Poiroux v. Thomas
Plaintiff: Eric Poiroux
Defendant: S. Lea Thomas
Case Number: 3:2021cv00054
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 3/4/2021. (LLH)
March 4, 2021 Filing 4 JUDGMENT is entered in favor of S. Lea Thomas against Eric Poiroux. The above captioned proceeding is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure of the Plaintiff to correct the deficiencies of which he was notified. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 3/4/2021. (LLH)
March 4, 2021 Filing 3 RULING: Plaintiff's action shall be dismissed without prejudice for failure to correct the deficiencies of which he was notified. The above-captioned proceeding is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 3/4/2021. (LLH)
February 3, 2021 Filing 2 Letter of Deficiency: The Clerk has filed your new suit. However, it is deficient in the areas as stated herein. The deficiency must be corrected within the given time frame. Filing Fee due by 2/24/2021. Statement of Account due by 2/24/2021. (ELW)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against S. Lea Thomas, filed by Eric Poiroux. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 cover letter)(KMW)
January 15, 2021 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (KMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poiroux v. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Poiroux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Lea Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?