Rigid Constructors, LLC v. ELA Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rigid Constructors, LLC
Defendant: ELA Group, Inc. and United Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00666
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 7 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by ELA Group, Inc., United Fire and Casualty Company.(Taggart, David) Modified on 11/16/2020 to edit the docket text (SWE).
November 4, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent United Fire Group, Inc. for United Fire and Casualty Company.. (Taggart, David)
November 4, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ELA Group, Inc.. (Taggart, David)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United Fire and Casualty Company. United Fire and Casualty Company waiver sent on 9/14/2020, answer due 11/13/2020. (Taggart, David)
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ELA Group, Inc.. ELA Group, Inc. waiver sent on 9/14/2020, answer due 11/13/2020. (Taggart, David)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 12/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/22/2020. (SGO)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2182166.), filed by Rigid Constructors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Attachment Verification, #6 Attachment Request for Waiver of Service to United Fire and Casualty Company, #7 Attachment Request for Waiver of Service to ELA Group, Inc.)(Breaud, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rigid Constructors, LLC v. ELA Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rigid Constructors, LLC
Represented By: Alan K. Breaud
Represented By: Timothy W. Basden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELA Group, Inc.
Represented By: David R. Taggart
Represented By: Mary Catherine Joiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: David R. Taggart
Represented By: Mary Catherine Joiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?