Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Pelican Sports TV, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Alan Traylor, Pelican Sports TV, LLC d/b/a Scoreboards Sports Grill and Pelican Sports TV, LLC doing business as Scoreboards Sports Grill
Case Number: 3:2021cv00321
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Pelican Sports TV, LLC served on 7/1/2021, answer due 7/22/2021. (Tarver, Dorothy)
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Alan Traylor served on 7/3/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (Tarver, Dorothy)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/26/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 8/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 6/23/2021. (KAH)
June 3, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Pelican Sports TV, LLC, Alan Traylor. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (NLT)
June 2, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Tarver, Dorothy)
June 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pelican Sports TV, LLC d/b/a Scoreboards Sports Grill, Alan Traylor ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2293964.), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons-Alan Traylor, #3 Summons-Scoreboards)(Tarver, Dorothy) (Main Document 1 and all Attachments replaced on 6/3/2021 to place in the proper order and to flatten the images) (NLT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Pelican Sports TV, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Traylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pelican Sports TV, LLC d/b/a Scoreboards Sports Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pelican Sports TV, LLC doing business as Scoreboards Sports Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Dorothy L. Tarver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?