Ryan et al v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Ryan, Herbert Scully, Blaze Franklin and Amisar Cyrus Nourani
Defendant: Frank Howze, Tarvald Anthony Smith, Sid J. Gautreaux, III, Nicole Robinson, Dennis Grimes, Bonnie Jackson and Ronald Johnson
Case Number: 3:2020cv00843
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER: Because the requirements of Local Rule 7(a) are met, the #59 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings filed by Defendants Sheriff Sid J. Gautreaux, III, and Warden Dennis Grimes is GRANTED. Gautreaux and Grimes now have until March 22, 2021, to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 2/11/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
February 10, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #59 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
February 10, 2021 Filing 59 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint by Sid J. Gautreaux, III, Dennis Grimes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(St. Pierre, Catherine) Modified on 2/10/2021 to edit the docket text (SWE).
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 3/11/2021 at 01:30 PM by video before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 1/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(KAH)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #56 Motion to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing and related briefing deadlines. Parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before 3/21/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 1/21/2021. (BKA)
January 20, 2021 Filing 56 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction [12, 30] by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Foley, Eric)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #54 Motion to Withdraw Request for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 1/19/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BKA)
January 17, 2021 Filing 54 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Request for Temporary Restraining Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Foley, Eric)
January 15, 2021 Filing 53 Supplemental Brief in Support of #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Gautreaux and Grimes filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Foley, Eric) Modified on 1/19/2021 to edit text. (EDC).
January 15, 2021 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Gautreaux and Grimes filed by Frank Howze, Bonnie Jackson, Ronald Johnson, Nicole Robinson, Tarvald Anthony Smith. (Wilson, Jacqueline) Modified on 1/19/2021 to edit text. (EDC).
January 15, 2021 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Gautreaux and Grimes filed by Sid J. Gautreaux, III, Dennis Grimes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(St. Pierre, Catherine) Modified on 1/19/2021 to edit text. (EDC).
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting in part #43 Motion for Expedited Discovery. By 1/20/2021, Defendants are ordered to produce recordings from five agreed-upon days of call-out hearings before each of Defendants Judge Bonnie Jackson, Judge Ronald Johnson, Judge Tarvald Anthony Smith, and Commissioner Nicole Robinson. Defendants also are ordered to provide responses to Plaintiffs' Requests for Admission by 1/20/2021. Because simultaneous briefs regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction are due 1/15/2021, the Parties are hereby granted leave to submit supplemental briefs, only if needed, pertaining only to this limited discovery. Any such supplemental briefs must be filed no later than 1/22/2021, at 12:00 p.m. and must not exceed 10 pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 1/14/2021. (EDC)
January 14, 2021 Filing 49 Minute Entry/Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Telephone Status Conference held on 1/14/2021. The parties discussed the status of this matter, including Plaintiffs Motion for Expedited Discovery (R. Doc. 25) and Emergency Second Motion for Expedited Discovery (Rec Doc 43). The parties agreed upon the scope of expedited discovery and a deadline of January 20, 2021, for responding to the limited discovery. Discovery due by 1/20/2021. (ELW) Modified on 1/20/2021 to add a space (ELW).
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: Based on the representations of the Parties at the January 14, 2020 status conference that the discovery requested by Plaintiffs in their #25 Motion for Expedited Discovery has been provided, Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery (R. Doc. 25), therefore, is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 1/14/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
January 13, 2021 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #43 Emergency Second MOTION for Expedited Discovery MOTION for Request for Status Conference filed by Frank Howze, Bonnie Jackson, Ronald Johnson, Nicole Robinson, Tarvald Anthony Smith. (Wilson, Jacqueline)
January 13, 2021 Filing 46 NOTICE of Conventional Filing in Clerk's Office of Audio Exhibits by Blaze Franklin, Amisar Cyrus Nourani, Joshua Ryan, Herbert Scully re #35 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Gautreaux and Grimes. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EDC)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting in part #43 Emergency Second Motion for Expedited Discovery and Request for Status Conference. A Telephone Status Conference is set for 1/14/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson to discuss the expedited discovery requested in the motion. Counsel participating in the Conference shall call using the AT&T Teleconference System five minutes prior to the conference. Counsel will receive a separate e-mail containing dial in information prior to the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 1/13/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
January 13, 2021 Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amisar Cyrus Nourani, Blaze Franklin, Joshua Ryan, Herbert Scully. Bonnie Jackson waiver sent on 1/12/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (Utter, David)
January 12, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #43 Emergency Second MOTION for Expedited Discovery and Request for Status Conference MOTION for Conference. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
January 12, 2021 Filing 43 Emergency Second MOTION for Expedited Discovery and Request for Status Conference by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1-Email Correspondence, #3 Exhibit 2-Discovery to Judicial Defendants, #4 Exhibit 3-Duty Schedule, #5 Proposed Order)(Foley, Eric) Modified on 1/12/2021 to edit text.(EDC). Added MOTION for Request for Status Conference on 1/12/2021 (EDC). Modified on 1/13/2021 to edit text. (EDC).
