Performance Solutions LLC et al v. Sea Ties LLC
Plaintiff: Halcyon Brand Services Inc., Performance Solutions LLC, 321 Holdings and Performance Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Sea Ties LLC and Sea Ties, LLC doing business as RumbleRoller
Counter Claimant: Sea Ties, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00797
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2021 Filing 26 Joint STATUS REPORT ALL PARTIES by All Plaintiffs. (Philips, Harry)
January 14, 2021 Filing 25 STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Philips, Harry)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record. Attorney John P. Murrill is enrolled as co-counsel for plaintiffs 321 Holdings, Halcyon Brand Services Inc., and Performance Solutions, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/12/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
January 12, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Enroll John P. Murrill as Additional Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Philips, Harry)
January 12, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #23 MOTION to Enroll John P. Murrill as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
January 8, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Sea Ties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Counterclaim, #2 Exhibit B to Counterclaim, #3 Exhibit C to Counterclaim, #4 Exhibit D to Counterclaim, #5 Exhibit E to Counterclaim, #6 Exhibit F to Counterclaim, #7 Exhibit G to Counterclaim, #8 Exhibit H to Counterclaim )(Primeaux, Russel) Modified on 1/11/2021 to edit the docket text (KMW). Modified on 1/12/2021 (NLT).
December 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time. Having considered Plaintiff's #20 Response to clarify the record, the #18 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Plead is GRANTED and Defendant Sea Ties, LLC is granted an extension of time until 1/8/2021 to answer or otherwise plead. The telephone scheduling conference and status report deadline remain as scheduled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/27/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
December 23, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #18 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
December 22, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #18 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer filed by Performance Solutions, LLC. (Puri, Asheesh)
December 22, 2020 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sea Ties, LLC. (Rucinski, Lauren)
December 22, 2020 Filing 18 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead by Sea Ties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Rucinski, Lauren) Modified on 12/23/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW).
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Withdraw and Substitute an Exhibit filed by Halcyon Brand Services Inc., Performance Solutions, LLC (KMW) Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/4/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)
December 4, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw and Substitute an Exhibit by Halcyon Brand Services Inc., Performance Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 proposed order, #2 Exhibit)(KMW)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Withdraw and Substitute an Exhibit. The Clerks Office shall enter the Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Exhibit (R. Doc. 13-3) and attachments into the record. Upon entry of the motion into the record, the Clerk's Office shall grant the motion and substitute the attached Exhibit D to the Complaint in place of the original exhibit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/4/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
December 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Errata to Plaintiffs' Complaint by 321 Holdings, Halcyon Brand Services Inc., Performance Solutions, LLC re #1 Complaint, (Philips, Harry)
December 2, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Withdraw and Substitute an Exhibit by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order, #3 Proposed Pleading; Motion to Withdraw and Substitute, #4 Proposed Pleading; Order, #5 Exhibit D)(Philips, Harry)
December 2, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Performance Solutions, LLC, Halcyon Brand Services Inc., 321 Holdings. Sea Ties, LLC served on 12/2/2020, answer due 12/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Philips, Harry)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Sasha Govindacharya Rao is enrolled as pro hac vice co-counsel for plaintiffs Performance Solutions,321 Holdings and Halcyon Brand Services, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/2/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Asheesh Paul Puri is enrolled as pro hac vice co-counsel for plaintiffs Performance Solutions, 321 Holdings and Halcyon Brand Services, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/2/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
December 2, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #13 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Withdraw and Substitute an Exhibit . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
December 2, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Asheesh Paul Puri to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2214200). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
December 2, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 MOTION for Sasha Govindacharya Rao to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2214217). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
December 1, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Sasha Govindacharya Rao to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2214217) by 321 Holdings, Halcyon Brand Services Inc., Performance Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit California Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit NY Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Declaration/Oath, #4 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Philips, Harry)
December 1, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Asheesh Paul Puri to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2214200) by 321 Holdings, Halcyon Brand Services Inc., Performance Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit California Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit NY Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit NJ Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit Declaration/Oath)(Philips, Harry)
November 23, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Sea Ties, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 1/14/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/23/2020. (SGO)
November 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by 321 Holdings, Halcyon Brand Services Inc., Performance Solutions LLC re #1 Complaint, (Philips, Harry) (Main Document 5 replaced on 11/23/2020 to flatten the document) (KMW). Copy Mailed to Agency on 11/23/2020 (KMW).
November 20, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 321 Holdings, Halcyon Brand Services Inc., Performance Solutions LLC. (Philips, Harry)
November 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Submitted (Philips, Harry) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/23/2020 to flatten the document) (KMW).
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 Exhibit(s) to #1 Complaint, by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Q, #2 Exhibit R, #3 Exhibit S, #4 Exhibit T, #5 Exhibit U, #6 Exhibit V, #7 Exhibit W, #8 Exhibit X, #9 Exhibit Y, #10 Exhibit Z, #11 Exhibit AA, #12 Exhibit BB, #13 Exhibit CC, #14 Exhibit DD, #15 Exhibit EE, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(Philips, Harry) (Attachment 16 replaced on 11/23/2020 to flatten the document) (KMW).
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sea Ties LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2209504.), filed by Performance Solutions LLC, Halcyon Brand Services Inc., 321 Holdings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Philips, Harry) (Attachment 4 replaced on 12/9/2020 in accordance with RD 15) (KMW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Performance Solutions LLC et al v. Sea Ties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sea Ties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sea Ties, LLC doing business as RumbleRoller
Represented By: Russel O. Primeaux
Represented By: Lauren Jean Rucinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Halcyon Brand Services Inc.
Represented By: Harry Joseph Philips, Jr.
Represented By: John P. Murrill
Represented By: Sasha G. Rao
Represented By: Asheesh Paul Puri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Performance Solutions LLC
Represented By: Harry Joseph Philips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 321 Holdings
Represented By: Harry Joseph Philips, Jr.
Represented By: John P. Murrill
Represented By: Sasha G. Rao
Represented By: Asheesh Paul Puri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Performance Solutions, LLC
Represented By: John P. Murrill
Represented By: Sasha G. Rao
Represented By: Asheesh Paul Puri
Represented By: Harry Joseph Philips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Sea Ties, LLC
Represented By: Russel O. Primeaux
Represented By: Lauren Jean Rucinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?