Fisher et al v. Relhms
Plaintiff: Anthony Craig, Sr., Jeremiah Benoit, Jules Robertson, Milton Wilson, Calvin Mitchell, Chris Washburn, Jackie Pruitt, Melvin Miller, Bobby Isidore, Roland Angie, Lionel Redditt, Vinterrious Burton, Jonathan M. Rosalie, Terrance Royal, Lamarquette Erving, Brandon Fisher, Charles J. Neely, David Ramirez, Ahmad Lawson, Michael Goddis, Kevin Francis, Brian Allen, Darius Byrd and Kiran Sirafite
Defendant: Luke Relhms
Case Number: 3:2021cv00045
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay the Initial Partial Filing Fee by Jonathan M. Rosalie. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(KMW)
March 17, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #25 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay the Initial Partial Filing Fee. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
February 26, 2021 Filing 24 Mail Returned as Undeliverable on #23 Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner),. Mail returned from Darius Byrd, David Ramirez, Kiran Sirafite, and Roland Angie. Reason: No Longer at LSP. (KMW)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. It is ordered that the plaintiff pay an initial partial filing fee of $2.50 in accordance with 28 USC 1915. A copy of this order shall be sent to the plaintiff and to Centralized Inmate Banking. Filing Fee due by 3/18/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 2/25/2021. (KMW)
February 25, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Jonathan M. Rosalie. (KMW)
February 25, 2021 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jonathan M. Rosalie. (Attachments: #1 cover letter)(KMW)
February 25, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #22 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
February 24, 2021 Filing 20 Mail Returned as Undeliverable on #15 Letter to Inmate Regarding Future Compliance with Local Rule 5(d)(1).. Mail returned from Kiran Sirafite and Roland Angie. Reason: Name and DOC number do not match. No Longer at LSP. (KMW)
February 24, 2021 Filing 19 Mail Returned as Undeliverable on #18 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Mail returned from Roland Angie, Darius Byrd, David Ramirez, Kiran Sirafite. Reason: Name Does Not Match DOC- No Longer at LSP. (KMW) (Main Document 19 replaced on 2/25/2021) (KMW).
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RULING: The claims brought by Brandon Fisher, Jeremiah Benoit, Charles J. Neely, Michael Goddis, Chris Washburn, Kevin Francis, Melvin Miller, Jules Robertson, Calvin Mitchell, Anthony Craig, Sr., Ahmad Lawson, Lionel Redditt, Bobby Isidore, Milton Wilson, Jackie Pruitt, Vinterrious Burton, Lamarquette Erving, Terrance Royal, and Brian Allen are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. The #13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and #14 Motion and Order for Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 2/23/2021. (ELW)
February 22, 2021 Filing 17 Mail Returned as Undeliverable on #15 Letter to Inmate Regarding Future Compliance with Local Rule 5(d)(1). Mail returned from David Ramirez. Reason: No Longer at LSP. (KMW)
February 22, 2021 Filing 16 Mail Returned as Undeliverable on #15 Letter to Inmate Regarding Future Compliance with Local Rule 5(d)(1). Mail returned from Darius Byrd. Reason: No Longer at LSP. (KMW)
February 19, 2021 Filing 15 Letter to Brandon Fisher Re: Future Compliance with Local Rule 5(d)(1) (Attachments: #1 local rule 5) (KMW)
February 19, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #14 MOTION and Order for Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
February 18, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION and Order for Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum by Brandon Fisher. (Attachments: #1 proposed order, #2 Attachment)(KMW)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order by Brandon Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(KMW)
February 4, 2021 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable on #7 Letter of Deficiency. Mail returned from David Ramirez. Reason: Name and DOC number do not match. (KMW)
February 4, 2021 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable on #10 Notice of (other). Mail returned from Darius Byrd (No Longer at LSP), David Ramirez (Name and DOC # do not match), Jonathan Rosalie (Name and DOC # do not match), Kiran Sifrate (No Longer at LSP). (KMW) Modified on 2/4/2021 to edit the DOC # for Jonathan M. Rosalie- RDs 7 and 10 resent with corrected doc # (KMW).
February 2, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Documents (Motion to Withdraw From Lawsuit) Returned to the Inmate for Non Compliance with Local Rule 5(d)(1). Document returned electronically and original returned via USPS (Attachments: #1 local rule 5, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(KMW)
January 28, 2021 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable on #7 Letter of Deficiency. Mail returned from Darius Byrd, Kiran Sirafite, Roland Angie, and Jonathan Rosalie . Reason: No Longer at LSP, Name and DOC number do not match (KMW) (Main Document 9 replaced on 1/28/2021) (KMW). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2021: #1 Attachment) (KMW).
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order by Charles J. Neely. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(KMW)
January 22, 2021 Filing 7 Letter of Deficiency: The Clerk has filed your new suit. However, it is deficient in the areas as stated herein. The deficiency must be corrected within the given time frame. Amended Pleadings due by 2/12/2021. Filing Fee due by 2/12/2021. Statement of Account due by 2/12/2021. (DCB)
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 There is no record document #6 - Entered in Error. (EDC) Modified on 1/21/2021 to edit the text and remove the document (NLT).
January 21, 2021 Filing 5 There is no record document #5 - Entered in Error. (EDC) Modified on 1/21/2021 to edit the text and remove the document (NLT).
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 There is no record document #4 - Entered in Error. (EDC) Modified on 1/21/2021 to edit the text and remove the document (NLT).
January 21, 2021 Filing 3 There is no record document #3 - Entered in Error. (EDC) Modified on 1/21/2021 to edit the text and remove the document (NLT).
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 There is no record document #2 - Entered in Error. (EDC) Modified on 1/21/2021 to edit the text and remove the document (NLT).
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Luke Relhms, filed by Brandon Fisher, Terrance Royal, Kevin Francis, Jackie Pruitt, Jeremiah Benoit, David Ramirez, Darius Byrd, Milton Wilson, Ahmad Lawson, Brian Allen, Chris Washburn, Kiran Sirafite, Charles J. Neely, Jules Robertson, Anthony Craig, Sr., Lionel Redditt, Lamarquette Erving, Bobby Isidore, Melvin Miller, Jonathan M. Rosalie, Roland Angie, Vinterrious Burton, Calvin Mitchell, Michael Goddis.(KMW)
January 19, 2021 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (KMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher et al v. Relhms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Craig, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Benoit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jules Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Washburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Pruitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Isidore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland Angie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionel Redditt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vinterrious Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan M. Rosalie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Royal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamarquette Erving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles J. Neely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmad Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Goddis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darius Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiran Sirafite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Relhms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?