Falk v. First Acceptance Insurance Company of Georgia, Inc.
Plaintiff: David Falk
Defendant: Steadfast Insurance Company, First Acceptance Insurance Company of Georgia, Emanuel Coates and First Acceptance Insurance Company of Georgia, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00403
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT by David Falk. (Andrews, Brandon)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The motion is not necessary as Mr. Nash is not an enrolled attorney. Counsel of record are reflected on the docket sheet. No further action from the Clerk's Office is necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/21/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
July 20, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION for J. Michael Nash to Withdraw as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for J. Michael Nash to Withdraw as Attorney by First Acceptance Insurance Company of Georgia, Inc.. (Ungarino, Matthew)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/3/2020 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 8/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/8/2020. (SGO)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 MOTION to Substitute Pleading and Amend Caption filed by Steadfast Insurance Company. The Clerk's Office shall file the Amended Notice of Removal, R. Doc. 4-2, into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 7/2/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
June 30, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Substitute Pleading and Amend Caption. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Substitute Pleading and Amend Caption by Steadfast Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Albert, Andrea) Modified on 6/30/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW).
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 Letter to Attorney Matthew J. Ungarino regarding J. Michael Nash who is Co-Counsel for party First Acceptance Insurance Company of Georgia, Inc. and Emanuel Coates. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KMW)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Andrea L. Albert regarding Stephen J. Eckholdt who is Co-Counsel for party Steadfast Insurance Company. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KMW)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court; East Baton Rouge Parish, Case Number C-684698. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2132812), filed by Steadfast Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet - List of Parties, #6 Exhibit Consent for Removal)(Albert, Andrea) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/2/2020 in accordance with RD 5) (KMW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Falk v. First Acceptance Insurance Company of Georgia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steadfast Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Acceptance Insurance Company of Georgia
Represented By: Matthew J. Ungarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emanuel Coates
Represented By: Matthew J. Ungarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Acceptance Insurance Company of Georgia, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Ungarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Falk
Represented By: Joseph Edwin Windmeyer, Jr.
Represented By: Kirk Andrew Guidry
Represented By: Brandon Scott Andrews
Represented By: Charles Scott Courrege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?