New Orleans City et al v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Plaintiff: New Orleans Aviation Board, New Orleans City, City of New Orleans and New Orleans Municipal Employees Retirement System
Defendant: Mizuho Securities, USA LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, TD Securities (USA) LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., HSBC Securities USA, Bank of America Corporation doing business as Merrill Lynch, BMO Capital Markets, Inc., Wells Fargo & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald, Unidentified Parties, Merrill Lynch, UBS Securities LLC, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Jeffries Group, LLC, SG Americas Securities, LLC., Credit Suisse AG, Stifel Nicolaus & Co., Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., Barclays Bank PLC, Stifel Nicholas & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC and Stifel, Nicolaus & Co., Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv00147
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Office: Baton Rouge Office
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
2 Judge: Scott D Johnson
3 Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019.. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 4/22/2021. (DCB) (Main Document 100 replaced on 4/22/2021 with correct document) (SWE).
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: This action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within thirty (30) days, to reopen the action if the settlement is not consummated. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 4/22/2021. (DCB)
April 21, 2021 Filing 98 NOTICE of Settlement by New Orleans Aviation Board, New Orleans City, New Orleans Municipal Employees Retirement System (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perkins, Alejandro)
April 12, 2021 Filing 97 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Merrill Lynch identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company for Merrill Lynch. (Ferachi, Michael)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #95 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Plead, filed by All Defendants. For good cause shown and without objection, all defendants shall file responsive pleadings to the #1 Complaint for Damages Pursuant to the Sherman Antitrust Act by no later than May 4, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 04/09/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD)
April 9, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #95 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint,, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
April 8, 2021 Filing 95 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint,, by BMO Capital Markets Corp, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of America Corporation, Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Cantor Fitzgerald, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, HSBC Securities USA, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jeffries Group, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC., Stifel, Nicolaus & Co., Inc, TD Securities (USA) LLC, UBS Securities LLC, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Schwab, Thomas)
April 5, 2021 Filing 94 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Hite, John)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 4/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/11/2021. (BLR)
March 10, 2021 Filing 92 Letter to Attorney John William Hite, III regarding Miles W. Swanson who is Co-Counsel for party JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., and J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (LLH)
March 9, 2021 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick and Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Judge John W. deGravelles, Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (LLH)
March 8, 2021 Filing 91 Case transferred in from the Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-02570. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER: For the reasons stated above, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #89 MOTION for Transfer of Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and the "First Filed" Rule is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 3/8/2021.(jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
March 8, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge John W. deGravelles and Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (LLH)
March 3, 2021 Filing 89 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Transfer of Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and the "First Filed" Rule by BMO Capital Markets Corp, Bank of America Corporation, Cantor Fitzgerald, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, HSBC Securities USA, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jeffries Group, LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, SG Americas Securities, LLC, Stifel, Nicolaus & Co., Inc., TD Securities USA LLC, UBS Securities LLC, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schwab, Thomas) Modified text on 3/4/2021 (jeg). Modified text on 3/4/2021 (mmv). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
February 18, 2021 Filing 88 NOTICE of Hearing. A call-in scheduling conference is set for 3/18/2021 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. Please follow the instructions provided in the notice. (mmv) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
February 17, 2021 Filing 87 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by BNP Paribas Securities Corp identifying Corporate Parent BNP Paribas for BNP Paribas Securities Corp (Johnson, Ryan) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER: Plaintiff was ordered to file proofs of service upon defendants, Credit Suisse AG, Morgan Kegan & Company, Inc. and Mizuho Securities USA LLC into the record by February 15, 2021. The plaintiff has failed to do so. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that defendants, Credit Suisse AG, Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc. and Mizuho Securities USA LLC are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 2/17/2021.(cwa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Filing 85 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc identifying Corporate Parent Barclays US LLC, Corporate Parent Barclays US Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Barclays Bank PLC, Corporate Parent Barclays Group US Inc., Corporate Parent Barclays PLC for Barclays Capital Inc; Corporate Parent Barclays PLC for Barclays Bank PLC (Golden, Robert) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
