Diliberto v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Diliberto
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Pfizer, Inc. and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00533
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 Return on Electronic Transfer from Southern District of Florida. (LLH)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order . Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (LLH)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 Extraction Log of a case Transferred to Southern District of Florida. (LLH)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Transferring Case to JPML Court. (Attachments: #1 Certified Transfer Order)(LLH)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Conditional Transfer Order from the JPML Panel. (Attachments: #1 Minute Order) (EDC)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (KMW)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Pfizer, Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Trial Demand against BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., GLAXOSMITHKLINE,LLC, PFIZER, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2157685.), filed by JOSEPH DILIBERTO. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons Pfizer, Inc., #3 Attachment Summons-GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, #4 Attachment Summons-GlaxoSmithKline,LLC)(Landry, Jason) Modified on 8/19/2020 (NLT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diliberto v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Diliberto
Represented By: Lawrence J. Centola, III
Represented By: Jeremy James Landry
Represented By: Andrew Paul Hill
Represented By: Jason Zachary Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?