Woodrow v. Galicia et al
Plaintiff: James C. Woodrow
Defendant: County Hall Insurance Company, Inc., TT Express, LLC, E.T.C., Inc., Jorge Umana Galicia and Union Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00529
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 Return on Electronic Transfer from Eastern District of Louisiana. (LLH)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 Extraction Log of a case Transferred to Eastern District of Louisiana. (EDC)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (EDC)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Transfer Case. Case transferred to District of Eastern District of Louisiana. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 9/10/2020. (EDC)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by County Hall Insurance Company, Inc., E.T.C., Inc., Jorge Umana Galicia, TT Express, LLC.(Melchi, Kevin)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TT Express, LLC. (Melchi, Kevin)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by E.T.C., Inc.. (Melchi, Kevin)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by County Hall Insurance Company, Inc.. (Melchi, Kevin)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 Consent to Removal by Union Insurance Company (Melchi, Kevin)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Louisiana by County Hall Insurance Company, Inc., E.T.C., Inc., Jorge Umana Galicia, TT Express, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support, #2 Attachment Order)(Melchi, Kevin)
August 17, 2020 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Judge John W. deGravelles no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EDC)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Parish of Tangipahoa, Case Number 2020-000125. (), filed by TT Express, LLC, E.T.C., Inc., Jorge Umana Galicia, County Hall Insurance Company, Inc..(Melchi, Kevin)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Civil Cover Sheet and State Court Petition to NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Parish of Tangipahoa, Case Number 2020-0001125. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2157072), filed by TT Express, LLC, E.T.C., Inc., Jorge Umana Galicia, County Hall Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition)(Melchi, Kevin) Modified on 8/17/2020 to edit text. (EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodrow v. Galicia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Hall Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Loeb
Represented By: Kevin M. Melchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TT Express, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Loeb
Represented By: Kevin M. Melchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.T.C., Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Loeb
Represented By: Kevin M. Melchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Umana Galicia
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Loeb
Represented By: Kevin M. Melchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Insurance Company
Represented By: Alan John Yacoubian
Represented By: Neal J. Favret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C. Woodrow
Represented By: Jonathan E Mitchell
Represented By: Michael Carter Palmintier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?