Frampton v. City of Baton Rouge et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Frampton
Defendant: Sharon Weston Broome, Murphy J. Paul, Jr. and City of Baton Rouge
Case Number: 3:2021cv00362
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #35 MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document (Incorrectly Redacted Exhibit). Pla's Exhibit 2 shall be substituted as Defense Exhibit 1 to cure the defect. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 8/10/2021. (DCB)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: During the preliminary injunction hearing held by this Court on Friday, August 6, 2021, counsel for Defendants, Andy Dotson, agreed to put the hearing in juvenile court off until November of 2021. IT IS ORDERED that City Parish advise the Court by filing a Notice into the record of the rescheduled Juvenile Court date. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 8/09/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC)
August 9, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document (Incorrectly Redacted Exhibit) by All Defendants. (Scott, Joseph)
August 6, 2021 Filing 34 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Thomas Frampton for proceedings held on 8/6/2021 before Judge deGravelles.. (Most, William)
August 6, 2021 Filing 33 ELECTRONIC EXHIBITS for hearing dated 8/6/2021.(EDC)
August 6, 2021 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John W. deGravelles: Evidentiary Hearing by zoom held on 8/6/2021 on Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Exhibits filed. An order of sequestration was issued. Counsel presented opening statements. Witnesses sworn and testified. The parties requested a copy of today's hearing in Open Court. The parties shall make the proper contact with the court reporter for the preparation of this transcript. Simultaneous Proposed Findings of Facts and Conclusions of Law shall be filed twenty-one (21) days after the transcript of this hearing is filed into the record. Reply briefs are due seven (7) days thereafter. (Court Reporter Natalie Breaux.) Pursuant to Local Rules, offering parties shall retain custody of exhibits..(EDC)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: All witnesses shall be sequestered during the course of this trial. It shall be the responsibility of the lawyers to give a copy of this order to each of their respective witnesses. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 8/6/2021. (EDC)
August 6, 2021 Filing 30 Witness List by Sharon Weston Broome, City of Baton Rouge, Murphy J. Paul, Jr. (For your free look at document, enter your Individual PACER login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Scott, Joseph)
August 4, 2021 Filing 29 Witness List by Thomas Frampton. (For your free look at document, enter your Individual PACER login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Most, William)
August 4, 2021 Filing 28 Witness List by Sharon Weston Broome, City of Baton Rouge, Murphy J. Paul, Jr. (For your free look at document, enter your Individual PACER login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Scott, Joseph)
August 3, 2021 Filing 27 Notice to Counsel: This Court's minute entry of July 2, 2021 (Doc. 13) stated "All parties shall file a witness list into the record within seven (7) days the hearing. The parties should include a brief description of the substance of the witness's anticipated testimony. The parties should also submit an exhibit list at this time.". The parties are to notify the Court of witnesses who will/may be called or that no witnesses will be called, by noon on August 4, 2021. All exhibits shall be provided to the Court in electronic format, using the specific format outlined on this Court's web page under "JWD Cases, JERS Notice for Trials". Evidence, in electronic format, shall be provided in accordance with Local Rule 79 and Administrative Procedures.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC)
August 2, 2021 Terminate Hearings (KDC)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: The hearing on Thomas Frampton's Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 8/6/2021 at 9:00 AM will be held by zoom video conferencing before Judge John W. deGravelles. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 07/30/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC)
July 16, 2021 Filing 25 REPLY Memorandum to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. P. 12 (b) (6) filed by Sharon Weston Broome, City of Baton Rouge, Murphy J. Paul, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Morris, Deelee) Modified on 7/19/2021 to edit the text (NLT).
July 13, 2021 Filing 24 Reply MEMORANDUM in Support of #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Thomas Frampton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Public Records, #2 Exhibit B - Corr. of Counsel, #3 Exhibit C- City/Parish Memo)(NLT)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Brief. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 07/13/2021. (NLT)
July 12, 2021 Filing 22 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Brief by Thomas Frampton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; (Reply Brief), #3 Exhibit A (Public Records), #4 Exhibit B (Corr. of Counsel), #5 Exhibit C (City/Parish Memo))(Most, William)
July 12, 2021 Filing 21 Reply MEMORANDUM in Support of #2 MOTION for Preliminary injunction and MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Thomas Frampton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Public Records), #2 Exhibit B (Corr. of Counsel))(Most, William) Modified on 7/12/2021 to edit the text (NLT).
July 8, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (DCB)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 MOTION to Substitute the Defective #14 Motion to Dismiss and Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 7/8/2021. (DCB)
July 7, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Substitute Defective Pleadings #14 Motion to Dismiss and Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Pleading;)(Scott, Joseph) Modified on 7/7/2021 to edit the text (SWE).