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: Plaintiffs shall submit a response to Defendants' Oppositions to #12 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminarily Injunction on or before 1/17/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 1/7/2021. (LLH)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #36 MOTION for Leave to Conventionally File Audio Exhibits in Connection with Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 1/7/2021. (SWE) Modified on 1/11/2021 to correct file date (SWE).
January 7, 2021 Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amisar Cyrus Nourani, Blaze Franklin, Joshua Ryan, Herbert Scully. Nicole Robinson waiver sent on 1/5/2021, answer due 3/8/2021. (Utter, David)
January 7, 2021 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amisar Cyrus Nourani, Blaze Franklin, Joshua Ryan, Herbert Scully. Tarvald Anthony Smith waiver sent on 1/5/2021, answer due 3/8/2021. (Utter, David)
January 7, 2021 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amisar Cyrus Nourani, Blaze Franklin, Joshua Ryan, Herbert Scully. Ronald Johnson waiver sent on 1/5/2021, answer due 3/8/2021. (Utter, David)
January 7, 2021 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amisar Cyrus Nourani, Blaze Franklin, Joshua Ryan, Herbert Scully. Frank Howze waiver sent on 1/5/2021, answer due 3/8/2021. (Utter, David)
January 7, 2021 Filing 36 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Conventionally File Audio Exhibits in Connection with Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Foley, Eric)
January 6, 2021 Filing 35 Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support of #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Gautreaux and Grimes MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Conventional Filing of Exhibits 1-4)(Foley, Eric)
January 6, 2021 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Gautreaux and Grimes MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Frank Howze, Bonnie Jackson, Ronald Johnson, Nicole Robinson, Tarvald Anthony Smith. (Wilson, Jacqueline)
January 6, 2021 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Gautreaux and Grimes MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sid J. Gautreaux, III, Dennis Grimes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(St. Pierre, Catherine)
December 29, 2020 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joshua Ryan. Dennis Grimes waiver sent on 12/29/2020, answer due 3/1/2021. (Utter, David)
December 29, 2020 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joshua Ryan. Sid J. Gautreaux, III waiver sent on 12/29/2020, answer due 3/1/2021. (Utter, David)
December 21, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Simultaneous briefs are due 1/15/2021. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2021 through 1/29/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BKA)
December 21, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order: Simultaneous briefs due 1/6/2021.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BKA)
December 21, 2020 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick: Telephone Conference held on 12/21/2020. (BKA)
December 18, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Compliance by Blaze Franklin, Amisar Cyrus Nourani, Joshua Ryan, Herbert Scully to 17 Notice to Counsel,, (Foley, Eric)
December 17, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #25 MOTION for Expedited Discovery. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
December 17, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Expedited Discovery by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Proposed Subpoena, #3 Proposed Order)(Foley, Eric) Modified on 12/17/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW).
December 16, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Conventional Filing in Clerk's Office of DVD-ROM of Exhibits 1,2 and 3 by Blaze Franklin, Amisar Cyrus Nourani, Joshua Ryan, Herbert Scully re #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Gautreaux and Grimes. (EDC)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 and #21 Motions for Miriam R. Nemeth and William R. Claiborne to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 12/16/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
December 16, 2020 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #21 MOTION for William R. Claiborne to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by All Plaintiffs. (Utter, David)
December 16, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #21 MOTION for William R. Claiborne to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #20 MOTION for Miriam R. Nemeth to Appear Pro Hac Vice . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
December 16, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for William R. Claiborne to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Sworn Statement, #2 Exhibit B- Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Utter, David)
December 16, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Miriam R. Nemeth to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Sworn Statement, #2 Exhibit B- Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Utter, David)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #6 and #7 Motions for Scott C. Robichaux and Tiffany Yang to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 12/16/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #4 and #5 Motions for William R. Claiborne and Miriam R. Nemeth to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 12/16/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
December 15, 2020 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support of #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Gautreaux and Grimes filed by Blaze Franklin, Amisar Cyrus Nourani, Joshua Ryan, Herbert Scully. (EDC)
December 15, 2020 Filing 17 Notice to Counsel: Plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED to identify and notify counsel for each Defendant of the subject Motion [Rec. Doc. 12] and provide the Court, by Notice filed in the record, with names and contact information (including email addresses) for each counsel identified. A Telephone Conference is hereby set for 12/21/2020 at 02:00 PM before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Participant dial-in instructions will be provided via separate email from the Courtroom Deputy. Evidence, in electronic format, shall be provided in accordance with Local Rule 79 and Administrative Procedures.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BKA)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 12/15/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BKA)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 MOTION for Leave to file exhibits conventionally. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 12/15/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BKA)
December 15, 2020 Filing 14 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Conventionally File Audio Exhibits 1-3 to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #12 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Foley, Eric)
December 15, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Exceeding Page Limit to Support #12 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachment for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #2 Proposed Order)(Foley, Eric) Modified on 12/15/2020 to edit text. (EDC).
