In re: Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc. as Owner Pro Hac Vice of the M/V Flicker
Petitioner: Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc. and Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc. as Owner Pro Hac Vice of the M/V Flicker
Case Number: 3:2020cv00742
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability. (EDC)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Ex Parte MOTION For Order Approving Security, Directing Issuance of Notice, and Restraining Prosecution of Claims as stated herein. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/17/2020. (EDC)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Ex Parte MOTION For Approval of Stipulation of Value and Ad Interim Stipulation for Value. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 12/17/2020. (EDC)
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION For Order Approving Security, Directing Issuance of Notice, and Restraining Prosecution of Claims by Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc. as Owner Pro Hac Vice of the M/V Flicker. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Notice to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability, #3 Attachment Order Approving Limitation Petitioner's Security, Directing Issuance of Notice to Claimants and Restraining Prosecution of Claims)(Guichard, Lauren)
November 12, 2020 Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION For Approval of Stipulation of Value and Ad Interim Stipulation for Value by Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc. as Owner Pro Hac Vice of the M/V Flicker. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Guichard, Lauren)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Security and Ad Interim Stipulation for Value Under Rule F and Other Supplemental Rules of Certain Admiralty and Maritime Claims by Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc. as Owner Pro Hac Vice of the M/V Flicker (Attachments: #1 Attachment Letter of Undertaking)(Guichard, Lauren)
November 3, 2020 Notice of Payment of $250.00 Bond by Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc.. Filing fee $ 250, receipt number ALAMDC-2195960. (Vermeulen, Zoe)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 Verified Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2195776.), filed by Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Affidavit of Value, #2 Exhibit B Letter of Undertaking, #3 Exhibit C List of Potential Claimants, #4 Attachment Proposed Order Approving Limitation Petitioner's Security, Directing Issuance of Notice to Claimants and Restraining Prosecution of Claims, #5 Attachment Notice to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability, #6 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Vermeulen, Zoe) Modified on 11/3/2020 to edit text. (EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc. as Owner Pro Hac Vice of the M/V Flicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc.
Represented By: Zoe Wilde Vermeulen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Baton Rouge Harbor Service, Inc. as Owner Pro Hac Vice of the M/V Flicker
Represented By: Zoe Wilde Vermeulen
Represented By: Lauren Alana Guichard
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Schlotterer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?