Armstrong v. Louisiana State Penitentiary et al
Plaintiff: Caleb Armstrong
Defendant: Department of PS & Corrections and Louisiana State Penitentiary
Case Number: 3:2020cv00545
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Documents (letter) Returned to the Inmate for Non Compliance with Local Rule 5(d)(1). Document returned electronically and original returned via USPS. (Attachments: #1 local rule 5, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(EDC)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 Letter of Deficiency: The Clerk has filed your new suit. However, it is deficient in the areas as stated herein. The deficiency must be corrected within the given time frame. Amended Pleadings due by 10/22/2020. Filing Fee due by 10/22/2020. (ELW)
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Documents (Letter) Returned to the Inmate for Non Compliance with Local Rule 5(d)(1). Document returned electronically and original returned via USPS (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 5, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(KMW)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Letter to Caleb Armstrong Re: Future Compliance with Local Rule 5(d)(1) (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 5) (KMW)
August 18, 2020 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (KMW)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of PS & Corrections, Louisiana State Penitentiary, filed by Caleb Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(KMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong v. Louisiana State Penitentiary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of PS & Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana State Penitentiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caleb Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?