February 4, 2021 Filing 84 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Raymond James & Associates, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Raymond James Financial, Inc., Corporate Parent Blackrock, Inc. for Raymond James & Associates, Inc. (Vermeulen, Zoe) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
February 4, 2021 Filing 83 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #82 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not add Citigroup Financial Products, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., and Citigroup Global Markets Holdings, Inc as a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
February 3, 2021 Filing 82 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Citigroup Financial Products, Inc.; Corporate Parent Citigroup Inc to Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.; Corporate Parent Citigroup Global Markets Holdings, Inc. for Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. (Beebe, Mark) Modified text/corporate parents on 2/4/2021 (jeg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) GRANTING #77 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Raymond James & Associates, Inc. shall have until April 13, 2021 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 1/28/21. (fmm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
January 28, 2021 Filing 80 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #77 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. **Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 1. No further action necessary.** (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
January 27, 2021 Filing 79 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by UBS Securities LLC identifying Corporate Parent UBS Americas Holding LLC, Corporate Parent UBS Group AG, Corporate Parent UBS AG, Corporate Parent UBS Americas Inc. for UBS Securities LLC (Freeman, George) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) GRANTING #76 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. BMO Capital Markets Corp., BMO Capital Markets, Inc., Bank of America Corporation, Cantor Fitzgerald, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, HSBC Securities USA, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jeffries Group, LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, SG Americas Securities, LLC, Stifel, Nicolaus & Co., Inc., TD Securities USA LLC, UBS Securities LLC, Wells Fargo & Co., and Wells Fargo Securities, LLC shall have until April 13, 2021 to file responsive pleadings in this matter. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 1/27/21. (fmm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
January 27, 2021 Filing 77 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 COMPLAINT by Raymond James & Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney James Rodney Chastain, Jr added to party Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc.(pty:dft).(Chastain, James) Modified text/linkage on 1/28/2021 (jeg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
January 26, 2021 Filing 76 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, by BMO Capital Markets, Inc., Bank of America Corporation, Cantor Fitzgerald, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, HSBC Securities USA, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jeffries Group, LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, SG Americas Securities, LLC, Stifel, Nicolaus & Co., Inc., TD Securities USA LLC, UBS Securities LLC, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carter, Winstol) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff shall have until February 15,2021 to file proof of service upon Credit Suisse AG, Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., and Mizuho Securities USA LLC. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of these defendants without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 1/1/2021.(jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Granting as unopposed #72 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Barclays Bank PLC and Barclays Capital Inc shall have until April 13, 2021 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 1/15/21. (fmm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
January 15, 2021 Filing 73 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #63 Summons Returned Executed. Filings attorney entered incorrect service date for parties served. BMO Capital Markets, Inc., Cantor Fitzgerald, SG Americas Securities, LLC, TD Securities USA LLC, served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020; Bank of America Corporation, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC served on 11/19/2020, answer due 11/30/2020; Wells Fargo & Co. served on 11/2/2020, answer due 11/23/2020; Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary. (lt) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
January 14, 2021 Filing 72 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Robert Harrison Golden added to party Barclays Bank PLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Harrison Golden added to party Barclays Capital Inc(pty:dft).(Golden, Robert) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Granting as unopposed #70 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Merrill Lynch, and Nomura Securities International, Inc. shall have until April 13, 2021 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 1/14/21. (fmm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
January 13, 2021 Filing 70 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Nomura Securities International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Ryan Estes Johnson added to party BNP Paribas Securities Corp(pty:dft).(Johnson, Ryan) Modified text on 1/14/2021 (cwa). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #66 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice be granted and that Alison L. Wollin as visiting co counsel is permitted to appear and participate as additional co-counsel of record for Defendant UBS Securities LLC. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 1/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #65 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice be granted and that Jefferson E. Bell as visiting cocounsel is permitted to appear and participate as additional co-counsel of record for Defendant UBS Securities LLC. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 1/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
January 13, 2021 Filing 67 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by All Plaintiffs re #58 Order (Perkins, Alejandro) Modified text on 1/14/2021 (cwa). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