December 15, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Anonymously MOTION for Leave to File Documents Revealing Identity Under Seal. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
December 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Gautreaux and Grimes by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Conventional Filing notice of Exhibits 1-3, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 10)(Foley, Eric). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 12/21/2020 (EDC).
December 15, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #5 MOTION for Miriam R. Nemeth to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2221138) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Utter, David)
December 15, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Filing Exhibit B to #5 MOTION for Miriam R. Nemeth to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2221138) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Utter, David) Modified on 12/15/2020 to edit text. (EDC).
December 15, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Miriam R. Nemeth to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2221138), #7 MOTION for Tiffany Yang to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2221154), #4 MOTION for William R. Claiborne to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2221129), #6 MOTION for Scott C. Robichaux to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2221140). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
December 15, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Sid J. Gautreaux, III, Dennis Grimes, Frank Howze, Bonnie Jackson, Ronald Johnson, Nicole Robinson, Tarvald Anthony Smith. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons, #5 summons, #6 summons)(EDC)
December 15, 2020 Filing 8 Letter to Attorney Eric Andrew Foley regarding Thomas B. Harvey who is Co-Counsel for party Joshua Ryan, Blaze Franklin, Amisar Cyrus Nourani and Herbert Scully. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (EDC)
December 15, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Tiffany Yang to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2221154) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Sworn Statement, #2 Exhibit B- Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Utter, David)
December 15, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Scott C. Robichaux to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2221140) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Sworn Statement, #2 Exhibit B- Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Utter, David)
December 15, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Miriam R. Nemeth to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2221138) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Sworn Statement, #2 Exhibit B- Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Utter, David)
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for William R. Claiborne to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2221129) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Sworn Statement, #2 Exhibit B- Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Utter, David)
December 14, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Anonymously and File Documents Revealing Identity Under Seal by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Foley, Eric)
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Certify Class by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment 1-Foley Decl., #3 Attachment 2-Lommers-Johnson Decl., #4 Attachment 3-Harvey Decl., #5 Attachment 4-Utter Decl.)(Foley, Eric)
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2221010.), filed by Amisar Cyrus Nourani, Blaze Franklin, Joshua Ryan, Herbert Scully. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons-Smith, #3 Summons-Jackson, #4 Summons-Johnson, #5 Summons-Robinson, #6 Summons-Howze, #7 Summons-Gautreaux, #8 Summons-Grimes)(Foley, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryan et al v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Ryan
Represented By: Eric Andrew Foley
Represented By: Hannah Lommers-Johnson
Represented By: William R. Claiborne
Represented By: Scott C. Robichaux
Represented By: Jacob G Longman
Represented By: Tiffany Yang
Represented By: David J. Utter
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Scully
Represented By: Eric Andrew Foley
Represented By: Hannah Lommers-Johnson
Represented By: William R. Claiborne
Represented By: Scott C. Robichaux
Represented By: Jacob G Longman
Represented By: Tiffany Yang
Represented By: David J. Utter
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blaze Franklin
Represented By: Eric Andrew Foley
Represented By: Hannah Lommers-Johnson
Represented By: William R. Claiborne
Represented By: Scott C. Robichaux
Represented By: Jacob G Longman
Represented By: Tiffany Yang
Represented By: David J. Utter
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amisar Cyrus Nourani
Represented By: Eric Andrew Foley
Represented By: Hannah Lommers-Johnson
Represented By: William R. Claiborne
Represented By: Scott C. Robichaux
Represented By: Jacob G Longman
Represented By: Tiffany Yang
Represented By: David J. Utter
Represented By: Miriam R. Nemeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Howze
Represented By: Jacqueline B. Wilson
Represented By: James Garrison Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tarvald Anthony Smith
Represented By: Jacqueline B. Wilson
Represented By: James Garrison Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sid J. Gautreaux, III
Represented By: Catherine S. St. Pierre
Represented By: Mary G. Erlingson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Robinson
Represented By: Jacqueline B. Wilson
Represented By: James Garrison Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Grimes
Represented By: Catherine S. St. Pierre
Represented By: Mary G. Erlingson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Jackson
Represented By: Jacqueline B. Wilson
Represented By: James Garrison Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Johnson
Represented By: Jacqueline B. Wilson
Represented By: James Garrison Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?