Louisiana Fair Housing Action Center, Inc. v. Ollie Steele Burden Manor, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Louisiana Fair Housing Action Center, Inc.
Defendant: Our Lady of the Lake Hospital, Inc., Ollie Steele Burden Manor, Inc., Plantation Management Company, L.L.C., Franciscan Missionaries of Our Lady Health System, Inc and Franciscan Mission of Our Lady of Health System, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00532
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr.. Status Report due by 11/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/11/2020. (EDC)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Franciscan Mission of Our Lady of Health System, Inc., Ollie Steele Burden Manor, Inc., Our Lady of the Lake Hospital, Inc., Plantation Management Company, L.L.C.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief, Declaratory Relief, and Damages against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2157422.), filed by Louisiana Fair Housing Action Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Owen, Elizabeth) Modified on 8/18/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2020: #2 Summons to flatten and merge summons) (KMW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louisiana Fair Housing Action Center, Inc. v. Ollie Steele Burden Manor, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Our Lady of the Lake Hospital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ollie Steele Burden Manor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plantation Management Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franciscan Missionaries of Our Lady Health System, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franciscan Mission of Our Lady of Health System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Fair Housing Action Center, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Joanne Owen
Represented By: Peter Franklin Theis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?