January 7, 2021 Filing 66 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alison L. Wollin (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8675739) by UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alison L. Wollin, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Freeman, George) Modified text on 1/8/2021 (jeg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
January 7, 2021 Filing 65 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jefferson E. Bell (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8675738) by UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jefferson E. Bell, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Freeman, George) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
January 7, 2021 Filing 64 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #63 Summons Returned Executed. Filings attorney entered incorrect service date for parties served. Barclays Capital Inc served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020 ; Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. UBS Securities LLC served on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. No further action is necessary. (lt) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
January 6, 2021 Filing 63 SUMMONS Returned Executed; BMO Capital Markets, Inc. served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020; BNP Paribas Securities Corp served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020; Bank of America Corporation served on 11/19/2020, answer due 12/10/2020; Barclays Capital Inc served on 11/10/2020, answer due 12/1/2020; Cantor Fitzgerald served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020; Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. served on 11/19/2020, answer due 12/10/2020; Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC served on 11/19/2020, answer due 12/10/2020; Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020; Nomura Securities International, Inc. served on 11/4/2020, answer due 11/25/2020; SG Americas Securities, LLC served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020; Stifel, Nicolaus & Co., Inc. served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020; TD Securities USA LLC served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020; UBS Securities LLC served on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020; Wells Fargo & Co. served on 11/19/2020, answer due 12/10/2020; Wells Fargo Securities, LLC served on 11/2/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Returned Summons - BNP Paribas, #2 Returned Summons - BOA, #3 Returned Summons - Cantor, #4 Returned Summons - CitiGroup, #5 Returned Summons - Credit Suisse, #6 Returned Summons - Morgan Stanley, #7 Returned Summons - Nomura, #8 Returned Summons - SG Americas, #9 Returned Summons - Stifel, Nicolaus, #10 Returned Summons - TD Securities, #11 Returned Summons - UBS Securities, #12 Returned Summons - Wells Fargo, #13 Returned Summons - WFCO, #14 Returned Summons - Barclays Capital, Inc)(Perkins, Alejandro) Modified text on 1/7/2021 (lt). Modified dates on 1/15/2021 (lt). Modified text/dates on 1/15/2021 (mmv). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #60 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. David S. Lesser, of the law firm of Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, is permitted to appear as a visiting attorney for and on behalf of defendant, Cantor Fitzgerald & Co. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 12/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
December 29, 2020 Filing 61 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #60 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice David S. Lesser. **The title of the attached proposed order should not include the word Proposed but only reflect Order on the actual document. Please follow this requirement on future pleadings.** (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
December 28, 2020 Filing 60 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice David S. Lesser (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8661495) by Cantor Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David S. Lesser, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Stanley, Richard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
December 28, 2020 Filing 59 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Bank of America Corporation (Ferachi, Michael) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS ORDERED that, plaintiffs show cause on or before January 13, 2021, by written motion or memorandum, as is appropriate, to report the status thereof or show cause why defendants, Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Merrill Lynch, Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., Mizuho Securities, USA LLC, and/or Stifel Nicholas & Co. should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 12/22/2020.(jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #53 #54 #55 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice are GRANTED. John Friel, Robert Houck and Minji Reem, of the law firm Clifford Chance US LLP, are permitted to appear as visiting attorneys for and on behalf of defendant, BMO Capital Markets Corp. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 12/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Filing 56 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by BMO Capital Markets Corp identifying Corporate Parent Bank of Montreal for BMO Capital Markets Corp (Balascio, Michael) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Filing 55 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Minji Reem (Fee previously paid) by BMO Capital Markets Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Balascio, Michael) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Filing 54 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert Houck (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8643223) by BMO Capital Markets Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Balascio, Michael) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
December 15, 2020 Filing 53 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice John Friel (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8643193) by BMO Capital Markets Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Balascio, Michael) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Granting #51 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as unopposed. The following parties shall have until January 29, 2021 to file responsive pleadings in this case: BMO Capital Markets, Inc., Bank of America Corporation, Cantor Fitzgerald, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, HSBC Securities USA, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jeffries Group, LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, SG Americas Securities, LLC, Stifel, Nicolaus & Co., Inc., TD Securities USA LLC, UBS Securities LLC, Wells Fargo & Co., and Wells Fargo Securities. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 12/10/20. (fmm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
