Smith v. North American Auto Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Ebony Smith
Defendant: North American Auto Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00822
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/4/2021 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 2/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/28/2020. (BLR)
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to North American Auto Group, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (EDC)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against North American Auto Group, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2218654.), filed by Ebony Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Ridge, Garth) (Attachments 2-3 replaced on 12/10/2020) (EDC). Modified on 12/10/2020 to flatten documents. (EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. North American Auto Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Auto Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebony Smith
Represented By: Garth Jonathan Ridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?