Process, #3 Exhibit C - LDI Website, #4 Exhibit D - Certified Policy, #5 Exhibit E - Plaintiff's Demands, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Notice to Adverse Party)(Ross, Emily) (Attachment 5 replaced on 6/25/2020) (ELW). Modified on 6/25/2020 to rotate pages (ELW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campana v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen L. Miles
Represented By: H. Minor Pipes, III
Represented By: Emily Ellis Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Campana
Represented By: Kenneth H. Hooks, III
Represented By: Henry Price Mounger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?