Plaisance et al v. State of Louisiana et al
Plaintiff: William Grieshaber, Brook Plaisance, Stephen Strick, Fredrick Bass and Amanda Coleman
Defendant: John Bel Edwards, State of Louisiana, Louisiana Workforce Commission and Ava DeJoie
Case Number: 3:2021cv00121
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Motion for Class Certification shall be filed by 4/30/2021. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 4/20/2021. (LLH)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Saima Aktar to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ATTENTION: Local counsel shall provide the following link regarding e-file registration to those attorneys granted leave to proceed pro hac vice in the Middle District of Louisiana, if they so choose #www.lamd.uscourts.gov/pro-hac-vice-e-filing-registration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/20/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
April 20, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #35 Second MOTION for Ms. Saima Aktar to Appear Pro Hac Vice . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
April 19, 2021 Filing 35 Second MOTION for Ms. Saima Aktar to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2276082) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED ORDER)(Clevenger, Ellyn) Modified on 4/20/2021 to edit the docket text (KMW).
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying without prejudice the #29 and #30 Plaintiffs' Motions for Admission of Visiting Attorney as Co-Counsel, Pursuant to Local Rule 83(b)(8). The motions are not in complaint with Local Rule 83(b)(8)(D) and the Court's Administrative Procedure for Filing Electronic Documents F(1)(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/19/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
April 16, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of No Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Memorandum in Support by Fredrick Bass, Amanda Coleman, William Grieshaber, Brook Plaisance, Stephen Strick re #32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Memorandum in Support (Clevenger, Ellyn)
April 16, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clevenger, Ellyn) Modified on 4/16/2021 to edit text. (EDC).
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #18 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. Civ. P. 12 . Response shall be filed no later than 5/5/2021. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 4/15/2021. (SWE)
April 16, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #29 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll SAIMA AKTAR as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
April 16, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #30 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll SAIMA AKTAR as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
April 15, 2021 Filing 30 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll SAIMA AKTAR as Additional Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #2 Affidavit RULE 83 AFFIDAVIT, #3 Attachment PROPOSED ORDER)(Clevenger, Ellyn)
April 15, 2021 Filing 29 Ex Parte MOTION to Enroll SAIMA AKTAR as Additional Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING, #2 Affidavit RULE 83 AFFIDAVIT)(Clevenger, Ellyn)
April 14, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. 12 by Ava DeJoie, Louisiana Workforce Commission. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Mathews, Kellen)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of the Defendant, State of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 4/14/2021. (SWE)
April 8, 2021 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #18 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. Civ. P. 12 With Incorporated Memorandum in Support by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED ORDER)(Clevenger, Ellyn) Modified on 4/9/2021 to edit text (LLH).
April 8, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fredrick Bass, Amanda Coleman, William Grieshaber, Brook Plaisance, Stephen Strick (Clevenger, Ellyn) Modified on 4/8/2021 to edit the event type (KMW).
April 5, 2021 Filing 24 Minute Entry/ Video Status Conference Report for status conference held before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/5/2021. The parties agreed to approximately 45 days to conduct discovery before the preliminary injunction hearing and that a formal limited scheduling order was not necessary. If discovery disputes arise during this discovery period that cannot be resolved through the conferral process, the parties shall send correspondence to the undersigned summarizing the dispute so that any issues can be addressed as quickly as possible. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD) Modified on 4/19/2021 to edit the file date and hearing date (NLT).
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Considering the video status conference set for 4/5/2021, the evidentiary hearing on Plaintiffs' request for a preliminary injunction set on 4/6/2021 at 1:30 p.m. is CONTINUED, without a date. Telephone Status Conference set for 4/8/2021 at 02:30 PM to set a new hearing date. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 3/30/2021. (SWE) (Main Document 23 replaced with correct document on 3/30/2021) (SWE).
March 30, 2021 Terminate Hearings per RD 23 (SWE)
March 29, 2021 Filing 22 Joint Proposed Limited Schedule to Conduct Discovery Necessary to Prepare for a Preliminary Injunction Hearing by All Plaintiffs. (Clevenger, Ellyn) Modified on 3/30/2021 to edit text. (EDC).
March 26, 2021 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Bel Edwards. (Walsh, John) Modified on 3/29/2021 to edit text. (EDC).
March 26, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ava DeJoie, Louisiana Workforce Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Aff. of Mabile, #2 Exhibit 2- Aff. of Williams, #3 Exhibit 3- Proc. 27-JBE-2020)(Mathews, Kellen) Modified on 3/29/2021 to edit the text (NLT).
March 26, 2021 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Louisiana. (Holliday, Carey) Modified on 3/26/2021 to edit text (ELW).
March 25, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. Civ. P. 12 by John Bel Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Walsh, John) Modified on 3/25/2021 to edit the docket text (SWE).
