Coleman v. C R Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Kawanda Coleman
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated, Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc., McKesson Corporation and DOES 1 through 100 Inclusive
Not Classified By Court: Melissa Doorman Matthews and Eric Przybysz
Case Number: 3:2020cv00537
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #44 Motion to Stay. The case is further stayed for an additional ninety (90) days to allow the parties to continue to engage in discussions that may resolve this dispute entirely. On 12/28/2020 the parties will report to the Court as to whether Plaintiff intends to prosecute this case and whether the scheduling of an initial status conference will be necessary. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/6/2020. (EDC)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Steven S. Schulte to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/1/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
October 1, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #46 MOTION for Steven S. Schulte to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2179828). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
September 30, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION for Steven S. Schulte to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2179828) by Kawanda Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Pleading;)(St. Romain, Jeanne)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #38 Motion to Enroll as Attorney. Added attorney Jeanne Louise St. Romain and Lindsey A Cheek for Kawanda Coleman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/28/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
September 28, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #38 MOTION to Enroll Lindsey Cheek and Jeanne St. Romain as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
September 28, 2020 Filing 44 Joint MOTION for Temporary Stay by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc., C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Rookard, Kelly) Modified on 9/28/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE).
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #40 and #41 Motions for Lori Cohen and Sylvia Simson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/25/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
September 25, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #41 MOTION for Lori Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2177123). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
September 25, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #40 MOTION for Sylvia Simson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number BLAMDC-2177119). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Dismiss. The above-captioned case is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice as to Defendant McKesson Corporation, with each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees. This dismissal does not toll or extend any applicable statute of limitations. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 9/25/2020. (EDC)
September 25, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for Lori Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2177123) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc., C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit)(Melancon, David)
September 25, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Sylvia Simson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number BLAMDC-2177119) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc., C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing NY, #3 Certificate of Good Standing TX, #4 Affidavit)(Melancon, David)
September 24, 2020 Filing 39 Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to McKesson Corporation by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rookard, Kelly) Modified on 9/25/2020 to edit the event and docket text (SWE).
September 24, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION to Enroll Lindsey Cheek and Jeanne St. Romain as Attorney by Kawanda Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cheek, Lindsey)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Melissa Dorman Matthews as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/27/2020. (EDC)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Melissa Dorman Matthews as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/27/2020. (EDC)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Enroll as Attorney. Added attorney Kim E. Moore, David Michael Melancon, Kelly Juneau Rookard, Alison Amanda Spindler, Brian Gerard Reaney, II for McKesson Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/27/2020. (EDC)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #30 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Kim E. Moore, David M. Melancon, Kelly Juneau Rookard, Alison A. Spindler, Brian G. Reaney as Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc., C R Bard Incorporated. Added attorney Kim E. Moore,David Michael Melancon,Kelly Juneau Rookard,Brian Gerard Reaney, II for Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc., and C R Bard Incorporated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/27/2020. (LLH)
August 27, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #33 Ex Parte MOTION for Melissa Dorman Matthews to Withdraw as Attorney , #31 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Kim E. Moore, David M. Melancon, Kelly Juneau Rookard, Alison A. Spindler, Brian G. Reaney as Attorney , #30 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Kim E. Moore, David M. Melancon, Kelly Juneau Rookard, Alison A. Spindler, Brian G. Reaney as Attorney , #32 Ex Parte MOTION for Melissa Dorman Matthews to Withdraw as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
August 26, 2020 Filing 33 Ex Parte MOTION for Melissa Dorman Matthews to Withdraw as Attorney by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spindler, Alison)
August 26, 2020 Filing 32 Ex Parte MOTION for Melissa Dorman Matthews to Withdraw as Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc., C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spindler, Alison)
August 26, 2020 Filing 31 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Kim E. Moore, David M. Melancon, Kelly Juneau Rookard, Alison A. Spindler, Brian G. Reaney as Attorney by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spindler, Alison)
August 26, 2020 Filing 30 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll Kim E. Moore, David M. Melancon, Kelly Juneau Rookard, Alison A. Spindler, Brian G. Reaney as Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc., C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spindler, Alison)