December 9, 2020 Filing 51 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by BMO Capital Markets, Corp., Bank of America Corporation, Cantor Fitzgerald, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, HSBC Securities USA, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jeffries Group, LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, SG Americas Securities, LLC, Stifel, Nicolaus & Co., Inc., TD Securities USA LLC, UBS Securities LLC, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schwab, Thomas) Modified text on 12/10/2020 (jeg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Granting #49 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.8, Bank of America Corporation shall have until December 31, 2020 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 12/8/20. (fmm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
December 4, 2020 Filing 49 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Bank of America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Michael David Ferachi added to party Bank of America Corporation(pty:dft).(Ferachi, Michael) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
December 2, 2020 Filing 48 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #44 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter Wells Fargo & Co as a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
December 2, 2020 Filing 47 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Hite, John) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
December 2, 2020 Filing 46 Application for Refund of Electronic Fees filed by TD Securities (USA) LLC for the following reason: internet navigation error; receipt number ALAEDC-8618981. (Cunningham, Mark) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #33 , #34 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice are GRANTED. Paul S. Mishkin and Robert G. King are permitted to appear as visiting attorneys for and on behalf of defendant, TD Securities (USA) LLC. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 12/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (jeg) Modified text on 12/1/2020 (mmv). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
December 1, 2020 Filing 44 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Co. for Wells Fargo Securities, LLC (Degan, Nancy) Modified text/corporate parents on 12/2/2020 (jeg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Granting #40 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.8, Cantor Fitzgerald shall have until December 22, 2020 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 12/1/20. (fmm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Granting #38 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.8, HSBC Securities USA, Inc. shall have until January 4, 2021 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 12/1/20. (fmm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.8, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC shall have until December 31, 2020 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 12/1/20. (fmm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
December 1, 2020 Filing 40 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Cantor Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Richard C. Stanley added to party Cantor Fitzgerald(pty:dft).(Stanley, Richard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
December 1, 2020 Filing 39 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC identifying Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG for Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC (Schwab, Thomas) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
December 1, 2020 Filing 38 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by HSBC Securities USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Harry Joseph Philips, Jr added to party HSBC Securities USA(pty:dft).(Philips, Harry) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
December 1, 2020 Filing 37 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Thomas E. Schwab added to party Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC(pty:dft).(Schwab, Thomas) Modified text on 12/1/2020 (lt). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.8, TD Securities (USA) LLC, incorrectly named in the Complaint as TD Securities LLC, shall have until December 23, 2020 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 12/1/20. (fmm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.8, SG Americas Securities, LLC shall have until December 21, 2020 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 12/1/20. (fmm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 34 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8619023) by TD Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Robert G. King, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Consent to Electronic Filing)(Cunningham, Mark) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 33 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8619012) by TD Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Paul S. Mishkin, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Consent to E-File)(Cunningham, Mark) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 32 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by TD Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Mark Aaron Cunningham added to party TD Securities LLC(pty:dft).(Cunningham, Mark) Modified text on 12/1/2020 (cwa). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 31 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by TD Securities LLC identifying Corporate Parent Toronto Dominion Holdings (U.S.A.), Inc., Corporate Parent TD Group US Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Toronto-Dominion Bank for TD Securities LLC (Cunningham, Mark) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 30 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by SG Americas Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Harry Joseph Philips, Jr added to party SG Americas Securities, LLC(pty:dft).(Philips, Harry) Modified text on 12/1/2020 (cwa). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #24 , #25 and #26 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice are GRANTED. Kenneth I. Schacter, Jon R. Roellke and Jawad B. Muaddi are permitted to appear as visiting attorneys for and on behalf of defendant, Jefferies Group LLC. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 11/30/2020. (jeg) Modified text on 11/30/2020 (mmv). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/30/2020: #1 Notice PHV Attorneys) (mmv). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.8, BMO Capital Markets, Inc. shall have until December 21, 2020 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 11/30/20. (fmm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
