Landry v. West Ascension Parish Hospital Service District
Plaintiff: Lynn Landry, Kristen LeBlanc, Rose Dorsey, April Jacobs, Trinease Sanders, Shamieka Davis, Nicole Matt, Audra Villa, Candaice Gant, Barbara Brown, Iantha Millien, Dionne Harvey, Brittany Jordan, Winnett Turner and Kristin Esquivel
Defendant: West Ascension Parish Hospital Service District d/b/a Prevost Memorial Hospital and West Ascension Parish Hospital Service District doing business as Prevost Memorial Hospital
Case Number: 3:2020cv00541
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Consent Forms by Barbara Brown, Shamieka Davis, Kristin Esquivel, Candaice Gant, Dionne Harvey, April Jacobs, Brittany Jordan, Lynn Landry, Kristen LeBlanc, Nicole Matt, Iantha Millien, Trinease Sanders, Audra Villa (Brady, Scott)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against West Ascension Parish Hospital Service District, filed by Lynn Landry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-M (Consent Forms))(Bohrer, Philip) Modified on 10/2/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW).
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynn Landry. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Brady, Scott)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Strike Notice of Appearance. The Clerk's Office is directed to strike the Notice of Appearance (R. Doc. 2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 8/27/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
August 26, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Strike 2 Notice of Appearance. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Strike 2 Notice of Appearance by Lynn Landry. (Brady, Scott) Modified on 8/26/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE).
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 10/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 8/24/2020. (KAH)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to West Ascension Parish Hospital Service District. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORDNOTICE of Appearance - Scott Brady by Lynn Landry (Brady, Scott) Modified on 8/28/2020 to remove the document in accordance with RD 6 (SWE).
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2158830.), filed by Lynn Landry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Bohrer, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landry v. West Ascension Parish Hospital Service District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Ascension Parish Hospital Service District d/b/a Prevost Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Ascension Parish Hospital Service District doing business as Prevost Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Landry
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen LeBlanc
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Dorsey
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Jacobs
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinease Sanders
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shamieka Davis
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Matt
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audra Villa
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candaice Gant
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Brown
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iantha Millien
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dionne Harvey
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Jordan
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winnett Turner
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Esquivel
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?