In Re: Cooper T. Smith Mooring Co., Inc.
In Re: In The Matter of Cooper T. Smith Mooring Co., Inc. as Owner/Operator and Cooper T. Smith Corporation as Alleged Owner/Operator of MV/ CAPTAIN JACK and M/V CAPTAIN SCOTT Praying for Exoneration form or and Cooper T. Smith Mooring Co., Inc. as Owner/Operator and Cooper T. Smith Corporation as Alleged Owner/Operator of MV/ CAPTAIN JACK and M/V CAPTAIN SCOTT
Case Number: 3:2020cv00838
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
2 Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion Approving Security, Restraining Claims, and Issuance of Notice to Claimants. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 1/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability) (KMW)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Ex Parte Motion to Approve Ad Interim Stipulation for Value. This order is without prejudice to any party seeking to move this Court for due appraisal of the vessels and/or freight or to have the amount increased or diminished or to have the Court determine the value. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 1/25/2021. (KMW)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record. Attorney Morgan Kelley is enrolled as co-counsel for Cooper T. Smith Mooring Co., Inc. as Owner/Operator and Cooper T. Smith Corporation as Alleged Owner/Operator of MV/ CAPTAIN JACK and M/V CAPTAIN SCOTT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/7/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The captioned matter is transferred to District Judge John W. deGravelles for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 1/6/2021. (SWE)
January 6, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Enroll Morgan E. Kelley as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
January 6, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Enroll Morgan E. Kelley as Additional Attorney by Cooper T. Smith Mooring Co., Inc. as Owner/Operator and Cooper T. Smith Corporation as Alleged Owner/Operator of MV/ CAPTAIN JACK and M/V CAPTAIN SCOTT. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flotte, David)
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION to Approve Ad Interim Stipulation for Value by Cooper T. Smith Mooring Co., Inc. as Owner/Operator and Cooper T. Smith Corporation as Alleged Owner/Operator of MV/ CAPTAIN JACK and M/V CAPTAIN SCOTT. (Attachments: #1 Ad Interim Stipulation for Value, #2 Proposed Order)(Flotte, David)
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 There is no Record Document 3. Entered in error by case administrator (KMW). Modified on 12/21/2020 (NLT).
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Approval of Security, Restraining Claims, and Issuance of Notice to Claimants by In The Matter of Cooper T. Smith Mooring Co., Inc. as Owner/Operator and Cooper T. Smith Corporation as Alleged Owner/Operator of MV/ CAPTAIN JACK and M/V CAPTAIN SCOTT Praying for Exoneration form or. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Notice to Claimants)(Flotte, David)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability against In The Matter of Cooper T. Smith Mooring Co., Inc. as Owner/Operator and Cooper T. Smith Corporation as Alleged Owner/Operator of MV/ CAPTAIN JACK and M/V CAPTAIN SCOTT Praying for Exoneration form or ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2220125.), filed by In The Matter of Cooper T. Smith Mooring Co., Inc. as Owner/Operator and Cooper T. Smith Corporation as Alleged Owner/Operator of MV/ CAPTAIN JACK and M/V CAPTAIN SCOTT Praying for Exoneration form or. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Affidavit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flotte, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Cooper T. Smith Mooring Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In The Matter of Cooper T. Smith Mooring Co., Inc. as Owner/Operator and Cooper T. Smith Corporation as Alleged Owner/Operator of MV/ CAPTAIN JACK and M/V CAPTAIN SCOTT Praying for Exoneration form or
Represented By: David Michael Flotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Cooper T. Smith Mooring Co., Inc. as Owner/Operator and Cooper T. Smith Corporation as Alleged Owner/Operator of MV/ CAPTAIN JACK and M/V CAPTAIN SCOTT
Represented By: David Michael Flotte
Represented By: Kevin Frey
Represented By: Austin S. Glascoe
Represented By: Morgan Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?