Harp v. Thompson, et al
Plaintiff: TYLER HARP
Defendant: GARRET THOMPSON, Geico Casualty Company and Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00236
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Geico Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Avocato, Sean)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Joint Motion for Partial Dismissal, dismissing Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company, ONLY, without prejudice, allowing each party to bear its own costs and reserving all rights of Plaintiff to proceed against all other parties, both named and unnamed, including but not limited to Garret Thompson and GEICO Casualty Company. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 05/26/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC)
May 25, 2021 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Enter into Stipulation and Motion for Partial Dismissal Without Prejudice by Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Courtenay, Brittany) Modified on 5/26/2021 to edit the docket text (KMW).
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Enroll Additional Attorney. Added attorney Lance Louis Engolia, Jr. for Tyler Harp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 5/24/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
May 24, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Enroll Lance L. Engolia as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
May 24, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Enroll Lance L. Engolia as Additional Attorney by Tyler Harp. (Engolia, Lance)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Strike his initial Motion to Remand (R. Doc. 6) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's initial Motion to Remand (R. Doc. 6) will be STRUCK from the record by the Clerk of Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 5/24/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
May 24, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 MOTION to Remand , #7 MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document 6 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
May 21, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by Tyler Harp. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Cosse, Irvy)
May 21, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document 6 MOTION to Remand by Tyler Harp. (Cosse, Irvy)
May 21, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: 6 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
May 21, 2021 Filing 6 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD MOTION to Remand by Tyler Harp. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Engolia, Lance) Modified on 5/25/2021 to remove document as it has been stricken by Order #9 (LLH).
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 6/24/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 4/28/2021. (KAH)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 MOTION to Substitute Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk of Court will substitute the signed Civil Cover Sheet (R. Doc. 3-2) in place of the unsigned version (R. Doc. 1-4) filed with the Notice of Removal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 4/27/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
April 27, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Substitute Civil Cover Sheet . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Substitute Civil Cover Sheet by Geico Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Civil Cover Sheet)(Avocato, Sean)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Irvy E. Cosse, III regarding Lance L. Engolia who is Co-Counsel for party Tyler Harp. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (SWE)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court East Baton Rouge Parish, Case Number 704359. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2278067), filed by Geico Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Int RFPD RFA to Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit C - Progressive Consent to Removal, #4 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Avocato, Sean) (Attachment 4 replaced on 4/23/2021 to flatten page) (SWE). Modified on 4/28/2021 to replace civil cover sheet per Order #4 (LLH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harp v. Thompson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYLER HARP
Represented By: Lance Louis Engolia, Jr.
Represented By: Irvy E Cosse, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARRET THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Casualty Company
Represented By: Sean Patrick Avocato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co.
Represented By: Brittany Courtenay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?