Synergy Management, L.L.C. v. WDM, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Synergy Management, L.L.C.
Defendant: Ryan Urban, WDM, Inc., ABC Insurance Company, Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina and WDM, Inc. doing business as Wood Designs
Case Number: 3:2020cv00850
Filed: December 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 MOTION to Substitute R. Doc. 8. The clerk is directed to replace R. Doc. 8 with R. Doc. 10 Exhibit A. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/12/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
February 11, 2021 Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT and DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY against All Defendants, filed by Synergy Management, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ELW)
February 11, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Substitute R. Doc. 8 by Ryan Urban, WDM, Inc.. (Ricci, Robert) Modified on 2/11/2021 to edit text. (EDC).
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The #7 Consent Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff by Synergy Management, L.L.C., is GRANTED. Leave should be freely given under Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 15(a)(2) and Plaintiff has shown good cause in support of the amendment. Plaintiff seeks to amend to name Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina, the insurance company of Defendants (previously named as ABC Insurance Company); Defendants WDM, Inc. and Ryan Urban have no opposition to the amendment; and no prejudice to Defendants has been shown. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is directed to docket the [7-1] First Amending Complaint, with [7-2] the attached exhibit, into the record of this matter, which shall become the operative complaint. The Clerk of Court shall issue the summons attached as R. Doc. 7-3. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/11/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD)
February 11, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw and Substitute as Counsel of Record by Ryan Urban, WDM, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Ricci, Robert) (Main Document 8 replaced on 2/12/2021 in accordance with RD 11) (SWE).
February 11, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Substitute R. Doc. 8. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
February 11, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 MOTION to Withdraw and Substitute as Counsel of Record. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
February 10, 2021 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Demand for Trial by Jury by Synergy Management, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Pleading; Request for Summons, #4 Attachment Proposed Order)(Harrigan, Brad)
February 10, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 Consent MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Demand for Trial by Jury . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint, filed by WDM, Inc. d/b/a "Wood Designs," and Ryan Urban. Responsive pleadings for WDM, Inc. and Ryan Urban due 2/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 01/19/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD)
January 14, 2021 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint, by Ryan Urban, WDM, Inc.. (Mason, Scott) Modified on 1/14/2021 to edit the docket text (SWE).
January 14, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/4/2021 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 2/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/28/2020. (BLR)
December 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ryan Urban, WDM, Inc. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KMW)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of AO 120 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark by Synergy Management, L.L.C. (KMW)
December 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Trial by Jury against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2222567.), filed by Synergy Management, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Request for Summons, #4 Request for Summons)(Harrigan, Brad) Modified on 12/17/2020 to edit the docket text (KMW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synergy Management, L.L.C. v. WDM, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Urban
Represented By: Scott H. Mason
Represented By: Godfrey Bruce Parkerson
Represented By: Robert Devin Ricci
Represented By: Eric Winder Sella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WDM, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selective Insurance Company of South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WDM, Inc. doing business as Wood Designs
Represented By: Scott H. Mason
Represented By: Godfrey Bruce Parkerson
Represented By: Robert Devin Ricci
Represented By: Eric Winder Sella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synergy Management, L.L.C.
Represented By: Brad Elliot Harrigan
Represented By: Kenneth L Tolar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?