Doe v. Bringedahl et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Karla Bringedahl and Paul Toce
Case Number: 3:2021cv00337
Filed: June 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. It is ordered that the plaintiff pay an initial partial filing fee of $24.86 in accordance with 28 USC 1915. A copy of this order shall be sent to the plaintiff and to Centralized Inmate Banking. The Clerk of Court is directed to withhold issuance of summons until further order of the Court. No service shall be made by the United States Marshal's Service at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/14/2021. (EDC)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULING AND ORDER denying #3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Defendants shall file their response, if any, to Plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction within the time limits imposed by Local Civil Rule 7. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 6/10/2021. (EDC)
June 10, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #4 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KMW)
June 9, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Summary Judgment by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit)(KMW)
June 9, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by John Doe. (KMW)
June 9, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 proposed order)(KMW)
June 9, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by John Doe. (KMW)
June 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Karla Bringedahl, Paul Toce, filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 cover letter)(KMW)
June 9, 2021 ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (KMW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Bringedahl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Bringedahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Toce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?