American Strategic Insurance Corporation et al v. ATA Consulting, LLC
Petitioner: Bankers Specialty Insurance Company and American Strategic Insurance Corporation
Respondent: ATA Consulting, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020mc00102
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Withdraw. The Motion to Compel is considered withdrawn. The Clerk of Court shall close this miscellaneous case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/27/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Bourgeois, Richard)
August 19, 2020 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #1 , #2 Memorandum in Support re #1 MOTION to Compel filed by American Strategic Insurance Corporation, Bankers Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 E. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #1 , #2 Memorandum in Support re #1 MOTION to Compel filed by American Strategic Insurance Corporation, Bankers Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13) (Sullivan, Sean) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 8/17/2020.] by American Strategic Insurance Corporation, Bankers Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Sean)
August 17, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Brian A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from the Alabama Southern; Case Number 1:20-mc-00012. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting movants, American Strategic Insurance Corporation and Bankers Specialty Insurance Company's request to transfer under Rule 45((f) the matters contained within their Motion to Compel. This action is transferred to USDC for the Middle District of Louisiana for appropriate disposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/14/20. (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 8/17/2020.]
August 14, 2020 REFERRAL OF #2 Memorandum in Support, to Judge Nelson. (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 8/17/2020.]
August 14, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #1 MOTION to Compel Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (cmj) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 8/17/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Memorandum in Support re #1 MOTION to Compel filed by American Strategic Insurance Corporation, Bankers Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13) (Sullivan, Sean) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 8/17/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel filed by American Strategic Insurance Corporation, Bankers Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Sullivan, Sean) [Transferred from Alabama Southern on 8/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Strategic Insurance Corporation et al v. ATA Consulting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bankers Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Sean P Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: American Strategic Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Sean P Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ATA Consulting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?