Hollenbeck et al v. False River Veterinary Clinic, APVMC et al
Plaintiff: Christina Hollenbeck and Andrea Bryans
Defendant: False River Veterinary Clinic, APVMC, Dana Gosserand and Dana C. Gosserand
Case Number: 3:2020cv00764
Filed: November 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by False River Veterinary Clinic, APVMC. (Bremenstul, Minia)
December 29, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative and Other Defenses by False River Veterinary Clinic, APVMC, Dana C. Gosserand.(Bremenstul, Minia)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Plead. Defendants False River Veterinary Clinic, APVMC and Dana C. Gosserand are granted an extension of 21 days, or until 12/31/2020, to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/3/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
December 2, 2020 Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bremenstul, Minia) Modified on 12/2/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW).
December 2, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
November 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christina Hollenbeck, Andrea Bryans. False River Veterinary Clinic, APVMC served on 11/19/2020, answer due 12/10/2020; Dana C. Gosserand served on 11/19/2020, answer due 12/10/2020. (Bullman, James)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/2021 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Counsel for Plaintiff(s) shall initiate the call to all parties then contact the Court at (225) 389-3602. Status Report due by 1/14/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/17/2020. (SGO)
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to False River Veterinary Clinic, APVMC, Dana C. Gosserand. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
November 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2200216.), filed by Christina Hollenbeck, Andrea Bryans. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment)(Bullman, James) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/12/2020 to flatten the document) (KMW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollenbeck et al v. False River Veterinary Clinic, APVMC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Hollenbeck
Represented By: James R Bullman
Represented By: Brian Francis Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Bryans
Represented By: James R Bullman
Represented By: Brian Francis Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: False River Veterinary Clinic, APVMC
Represented By: Mary Margaret Spell
Represented By: Minia E Bremenstul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Gosserand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana C. Gosserand
Represented By: Mary Margaret Spell
Represented By: Minia E Bremenstul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?