Baton Rouge Sheet Metal Workers' Local Union #21 Pension Fund v. Doe
Plaintiff: Baton Rouge Sheet Metal Workers' Local Union #21 Pension Fund
Defendant: Jane Doe
Case Number: 3:2021cv00152
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel: In light of no service information or appearance for defendant Jane Doe, the Scheduling Conference is reset for 7/8/2021 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 6/24/2021.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 4/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/18/2021. (ELW) Modified on 3/23/2021 to edit file date (ELW).
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 MOTION for Leave to File Deposition Subpoena and Subpoena Duces Tecum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/16/2021. (SWE)
March 11, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jane Doe. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
March 11, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to File Deposition Subpoena and Subpoena Duces Tecum . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Deposition Subpoena and Subpoena Duces Tecum by Baton Rouge Sheet Metal Workers' Local Union #21 Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Lockwood, Thomas)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jane Doe ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2259098.), filed by Baton Rouge Sheet Metal Workers' Local Union #21 Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment)(Lockwood, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baton Rouge Sheet Metal Workers' Local Union #21 Pension Fund v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baton Rouge Sheet Metal Workers' Local Union #21 Pension Fund
Represented By: Thomas McCabe Lockwood, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?