November 27, 2020 Filing 27 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by BMO Capital Markets, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Michael A. Balascio added to party BMO Capital Markets, Inc.(pty:dft).(Balascio, Michael) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
November 25, 2020 Filing 26 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jawad B. Muaddi (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8614570) by Jeffries Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jawad B. Muaddi in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac vice, #2 Consent to Electronic Filing, #3 Proposed Order)(Carter, Winstol) Modified text on 11/27/2020 (jeg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
November 25, 2020 Filing 25 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jon R. Roellke (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8614520) by Jeffries Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jon R. Roellke in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Consent to Electronic Filing, #3 Proposed Order)(Carter, Winstol) Modified text on 11/27/2020 (jeg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
November 25, 2020 Filing 24 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kenneth I. Schacter (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8614478) by Jeffries Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kenneth I. Schacter in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Consent to Electronic Filing, #3 Proposed Order)(Carter, Winstol) Modified text on 11/27/2020 (jeg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.8, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC shall have until December 21, 2020 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 11/25/20. (fmm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
November 25, 2020 Filing 22 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #19 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc., Morgan Stanley Capital Management LLC, and Morgan Stanley as a corporate parent(s) at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert A Sacks is GRANTED. Robert Andrew Sacks is permitted to appear as a visiting attorney for and on behalf of defendant, Stifel, Nicolaus & Co., Inc. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 11/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
November 24, 2020 Filing 20 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of No Opposition, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Harry Joseph Philips, Jr added to party Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC(pty:dft).(Philips, Harry) Modified text on 11/25/2020 (jeg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
November 24, 2020 Filing 19 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley Capital Management LLC, Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley for Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC (Philips, Harry) Modified text/corporate parents on 11/25/2020 (jeg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.8, UBS Securities LLC shall have until December 28, 2020 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 11/24/20. (fmm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.8. Stifel, Nicolaus & Co., Inc. shall have until December 21, 2020 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 11/24/20. (fmm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
November 24, 2020 Filing 16 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Jeffries Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Jefferies Financial Group Inc. for Jeffries Group, LLC (Carter, Winstol) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
November 23, 2020 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of No Opposition, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney George C. Freeman, III added to party UBS Securities LLC(pty:dft).(Freeman, George) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
November 23, 2020 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert Andrew Sacks (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8609548) by Stifel, Nicolaus & Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert A. Sacks, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Freeman, George) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
November 23, 2020 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Stifel, Nicolaus & Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney George C. Freeman, III added to party Stifel, Nicolaus & Co., Inc.(pty:dft).(Freeman, George) Modified text on 11/23/2020 (lt). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Pursuant to LR 7.8, Jeffries Group, LLC shall have until December 21, 2020 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 11/23/20. (fmm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Jeffries Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Winstol D. Carter, Jr added to party Jeffries Group, LLC(pty:dft).(Carter, Winstol) Modified text on 11/20/2020 (jeg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Pursuant to LR 7.8, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC and JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. shall have until December 21, 2020 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 11/20/20. (fmm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) Granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Wells Fargo & Company and Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. Wells Fargo & Company and Wells Fargo Securities, LLC shall have until December 14, 2020 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 11/19/20. (fmm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
November 19, 2020 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney John William Hite, III added to party J.P. Morgan Securities LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John William Hite, III added to party JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:dft).(Hite, John) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
