Russell Coleman Contracting, Inc. v. ELA Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Russell Coleman Contracting, Inc. and Russell Coleman Contacting, Inc.
Defendant: United Fire and Casualty Company, ELA Group Inc. and ELA Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00531
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Russell Coleman Contacting, Inc.. All Defendants. (Kaster, Craig)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Russell Coleman Contacting, Inc. (Kaster, Craig)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr.. Status Report due by 11/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/11/2020. (EDC)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Russell Coleman Contracting, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2157259.), filed by Russell Coleman Contracting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Request for Admissions of Fact, #3 Request for Admissions of Fact, #4 Verification, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Notice of Lawsuit and Waiver of Summons)(Kaster, Craig) (Attachments 5 and 6 replaced on 8/18/2020 to correct page orientation) (KMW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell Coleman Contracting, Inc. v. ELA Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Coleman Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Lewis Kaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Coleman Contacting, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Lewis Kaster
Represented By: Teresa D. Cop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELA Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELA Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?