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 7/7/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
July 6, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of ABBREVIATED Briefing Schedule on #14 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. P. 12 (b) (6) and Opposition to Motion for Preliminary injunction : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 10 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 25 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 5 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 10 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC)
July 6, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Enroll Anderson Dotson, Deelee Morris as Additional Attorney by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Joseph)
July 6, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #15 MOTION to Enroll Anderson Dotson, Deelee Morris as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
July 5, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12 (b)(6) by Sharon Weston Broome, City of Baton Rouge, Murphy J. Paul, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Scott, Joseph) Modified on 7/6/2021 to edit text. (EDC). (Main Document 14 and attachment 1 replaced on 7/8/2021 as per rec. doc. 19) (DCB).
July 2, 2021 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John W. deGravelles Status Conference by zoom video conferencing held on 7/2/2021. The #8 MOTION to Reschedule Preliminary Injunction Hearing is GRANTED and the hearing on #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is reassigned to 8/6/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1. Counsel for Defendants will file a response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before 07/05/2021 and the mover may file a reply brief within 7 days or no later than 07/12/2021. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (ELW) (Main Document 13 replaced on 7/2/2021) (KDC). Modified on 7/6/2021 to edit the text (NLT).
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Transcript Request for the Status Conference held 6/28/2021 at Record Document 10 is DENIED. Court Conferences held by zoom video are digitally recorded for Court use only. All necessary information and deadlines are outlined in the Minute Entry at Record Document 7. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 07/01/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC)
July 1, 2021 Filing 11 Notice to Counsel: Status Conference set for 7/2/2021 at 10:00 AM by zoom video conferecing before Judge John W. deGravelles. Evidence, in electronic format, shall be provided in accordance with Local Rule 79 and Administrative Procedures.Participants must be in appropriate courtroom attire, seated in a private room or office, and using a camera that is stationary. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC)
June 30, 2021 Filing 10 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Thomas Frampton for proceedings held on 06/28/2021 before Judge deGravelles.. (Schwartzmann, Katharine)
June 30, 2021 Filing 9 Report of Conferral by Thomas Frampton. (Most, William) Modified on 6/30/2021 to edit text. (EDC).
June 30, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Reschedule Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Thomas Frampton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Most, William) Modified on 6/30/2021 to edit text. (EDC).
June 28, 2021 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John W. deGravelles: Status Conference held by zoom video conferencing on 6/28/2021, Plaintiff's #3 MOTION for Expedited Hearing is GRANTED. Plaintiff's #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is set for hearing on 7/9/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge John W. deGravelles. (SWE) (Main Document 7 replaced on 7/2/2021) (KDC).
June 24, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Thomas Frampton. Sharon Weston Broome waiver sent on 6/24/2021, answer due 8/23/2021; City of Baton Rouge waiver sent on 6/24/2021, answer due 8/23/2021; Murphy J. Paul, Jr waiver sent on 6/24/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (Most, William)
June 24, 2021 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel: Status Conference is set for 6/28/2021 at 3:00 PM by zoom video conferencing before Judge John W. deGravelles. Evidence, in electronic format, shall be provided in accordance with Local Rule 79 and Administrative Procedures.Participants must be in appropriate courtroom attire, seated in a private room or office, and using a camera that is stationary. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(KDC)
June 24, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Sharon Weston Broome, City of Baton Rouge, Murphy J. Paul, Jr.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons)(EDC)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Expedited Hearing on #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and for Expedited Briefing Schedule by Thomas Frampton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A (Corr. of Counsel))(Most, William)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Thomas Frampton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A (Contempt Petition), #3 Exhibit B (Corr. of Counsel), #4 Exhibit C (ACLU-LA Letter), #5 Exhibit D (Dec. of Prof. Frampton))(Most, William) (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/24/2021) (EDC). Modified on 6/24/2021 to rotate pages. (EDC).
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2305095.), filed by Thomas Frampton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A (Contempt Petition), #3 Exhibit B (Corr. of Counsel), #4 Exhibit C (ACLU-LA Letter), #5 Summons for Baton Rouge, #6 Summons for Broome, #7 Summons for Paul)(Most, William) (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/23/2021) (EDC). Modified on 6/23/2021 to rotate pages. (EDC).
June 23, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge John W. deGravelles. Judge Brian A. Jackson no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frampton v. City of Baton Rouge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Weston Broome
Represented By: Joseph K Scott, III
Represented By: Anderson O. Dotson, III
Represented By: Deelee S Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy J. Paul, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph K Scott, III
Represented By: Anderson O. Dotson, III
Represented By: Deelee S Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Baton Rouge
Represented By: Joseph K Scott, III
Represented By: Anderson O. Dotson, III
Represented By: Deelee S Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Frampton
Represented By: William Brock Most
Represented By: Katharine Murphy Schwartzmann
Represented By: Jane Catherine Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?