Parlange on False River, LLC et al v. Uniti Fiber, LLC
Plaintiff: Parlange on False River, LLC and Brandon Parlange
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Uniti Fiber, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: Millennium Utility Consultants, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00538
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Plead Pursuant to Local Rule 7.8. MillenniumUtility Consultants, Inc. m has until and through November 2,2020, within which to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/15/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
October 14, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead Pursuant to Local Rule 7.8. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead Pursuant to Local Rule 7.8 by Millennium Utility Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Robert) Modified on 10/14/2020 to edit text (LLH).
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Consent Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference for good cause shown. Status Report due by 11/19/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2020 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/25/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
September 25, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 Consent MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Uniti Fiber, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rauschenberger, Henry)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Millennium Utility Consultants, Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Submitted (Kilgore, Charles)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Millennium Utility Consultants, Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Submitted (Kilgore, Charles)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER, Affirmative Defenses and THIRD PARTY DEMAND against Millennium Utility Consultants, Inc. by Uniti Fiber, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kilgore, Charles) Modified on 9/16/2020 to edit text. (EDC).
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Plead, filed by Uniti Fiber, LLC pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(a). Uniti Fiber, LLC answer due 9/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 08/25/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD)
August 25, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Uniti Fiber, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rauschenberger, Henry)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 10/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/25/2020. (KMW)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 18th JDC Pointe Coupee, Case Number 49858. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2158059), filed by Uniti Fiber, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Petition for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial)(Kilgore, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parlange on False River, LLC et al v. Uniti Fiber, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parlange on False River, LLC
Represented By: Caroline Kay Darwin
Represented By: Tom Samuel Easterly
Represented By: John F. McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Parlange
Represented By: Caroline Kay Darwin
Represented By: Tom Samuel Easterly
Represented By: John F. McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Uniti Fiber, LLC
Represented By: Charles Parker Kilgore
Represented By: Henry Steven Rauschenberger
Represented By: Justin John Marocco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Millennium Utility Consultants, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Kennedy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?