November 19, 2020 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. **Document lists counsel Jonathan Rosenberg, Katrina M. Robson, and Patrick J. Jones for a party in this action who have not been admitted to practice in this court. Any party not appearing in proper person must be represented by a member of the bar of this court (L.R. 83.2.4). Please see Local Rule 83.2.2 for this courts Procedures for Admission and Local Rule 83.2.5 for Visiting Attorneys to appear and participate Pro Hac Vice. Any future filings which list attorneys not admitted pursuant to LR 83.2.2 or 83.2.5 will not be accepted and will be deemed deficient.** (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Nancy Scott Degan added to party Wells Fargo & Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Nancy Scott Degan added to party Wells Fargo Securities, LLC(pty:dft).(Degan, Nancy) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to BMO Capital Markets, Inc., BNP Paribas Securities Corp, Bank of America Corporation, Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Cantor Fitzgerald, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, HSBC Securities USA, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jeffries Group, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Mizuho Securities, USA LLC, Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, Stifel Nicholas & Co., TD Securities LLC, UBS Securities LLC, Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons)(lt) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Summons Submitted for Issuance. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Summons. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summons - Barclays Bank, #2 Summons - Barclays Capital, #3 Summons - BMO Capital, #4 Summons - BNP Paribas, #5 Summons - Cantor Fitzgerald, #6 Summons - Citigroup Global, #7 Summons - Credit Suisse AG, #8 Summons - Credit Suisse Securities, #9 Summons - HSBC Securities, #10 Summons - Jefferies Group, #11 Summons - JP Morgan Chase, #12 Summons - JP Morgan Securities, #13 Summons - Merrill Lynch, #14 Summons - Mizuho, #15 Summons - Morgan Keegan, #16 Summons - Morgan Stanley, #17 Summons - Nomura Securities, #18 Summons - SG Americas Securities, #19 Summons - Stifel Nicolaus, #20 Summons - TD Securities, #21 Summons - UBS Securities, #22 Summons - Wells Fargo Securities, #23 Summons - Wells Fargo)(Perkins, Alejandro) (Main Document and Attachments 1-23 replaced on 9/22/2020) (jeg). Modified text on 9/22/2020 (jeg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8508136) filed by New Orleans Municipal Employees Retirement System, City of New Orleans, New Orleans Aviation Board. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Alejandro R. Perkins added to party City of New Orleans(pty:pla), Attorney Alejandro R. Perkins added to party New Orleans Aviation Board(pty:pla), Attorney Alejandro R. Perkins added to party New Orleans Municipal Employees Retirement System(pty:pla).(Perkins, Alejandro) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/8/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Orleans City et al v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mizuho Securities, USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Claire Bergeron
Represented By: Mark Raymond Beebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond James & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Dalton Bourgeois, JR.
Represented By: Zoe Wilde Vermeulen
Represented By: James Rodney Chastain, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Securities, LLC
Represented By: Nancy Scott Degan
Represented By: Alexander M. McIntyre, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Capital Markets Corp
Represented By: Michael Anthony Balascio
Represented By: Janelle E. Sharer
Represented By: Minji Reem
Represented By: Robert Gene Houck
Represented By: John Davis Friel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: John William Hite, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Thomas E. Schwab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Ryan Estes Johnson
Represented By: Justin John Marocco
Represented By: Mark A. Cunningham
Represented By: Robert G. King
Represented By: Paul S. Mishkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: John William Hite, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Represented By: David Patron
Represented By: Robert Harrison Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Keegan & Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Securities USA
Represented By: Harry Joseph Philips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation doing business as Merrill Lynch
Represented By: Michael David Ferachi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Capital Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Co.
Represented By: Nancy Scott Degan
Represented By: Alexander M. McIntyre, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cantor Fitzgerald
Represented By: Kathryn Weatherly Munson
Represented By: Richard C. Stanley
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser
Represented By: Kathryn Munson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch
Represented By: Zelma M. Frederick
Represented By: Michael David Ferachi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Represented By: Alison L. Wollin
Represented By: Chloe Marie Chetta
Represented By: Robert J Dressel
Represented By: George C. Freeman, III
Represented By: Jefferson E Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas Securities Corp.
Represented By: Ryan Estes Johnson
Represented By: Mark A. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffries Group, LLC
Represented By: Winstol D. Carter, Jr.
Represented By: Jawad B Muaddi
Represented By: Kenneth I Schacter
Represented By: Jon R Roellke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SG Americas Securities, LLC.
Represented By: Harry Joseph Philips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stifel Nicolaus & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Chloe Marie Chetta
Represented By: Robert J Dressel
Represented By: George C. Freeman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomura Securities International, Inc.
Represented By: Harry Joseph Philips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank PLC
Represented By: David Patron
Represented By: Robert Harrison Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stifel Nicholas & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC
Represented By: Harry Joseph Philips, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stifel, Nicolaus & Co., Inc
Represented By: Chloe Marie Chetta
Represented By: Robert J Dressel
Represented By: George C. Freeman, III
Represented By: Robert A. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Orleans Aviation Board
Represented By: Alejandro R. Perkins
Represented By: Karl Joseph Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Orleans City
Represented By: Alejandro R. Perkins
Represented By: Karl Joseph Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of New Orleans
Represented By: Alejandro R. Perkins
Represented By: Karl Joseph Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Orleans Municipal Employees Retirement System
Represented By: Alejandro R. Perkins
Represented By: Karl Joseph Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?