Poston v. Cottonmouth Boats, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Tony Nick Poston, Jr
Defendant: Cottonmouth Boats, LLC and XYZ Insurance Company
Petitioner: Captain Tony N Poston, Jr
Case Number: 3:2021cv00052
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff's #6 Motion for Extension and Stay is GRANTED. Plaintiff has an additional 20 days to respond to the Motion to Remand and the deadlines set by the Court's #2 Scheduling Conference Order are STAYED pending resolution of the Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 3/17/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
March 12, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief in Response to #5 MOTION to Remandand Stay All Other Deadlines Until the Issue of Remand Has Been Decided. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
March 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief in Response to #5 MOTION to Remand and Stay All Other Deadlines Until the Issue of Remand Has Been Decided by Tony Nick Poston, Jr. (Sanford, Jeffry) Modified on 3/12/2021 to edit the dcocket text and add the MOTION to Stay (KMW).
February 19, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
February 19, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand and for Attorney Fees and Costs by Cottonmouth Boats, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Lawrence, Seth). Modified on 2/19/2021 to edit event and text (LLH).
January 29, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tony Nick Poston, Jr re #3 Claim/Answer (Sanford, Jeffry)
January 28, 2021 Filing 3 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Reconventional Demand by All Plaintiffs. (Sanford, Jeffry) Modified on 1/29/2021 to edit text. (EDC).
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/8/2021 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 3/25/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 1/27/2021. (KAH)
January 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd JDC, Parish of Ascension, State of Louisiana, Case Number 129,464. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2236689), filed by Tony N Poston, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court Petition, #2 Attachment State Court Answer and Recon Demand, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanford, Jeffry) (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/21/2021 to rotate pages.) (EDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poston v. Cottonmouth Boats, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cottonmouth Boats, LLC
Represented By: Seth Franklin Lawrence
Represented By: Mark L. Barbre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Captain Tony N Poston, Jr
Represented By: Jeffry L. Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Nick Poston, Jr
Represented By: Benjamin Graham Cascio
Represented By: Jeffry L. Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?