Wetlands Mitigation Strategies v. Weyerhaeuser NR Company
Plaintiff: Wetlands Mitigation Strategies and Wetlands Mitigation Strategies, LLC
Defendant: Weyerhaeuser NR Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00256
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Weyerhaeuser NR Company identifying Corporate Parent Weyerhaeuser Company for Weyerhaeuser NR Company.. (Abbott, Charles)
July 1, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Weyerhaeuser NR Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Abbott, Charles)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 7/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 5/26/2021. (KAH)
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wetlands Mitigation Strategies, LLC. Weyerhaeuser NR Company waiver sent on 5/5/2021, answer due 7/6/2021. (Wittmann, Phillip)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief against Weyerhaeuser NR Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2283023.), filed by Wetlands Mitigation Strategies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Attachment, #8 Attachment, #9 Attachment)(Wittmann, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wetlands Mitigation Strategies v. Weyerhaeuser NR Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weyerhaeuser NR Company
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Represented By: Margaret Whiteley McLaughlin
Represented By: Charles H. Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wetlands Mitigation Strategies
Represented By: Phillip A. Wittmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wetlands Mitigation Strategies, LLC
Represented By: Andrew David Mendez
Represented By: Phillip A. Wittmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?