Atchafalaya Basinkeeper et al v. Bernhardt et al
Plaintiff: Healthy Gulf, Harold Schoeffler, Atchafalaya Basinkeeper, Ronald Nowak, Sierra Club, Public Employees for Environmental Responsibility, Louisiana Crawfish Producers Association-West and Michael Caire
Defendant: David Bernhardt and Aurelia Skipwith
Petitioner: Safari Club International
Case Number: 3:2020cv00651
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Transfer Venue to the District of Columbia filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A to Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue (Judicial Statistics), #2 Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue)(Mitchell, Misha)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #8 Motion for a Temporary Stay of Proceedings and Certain Pending Deadlines. All currently pending deadlines, with the exception of the deadline for Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' #5 Motion to Transfer are STAYED pending this Court's decision on Defendants' Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 11/24/2020. (LLH)
November 18, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #15 MOTION to Intervene . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
November 17, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Intervene by Safari Club International. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Pleading;, #7 Proposed Order)(Clare, Jeremy)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying without prejudice #11 Motion to Intervene of Safari Club International for failure to comply with the court's administrative procedures when seeking leave of court. The Answer by Safari Club International to Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (R. Doc. 12) is hereby STRICKEN from the record for failure to comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 24. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/17/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw a Pending Motion. The #7 Motion to Intervene is hereby withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/16/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
November 13, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 MOTION to Intervene , #10 MOTION to Withdraw #7 MOTION to Intervene . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
November 12, 2020 Filing 12 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Safari Club International.(Kennedy, Richard) Modified on 11/18/2020 to remove the document as it has been stricken in accordance with record document 14.(EDC).
November 12, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Intervene by Safari Club International. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Richard)
November 12, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw #7 MOTION to Intervene by Safari Club International. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Richard)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Jeremy Clare to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/12/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
November 12, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Intervene . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
November 12, 2020 Notice of Payment of $100.00 Pro Hac Vice Fee by Safari Club International. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ALAMDC-2200470. (Kennedy, Richard)
November 12, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 Pro Hac Vice MOTION for Admission of Jeremy Clare as Visiting Attorney. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Temporary Stay of Proceedings and Certain Pending Deadlines by David Bernhardt, Aurelia Skipwith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Finnegan, Alison) Modified on 11/12/2020 to edit text. (EDC).
November 10, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Intervene by Safari Club International. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Pleading;, #6 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Richard)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 Pro Hac Vice MOTION for Admission of Jeremy Clare as Visiting Attorney by Safari Club International. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Kennedy, Richard) Modified on 11/10/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE).
November 5, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Transfer Venue to the District of Columbia by David Bernhardt, Aurelia Skipwith. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A (Complaint in District of Columbia lawsuit), #3 Exhibit B (Judicial Caseload Statistics))(Finnegan, Alison) Modified on 11/5/2020 to edit text. (EDC).
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David Bernhardt, Aurelia Skipwith (Jack, Justin)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2020 at 11:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 11/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/01/2020. (ELW)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney Brandon Fremin and U.S. Attorney General William P. Barr (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2179038.), filed by Ronald Nowak, Louisiana Crawfish Producers Association-West, Michael Caire, Public Employees for Environmental Responsibility, Harold Schoeffler, Atchafalaya Basinkeeper, Healthy Gulf, Sierra Club and its Delta Chapter. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons - Attorney General, #3 Attachment Summons - Secretary DOI, #4 Attachment Summons - Director USFWS, #5 Attachment Summons - US Attorney, #6 Attachment Prior Related Case (L.C.R. 3))(Mitchell, Misha) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/30/2020) (ELW). (Attachment 2 replaced on 9/30/2020) (ELW). (Attachment 3 replaced on 9/30/2020) (ELW). (Attachment 4 replaced on 9/30/2020) (ELW). (Attachment 5 replaced on 9/30/2020) (ELW). Modified on 9/30/2020 to flatten documents (ELW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atchafalaya Basinkeeper et al v. Bernhardt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Healthy Gulf
Represented By: Misha Leigh Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Schoeffler
Represented By: Misha Leigh Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atchafalaya Basinkeeper
Represented By: Misha Leigh Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Nowak
Represented By: Misha Leigh Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Misha Leigh Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Public Employees for Environmental Responsibility
Represented By: Misha Leigh Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Crawfish Producers Association-West
Represented By: Misha Leigh Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Caire
Represented By: Misha Leigh Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Represented By: Alison C. Finnegan
Represented By: Justin Alan Jack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurelia Skipwith
Represented By: Alison C. Finnegan
Represented By: Justin Alan Jack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Safari Club International
Represented By: Richard Ramsey Kennedy, III
Represented By: Jeremy E Clare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?