August 19, 2020 Filing 29 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case. (LLH)
August 19, 2020 Filing 28 Letter to Attorney Eric Przbysz who is lead counsel for party Kawanda Coleman. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (LLH)
August 19, 2020 Filing 27 Letter to Attorney Melissa Dooroman Matthews who is lead counsel for party C R Bard, Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc., and McKesson Corporation. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (LLH)
August 18, 2020 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick and Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (LLH)
August 18, 2020 Filing 26 Case transferred in from the Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02227. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER #22 Unopposed Amended Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Kawanda Coleman's case be severed and transferred to the Baton Rouge Division of the Middle District of Louisiana (Civil case 3:20-cv-2227-S); b. Plaintiff Deborah Gaylor's case be severed and transferred to the Rochester Division of the Western District of New York (Civil case 3:20-cv-2228-S); c. Plaintiff Gary Gross's case be severed and transferred to the Jefferson City Division of the Western District of Missouri (Civil case 3:20-cv-2229-S); d. Plaintiff Teresa Kearney's case be severed and transferred to the Richmond Division of the Eastern District of Virginia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2230-S); e. Plaintiff Gary Long's case be severed and transferred to the Memphis Division of the Western District of Tennessee (Civil case 3:20-cv-2231-S); f. Plaintiff Lecia Moore's case be severed and transferred to the Hartford Division of the District of Connecticut (Civil case 3:20-cv-2232-S); g. Plaintiff Katherine Ringle's case be severed and transferred to the Kansas City Division of the District of Kansas (Civil case 3:20-cv-2233-S); h. Plaintiff Margaret Slocum's case be severed and transferred to the Detroit Division of the Eastern District of Michigan (Civil case 3:20-cv-2234-S); i. Plaintiff Jeff Waller's case be severed and transferred to the Jackson Division of the Western District of Tennessee (Civil case 3:20-cv-2235-S). Plaintiff Amanda Kozma is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, she shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/17/2020) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #22 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases, #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 23 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Kawanda Coleman, Deborah Gaylor, Gary Gross, Teresa Kearney, Amanda Kozma, Gary Long, Lecia Moore, Katherine Ringle, Margaret Slocum, Jeff Waller re #22 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 22 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Kawanda Coleman, Deborah Gaylor, Gary Gross, Teresa Kearney, Amanda Kozma, Gary Long, Lecia Moore, Katherine Ringle, Margaret Slocum, Jeff Waller (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 21 Appendix in Support filed by Kawanda Coleman, Deborah Gaylor, Gary Gross, Teresa Kearney, Amanda Kozma, Gary Long, Lecia Moore, Katherine Ringle, Margaret Slocum, Jeff Waller re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Kawanda Coleman, Deborah Gaylor, Gary Gross, Teresa Kearney, Amanda Kozma, Gary Long, Lecia Moore, Katherine Ringle, Margaret Slocum, Jeff Waller re #19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Kawanda Coleman, Deborah Gaylor, Gary Gross, Teresa Kearney, Amanda Kozma, Gary Long, Lecia Moore, Katherine Ringle, Margaret Slocum, Jeff Waller (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Kawanda Coleman, Deborah Gaylor, Gary Gross, Teresa Kearney, Amanda Kozma, Gary Long, Lecia Moore, Katherine Ringle, Margaret Slocum, Jeff Waller re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #15 Order, filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Kawanda Coleman, Deborah Gaylor, Gary Gross, Teresa Kearney, Amanda Kozma, Gary Long, Lecia Moore, Katherine Ringle, Margaret Slocum, Jeff Waller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before July 22, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (ndt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Kawanda Coleman, Deborah Gaylor, Gary Gross, Teresa Kearney, Amanda Kozma, Gary Long, Lecia Moore, Katherine Ringle, Margaret Slocum, Jeff Waller (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation Attorney Jessica Junek added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft) (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 7 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 6 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Civil action number 3:20-CV-1496-G is hereby transferred to the docket of the Honorable Karen Gren Scholer and shall henceforth carry the suffix letter "S". (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 6/9/2020) (ctf) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C. R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10900563) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement (redacted), #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - Citation Issued - C.R. Bard, Inc., #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued- Bard Peripheral, #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued - McKesson, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Executed Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Executed Return of Service - C.R. Bard Inc., #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - Executed Return of Service - Bard Peripheral) (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/18/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. C R Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Brian Gerard Reaney, II
Represented By: Lori G Cohen
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Alison Amanda Spindler
Represented By: Sylvia E. Simson
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc.
Represented By: Brian Gerard Reaney, II
Represented By: Lori G Cohen
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Alison Amanda Spindler
Represented By: Sylvia E. Simson
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Brian Gerard Reaney, II
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Alison Amanda Spindler
Represented By: Kim E. Moore
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kawanda Coleman
Represented By: Lindsey A Cheek
Represented By: Jeanne Louise St. Romain
Represented By: Steve Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Melissa Doorman Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Eric Przybysz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?