Jackson v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: Donea L Jackson
Defendant: Angola State Penitentiary and Unknown Jones
Case Number: 3:2020cv00699
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from the Louisiana Western; Case Number 5:20-cv-01074. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 15, 2020 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (EDC)
October 15, 2020 Case assigned to Judge John W. deGravelles and Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EDC)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court TRANSFER the above captioned case to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana, the district in which the alleged cause of action arose. See 28 U.S.C. 1391. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a determination of Plaintiffs pauper status herein be and it is hereby deferred to the transferee court for resolution and disposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/15/2020. (crt,Haik, K)[Transferred from Louisiana Western on 10/16/2020.]
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/20/2020. (crt,Devillier, W) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 10/16/2020.]
August 17, 2020 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Devillier, W) [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 10/16/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 DEFICIENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donea L Jackson. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/17/2020. (crt,Adams, K). Motion/Application not on approved form. [Transferred from Louisiana Western on 10/16/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 DEFICIENT COMPLAINT against Angola State Penitentiary, Jones filed by Donea L Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibits, #3 Proposed summons/writ, #4 Envelope)(crt,Adams, K). Complaint not on approved form.[Transferred from Louisiana Western on 10/16/2020.] (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/16/2020) (EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angola State Penitentiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donea L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?