Talamo v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Bradley Talamo
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00535
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record. Attorney Travis Layne Simmons is enrolled as co-counsel for Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/7/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
October 6, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Enroll Travis L. Simmons as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Enroll Travis L. Simmons as Additional Attorney by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Chassaignac, Charles)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Chassaignac, Charles)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1653, that, on or before 10/8/2020, the removing defendant shall file an amended notice of removal providing the citizenship of plaintiff, by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Amended Pleadings due by 10/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/24/2020. (EDC)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 11/5/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 9/14/2020. (SGO)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Jake J. Weinstock who is lead counsel for party Bradley Talamo. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (EDC)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2157975.), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment State Court Record, #3 Attachment Medical Bills)(Chassaignac, Charles) Modified on 8/19/2020 to edit text. (EDC). (Attachments 1 & 2 replaced on 8/19/2020) (EDC). Modified on 8/19/2020 to rotate pages. (EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Talamo v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles L. Chassaignac, IV
Represented By: Justin Murphy DeLaune
Represented By: Kellye Rosenzweig Grinton
Represented By: Travis Layne Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Talamo
Represented By: Irvy E Cosse, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?