Brousseau et al v. Knauf Gips KG et al
Plaintiff: Sarah B Brousseau and Jacques Brousseau
Defendant: Knauf Gips KG and Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co. LTD
Case Number: 3:2021cv00005
Filed: January 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Amended Oath to #17 MOTION for James V. Doyle, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jacques Brousseau, Sarah B Brousseau (DeLee, Brent) Modified on 3/4/2021 to edit text and add docket entry relationship (SWE). Modified on 3/4/2021 (NLT).
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for James V. Doyle, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/3/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
March 3, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #17 MOTION for James V. Doyle, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2255152). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
March 2, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for James V. Doyle, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2255152) by Jacques Brousseau, Sarah B Brousseau. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Attachment Oath, #3 Proposed Pleading; Ex Parte Order)(DeLee, Brent)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: A show cause hearing is scheduled by Zoom videoconferencing for March 31, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. for Plaintiffs to appear and show cause for the failure to respond to the #7 Omnibus Motion to Strike Supplemental Claims in Amended Complaints. Participant instructions are attached. The show cause hearing is set because it is not clear from the record of this case whether Plaintiffs received notice of the filing of the Omnibus Motion. Although a show cause hearing was previously set for February 10, 2021, at which Plaintiffs' counsel did not appear, new counsel for Plaintiffs has recently enrolled. In lieu of appearing for the show cause hearing, Plaintiffs may file a response to the Omnibus Motion by no later than March 16, 2021. Failure to timely comply will result in the Omnibus Motion being considered as unopposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/2/2021. (BLR)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Enroll as Attorney. Added attorney Brent K. DeLee for Jacques Brousseau and Sarah B Brousseau. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/2/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
March 1, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #14 MOTION to Enroll Brent K. DeLee as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
February 26, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Enroll Brent K. DeLee as Attorney by Jacques Brousseau, Sarah B Brousseau. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(DeLee, Brent) Modified on 3/1/2021 to edit the docket text (SWE).
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The Notice of Appearance (R. Doc. 12) filed by Counsel by plaintiffs Jacques Brousseau and Sarah B Brousseau is hereby STRICKEN. The Middle District does not accept this type of appearance a Motion to Enroll is required. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/24/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
February 22, 2021 Filing 12 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Jacques Brousseau, Sarah B Brousseau (DeLee, Brent) Modified on 2/23/2021 to edit the docket text (KMW). Modified on 2/26/2021 to remove documents as it has been stricken (LLH).
February 10, 2021 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes: A video Status Conference was to be held on 2/10/2021. The hearing was kept open 15 minutes and Plaintiff's counsel did not appear or contact the Court to advise that he could not appear. Also, the Court was not able to reach Plaintiff's counsel by telephone during the hearing. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: NOTICE AND ORDER: A show cause hearing is scheduled by Zoom videoconferencing for February 10, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. for Plaintiffs to appear and show cause for the failure to respond to the #7 Omnibus Motion to Strike Supplemental Claims in Amended Complaints. Participant instructions are attached. The show cause hearing is set because it is not clear from the record of this case whether Plaintiffs received notice of the filing of the Omnibus Motion. In lieu of appearing for the show cause hearing, Plaintiffs may file a response to the Omnibus Motion by no later than February 2, 2021. Plaintiffs counsel, James V. Doyle, Jr., will not be permitted to file any documents into the record of this case until completing the requirements for admission to practice in this district. See R. Doc. 9. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/19/2021. (BLR)
January 11, 2021 Filing 9 Letter to Attorney James V. Doyle, Jr. who is lead counsel for party Jacques Brousseau and Sarah B Brousseau. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (KMW)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: the severed claims of Jacques and Sarah Brousseau are TRANSFERRED to the Middle District of Louisiana for further proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/22/2020. (KMW) Modified on 2/24/2021 (NLT).
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 Omnibus MOTION to Strike Supplemental Claims in Amended Complaints by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co. LTD. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 proposed order)(KMW) Modified on 2/24/2021 (NLT).
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: the claims of plaintiffs Bholanath & Prabha Dhume, Nathan Junius, Scott & Kim Armstrong, Bonnie & Carl Cordier, Melinda Milam & Clayton Latimer, Carole Bonney, Cathey & Tommy Gueydan, Funches O. & Sharese Matthews Dixon, Jawad & Fatme Gharib, and Jacques & Sarah Brousseau be and are severed from the above-captioned action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 14 days of this Orders issuance, Plaintiffs counsel shall file amended complaints with respect to these plaintiffs.Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/23/2020. (KMW)
January 5, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co. LTD.(KMW) Modified on 2/24/2021 (NLT).
January 5, 2021 Filing 4 Case transferred in from the Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-03258. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 5, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 Omnibus MOTION to Strike Supplemental Claims in Amended Complaints. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
January 5, 2021 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick and Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KMW)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: the severed claims of Jacques and Sarah Brousseau are TRANSFERRED to the Middle District of Louisiana for further proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/22/2020. (KMW)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the severed claims of Jacques and Sarah Brousseau are TRANSFERRED to the Middle District of Louisiana for further proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 12/22/2020.(jls) (Field in master case 09-md-2047 L(5) at rec. doc. 23045) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/5/2021.]
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co. LTD.(KMW)
December 8, 2020 Filing 7 Omnibus MOTION to Strike Supplemental Claims in Amended Complaints by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co. LTD. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 proposed order)(KMW)
December 1, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (aj) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/5/2021.]
December 1, 2020 Filing 1 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee not required) filed by Jacques Brousseau, Sarah B Brousseau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Severance Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney James Victor Doyle, Jr added to party Jacques Brousseau(pty:pla), Attorney James Victor Doyle, Jr added to party Sarah B Brousseau(pty:pla).(Doyle, James) Modified text on 12/3/2020 (jls). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 1/5/2021.]
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: the claims of plaintiffs Bholanath & Prabha Dhume, Nathan Junius, Scott & Kim Armstrong, Bonnie & Carl Cordier, Melinda Milam & Clayton Latimer, Carole Bonney, Cathey & Tommy Gueydan, Funches O. & Sharese Matthews Dixon, Jawad & Fatme Gharib, and Jacques & Sarah Brousseau be and are severed from the above-captioned action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 14 days of this Orders issuance, Plaintiffs counsel shall file amended complaints with respect to these plaintiffs.Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/23/2020. (KMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brousseau et al v. Knauf Gips KG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Gips KG
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Represented By: Paul C. Thibodeaux
Represented By: William L. Mizell
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co. LTD
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Represented By: Paul C. Thibodeaux
Represented By: William L. Mizell
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah B Brousseau
Represented By: Brent K. DeLee
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacques Brousseau
Represented By: Brent K. DeLee
Represented By: James V. Doyle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?