McCrea v. American Millennium Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: LeAnna McCrea
Defendant: Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, American Millennium Insurance Company, Rapid Logistics, LLC, Rapid Leasing Trucking, LLC and Rapid Logistics, LLC doing business as Rapid Transport
Case Number: 3:2020cv00601
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER, Affirmative Defenses & Request for Jury Trial to #1 Complaint by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC.(Schuette, William) Modified on 11/6/2020 to edit text (LLH).
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference and Deadlines in the #3 Scheduling Conference Order for good cause shown. Status Report due by 12/3/2020. Scheduling Conference reset for 12/17/2020 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/29/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
October 28, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Related Deadlines by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Moroux, Jennifer)
October 28, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Related Deadlines . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LeAnna McCrea. American Millennium Insurance Company served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. (Moroux, Jennifer)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Unopposed MOTION for Additional Time to Respond to the Complaint of Plaintiff LeAnna McCrea for good cause. IT IS ORDERED that Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC be granted an additionalthirty (30) days or until November 6, 2020 to respond to the Complaint of Plaintiff LeAnnaMcCrea. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/7/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Additional Time to Respond to the Complaint of Plaintiff LeAnna McCrea by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Email, #2 Proposed Pleading; Judgment)(Schuette, William) Modified on 10/6/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW).
October 6, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 Unopposed MOTION for Additional Time to Respond to the Complaint of Plaintiff LeAnna McCrea. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LeAnna McCrea. Rapid Leasing Trucking, LLC served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Moroux, Jennifer)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 MOTION to Substitute Summons Return. The clerk is directed to replace R. Doc. 4 with 5-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/22/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
September 21, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Substitute Summons Return as to BATO . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
September 19, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Substitute Summons Return as to BATO by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Summons Return _BATO (letter-size), #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Moroux, Jennifer)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LeAnna McCrea. Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC served on 9/17/2020, answer due 10/8/2020. (Moroux, Jennifer) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/22/2020 in accordance with RD 6) (KMW).
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2020 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 10/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/16/2020. (EDC)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2169564.), filed by LeAnna McCrea. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment American Millennium 1, #3 Attachment American Millennium 2, #4 Attachment BATO, #5 Attachment Rapid Leasing 1, #6 Attachment Rapid Leasing 2, #7 Attachment Rapid Logistics 1, #8 Attachment Rapid Logistics 2, #9 Attachment Statement of Collateral Proceedings)(Moroux, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCrea v. American Millennium Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC
Represented By: William L. Schuette, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Millennium Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rapid Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rapid Leasing Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rapid Logistics, LLC doing business as Rapid Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LeAnna McCrea
Represented By: Jennifer Wise Moroux
Represented By: Darrel James Papillion
Represented By: James Parker Layrisson
Represented By: Renee' Chabert Crasto
Represented By: Meghan Notariano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?