Baton Rouge Ventures, LLC et al v. Cedar Grove Capital, LLC
Plaintiff: Baton Rouge Ventures, LLC and Charal Baton Rouge, LLC
Defendant: Cedar Grove Capital, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00628
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT regarding #4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Cedar Grove Capital, LLC. (Finkelstein, Michael)
November 5, 2020 Filing 15 Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Baton Rouge Ventures, LLC, Charal Baton Rouge, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment Rule 26(1)(1) Initial Disclosures)(Leonards, Ferdinand) (Main Document 15 and Attachment 1 replaced on 11/6/2020) (EDC). Modified on 11/6/2020 to put documents in correct order. (EDC).
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 7/20/2021 at 01:30 PM in chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/4/2020. (SWE)
November 4, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #11 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 25 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 10 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Deadline to join parties due by 01/11/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 3/12/2021. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 11/9/2020. Discovery due by 3/12/2021. All depositions except for expert witnesses completed by 6/12/2021. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 4/21/2021. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 5/21/2021. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 6/30/2021. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 7/30/2021. Discovery from Experts due by 10/30/2021. Motions shall be filed by 11/30/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/22/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 4/7/2022 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Judge John W. deGravelles. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 4/19/2022. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 5/3/2022. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 5/24/2022. Jury Trial set for 6/6/2022 and 6/7/2022 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge John W. deGravelles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/04/2020. (ELW)
November 4, 2020 Motions No Longer Referred: #11 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand. This motion is now pending before the USDJ. (KMW)
November 4, 2020 Motions No Longer Referred: #11 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand. This motion is now pending before the USDJ. (KDC)
November 3, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Leonards, Ferdinand) Modified on 11/3/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW).
November 3, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
November 2, 2020 Filing 10 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2020 is CANCELED. The court will issue a separate scheduling order in this matter. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
October 29, 2020 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Leonards, Ferdinand)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #7 Ex Parte Motion to Substitute Complaint for Declaratory Judgment with Amended and Restated Complaint for Declaratory Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to substitute the Amended and Restated Complaint at R. Doc. 7, pp. 4-12 in the place of the original Complaint at R. Doc. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/21/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
October 20, 2020 Filing 7 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Complaint for Declaratory Judgment with Amended and Restated Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order Granting Ex Parte Motion)(Leonards, Ferdinand)
October 20, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Complaint for Declaratory Judgment with Amended and Restated Complaint for Declaratory Judgment. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER: On or before 10/29/2020, Plaintiffs Baton Rouge Ventures, L.L.C. and Charal Baton Rouge Ventures, L.L.C. shall file a motion to substitute their Complaint with a proposed pleading that is a comprehensive amended Complaint, as written. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/19/2020. (LLH)
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cedar Grove Capital, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Aaron Gorin, Other Affiliate Steven Levitz for Cedar Grove Capital, LLC, Cedar Grove Capital, LLC.. (Finkelstein, Michael)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand against All Plaintiffs by Cedar Grove Capital, LLC.(Finkelstein, Michael) Modified on 10/14/2020 to edit text (ELW).
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2020 at 03:00 PM in chambers. Status Report due by 10/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/22/2020. (SWE)
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cedar Grove Capital, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LLH)
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Cedar Grove Capital, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2174808.), filed by Baton Rouge Ventures, LLC, Charal Baton Rouge, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit Notice of Default, #3 Exhibit Demand for Deposit, #4 Exhibit Demand for Deposit - Escrow Agent, #5 Exhibit Response to Demand for Deposit, #6 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Attachment Summons)(Baringer, Dale) Modified on 9/22/2020 to rotate and replace attachment #1 (LLH). (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/23/2020) (EDC). Modified on 10/23/2020 in accordance with record document 8.(EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baton Rouge Ventures, LLC et al v. Cedar Grove Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedar Grove Capital, LLC
Represented By: Marcia Suzanne Montero
Represented By: Michael Sam Finkelstein
Represented By: Scott L Sternberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baton Rouge Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Dale R. Baringer
Represented By: Ferdinand P Leonards
Represented By: Benjamin John Barrow Klein
Represented By: William H. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charal Baton Rouge, LLC
Represented By: Dale R. Baringer
Represented By: Ferdinand P Leonards
Represented By: Benjamin John Barrow Klein
Represented By: William H. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?