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Ex-Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings pursuant to Local Rule 7(a). Ava DeJoie and Louisiana Workforce Commission responsive pleadings due 4/14/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/25/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
March 25, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #16 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
March 24, 2021 Filing 16 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Ava DeJoie, Louisiana Workforce Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Dunaway, Rachel)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Enroll Additional Attorney. Added attorney Carey T. Jones for State of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/24/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
March 24, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Enroll Carey T. Jones as Additional Attorney by State of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Holliday, Carey)
March 24, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #14 MOTION to Enroll Carey T. Jones as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #11 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Defendants shall file their response(s), if any, to Plaintiffs' request for a preliminary injunction no later than Friday, March 26, 2021. An evidentiary hearing on Plaintiffs' request for a preliminary injunction shall occur on Tuesday, April 6, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 2. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 3/16/2021. (EDC)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE AND ORDER: A video status conference is set for April 5, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Wilder-Doomes to discuss scheduling in this matter. Participant instructions are attached. Prior to the telephone conference, the parties shall confer regarding a proposed limited schedule to conduct discovery necessary to prepare for a preliminary injunction hearing, and shall jointly file a proposed limited schedule, no more than three pages, by no later than March 29, 2021. Any disagreements shall be reflected in the joint filing, i.e., no party is permitted to file a separate proposed schedule. A limited scheduling order will be implemented in this case notwithstanding the pending #8 Motion to Dismiss, filed by the State of Louisiana, or the #11 Motion for injunctive relief, filed by Plaintiffs. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for Plaintiffs shall serve this Notice and Order on Defendants John Bel Edwards, Louisiana Workforce Commission and Ave DeJoie. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/9/2021. (BLR)
March 8, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Temporary Injunction without Hearing and Injunction After Hearing by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment)(Clevenger, Ellyn). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 3/29/2021 (NLT).
March 8, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amanda Coleman, Fredrick Bass, Brook Plaisance, Stephen Strick, William Grieshaber. All Defendants. (Clevenger, Ellyn)
March 8, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon ALL DEFENDANTS by Service (Clevenger, Ellyn)
March 5, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by State of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Holliday, Carey)
March 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE: The Original Complaint, Request for Immediate Temporary Injunction Without Hearing, and Preliminary and Permanent Injunction After Hearing was filed by Plaintiffs Brooke Plaisance, Frederick Bass, Amanda Coleman, Stephen Strick and William Grieshaber on February 25, 2021. In light of the request for preliminary injunctive relief, this matter will be set for a scheduling conference on an expedited basis following Plaintiff's filing of service information into the record as to each defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/5/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Vacating #5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/4/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/29/2021 at 01:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 4/15/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/3/2021. (BLR)
March 2, 2021 Filing 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian A. Jackson: Telephone Conference held on 3/2/2021. Matter discussed. Counsel for Plaintiffs advised the Court that all Defendants will be served by 3/4/2021. The Court informed Counsel for all parties that United States Magistrate Judge Wilder-Doomes will set this matter for a scheduling conference in the coming day. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (PJH)
March 1, 2021 Filing 3 Notice to Counsel: Telephone Conference set for 3/2/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Brian A. Jackson. Dial-in information will be emailed to Counsel prior to the conference. Evidence, in electronic format, shall be provided in accordance with Local Rule 79 and Administrative Procedures.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (PJH)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ava DeJoie, John Bel Edwards, Louisiana Workforce Commission, State of Louisiana. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons, #5 summons)(EDC)
February 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Request for Immediate Temporary Injunction Without Hearing, and Preliminary and Permanent Injunction After Hearing against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2252859.), filed by Amanda Coleman, Fredrick Bass, Brook Plaisance, Stephen Strick, William Grieshaber. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Verification of Brook Plaisance, #2 Affidavit Verification of Fredrick Bass, #3 Affidavit Verification of Amanda Coleman, #4 Affidavit Verification of Stephen Strick, #5 Affidavit Verification of William Grieshaber, #6 Affidavit Certification of Counsel, #7 Attachment Proposed Order, #8 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Attachment Summonses)(Clevenger, Ellyn) Modified on 2/25/2021 to edit the docket text (KMW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plaisance et al v. State of Louisiana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Grieshaber
Represented By: Wendy Manard
Represented By: Ellyn Clevenger
Represented By: Saima Abida Aktar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brook Plaisance
Represented By: Wendy Manard
Represented By: Ellyn Clevenger
Represented By: Saima Abida Aktar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Strick
Represented By: Wendy Manard
Represented By: Ellyn Clevenger
Represented By: Saima Abida Aktar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredrick Bass
Represented By: Wendy Manard
Represented By: Ellyn Clevenger
Represented By: Saima Abida Aktar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Coleman
Represented By: Wendy Manard
Represented By: Ellyn Clevenger
Represented By: Saima Abida Aktar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bel Edwards
Represented By: Rachel Phaedra Dunaway
Represented By: John Charles Walsh
Represented By: Matthew F. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Angelique Duhon Freel
Represented By: Carey Austin Holliday
Represented By: Carey T. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Workforce Commission
Represented By: Kellen James Mathews
Represented By: William Bernard Gaudet
Represented By: Rachel Phaedra Dunaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ava DeJoie
Represented By: Kellen James Mathews
Represented By: William Bernard Gaudet
Represented By: Rachel Phaedra Dunaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?