Johnson v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: Andre Johnson
Defendant: James M. LeBlanc, Kenny Jackson, Joseph F.G. Lamartiniere, James Cruze and Paul Smith
Case Number: 3:2021cv00071
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to withhold issuance of summons until further order of the Court. No service shall be made by the United States Marshals Service at this time. It is ordered that the plaintiff pay an initial partial filing fee of $14.05 in accordance with 28 USC 1915. A copy of this order shall be sent to the plaintiff and to Centralized Inmate Banking. Filing Fee due by 3/31/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/10/2021. (LLH)
March 9, 2021 Filing 5 Statement of Account by Andre Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 cover letter)(KMW)
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Andre Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(KMW)
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against James Cruze, Kenny Jackson, Joseph F.G. Lamartiniere, James M. LeBlanc, Paul Smith, filed by Andre Johnson.(KMW)
February 23, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
February 3, 2021 Filing 2 Letter of Deficiency: The Clerk has filed your new suit. However, it is deficient in the areas as stated herein. The deficiency must be corrected within the given time frame. Amended Pleadings due by 2/24/2021. Filing Fee due by 2/24/2021. Statement of Account due by 2/24/2021. (SWE) (Main Document 2 replaced to correct fee amount on 2/3/2021) (SWE).
January 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Andre Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(KMW)
January 28, 2021 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (KMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph F.G. Lamartiniere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cruze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?